This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/20/2022 at 11:23:05 (UTC).

Bodine v. First Co

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 Bodine filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against First Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-11266

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Matt Bodine, an individual

Jason Bodine, an individual

DBS, a California Corporation

DABCO

Defendant / Appellees

First Co, a Corporation

Jim Nation, an individual

Jeff Evans, an individual

Ryan Bricarell, an individual

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Steven Riznyk

Attorney at San Diego Biz Law, A.P.C.

4225 Executive Square

La Jolla, CA 92037

Madeline Baker

Attorney at San Diego Biz Law, A.P.C.

4225 Executive Square

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Benjamin Lee Mesches

Attorney at Haynes & Boone, L.L.P.

2323 Victory Avenue

Dallas, TX 75219

Aimee Minick Furness

Attorney at Haynes & Boone, L.L.P.

2323 Victory Avenue

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Jason Bodine, Mr. Matt Bodine, DABCO and DBS [21-11266] (CBW) [Entered: 12/22/2021 08:44 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-11266] (Benjamin Lee Mesches ) [Entered: 12/23/2021 02:06 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-11266] (Aimee Minick Furness ) [Entered: 12/27/2021 03:51 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9745778-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 01/18/2022 for Appellants Jason Bodine, Matt Bodine, DABCO and DBS [21-11266] (LLL) [Entered: 01/03/2022 08:44 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Steven Riznyk for Mr. Jason Bodine, Mr. Matt Bodine, DABCO and DBS for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-11266] (Steven Riznyk ) [Entered: 01/03/2022 01:35 PM]

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Mr. Jason Bodine, Mr. Matt Bodine, DABCO and DBSfor the Court to process. Date of service: 01/03/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Furness, Mesches; Attorney for Appellant: Riznyk. [21-11266] (Steven Riznyk ) [Entered: 01/03/2022 03:49 PM]

Open Document

COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Court Reporter Ms. Nikki Barr. [21-11266] (Brooke Barr ) [Entered: 01/07/2022 12:08 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellants Mr. Jason Bodine, Mr. Matt Bodine, DBS and DABCO is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [21-11266] (Brooke Barr ) [Entered: 01/07/2022 04:37 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 02/22/2022 for Appellants Jason Bodine, Matt Bodine, DABCO and DBS. [21-11266] (CMB) [Entered: 01/11/2022 08:59 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-11266] (Madeline Baker ) [Entered: 02/10/2022 07:32 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Madeline Baker for party(s) Appellant Matt Bodine Appellant DBS Appellant Jason Bodine Appellant DABCO, in case 21-11266 [21-11266] (LLL) [Entered: 02/11/2022 04:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-11266] (Madeline Baker ) [Entered: 02/10/2022 07:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 02/22/2022 for Appellants Jason Bodine, Matt Bodine, DABCO and DBS. [21-11266] (CMB) [Entered: 01/11/2022 08:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-11266] (CMB) [Entered: 01/11/2022 08:58 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:20-CV-3116. Electronic ROA due on 01/25/2022. [21-11266] (LLL) [Entered: 01/10/2022 08:26 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Nikki Barr, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 01/07/2022 Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [21-11266] (LLL) [Entered: 01/10/2022 08:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellants Mr. Jason Bodine, Mr. Matt Bodine, DBS and DABCO is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [21-11266] (Brooke Barr ) [Entered: 01/07/2022 04:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Nikki Barr, Est. Completion Dt: 02/07/2022, Est. No.of Pgs: 31, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 01/05/2022, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 02/07/2022, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 10/18/2021. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment ddl satisfied. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 02/07/2022 for Nikki Barr [21-11266] (LLL) [Entered: 01/07/2022 12:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Court Reporter Ms. Nikki Barr. [21-11266] (Brooke Barr ) [Entered: 01/07/2022 12:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Jason Bodine, Mr. Matt Bodine, DABCO and DBS. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Nikki Barr, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 10/18/2021. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 01/18/2022 for Nikki Barr. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9746563-2 ] [21-11266] (LEF) [Entered: 01/05/2022 02:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Steven Riznyk for Appellant DABCO in 21-11266, Attorney Steven Riznyk for Appellant DBS in 21-11266, Attorney Steven Riznyk for Appellant Jason Bodine in 21-11266, Attorney Steven Riznyk for Appellant Matt Bodine in 21-11266 [21-11266] (LEF) [Entered: 01/05/2022 02:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Mr. Jason Bodine, Mr. Matt Bodine, DABCO and DBSfor the Court to process. Date of service: 01/03/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Furness, Mesches; Attorney for Appellant: Riznyk. [21-11266] (Steven Riznyk ) [Entered: 01/03/2022 03:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Steven Riznyk for Mr. Jason Bodine, Mr. Matt Bodine, DABCO and DBS for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-11266] (Steven Riznyk ) [Entered: 01/03/2022 01:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9745778-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 01/18/2022 for Appellants Jason Bodine, Matt Bodine, DABCO and DBS [21-11266] (LLL) [Entered: 01/03/2022 08:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Aimee Minick Furness for Appellee Ryan Bricarell in 21-11266, Attorney Aimee Minick Furness for Appellee Jeff Evans in 21-11266, Attorney Aimee Minick Furness for Appellee Jim Nation in 21-11266, Attorney Aimee Minick Furness for Appellee First Co in 21-11266 [21-11266] (LLL) [Entered: 12/28/2021 01:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-11266] (Aimee Minick Furness ) [Entered: 12/27/2021 03:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Benjamin Lee Mesches for party(s) Appellee Jeff Evans Appellee Ryan Bricarell Appellee First Co Appellee Jim Nation, in case 21-11266 [21-11266] (LLL) [Entered: 12/23/2021 04:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-11266] (Benjamin Lee Mesches ) [Entered: 12/23/2021 02:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Jason Bodine, Mr. Matt Bodine, DABCO and DBS [21-11266] (CBW) [Entered: 12/22/2021 08:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aimee M Furness

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Lee Mesches