This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/18/2021 at 06:22:24 (UTC).

Bobelu-Boone v. McDonough

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 Bobelu-Boone filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against McDonough. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2038

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

DENIS MCDONOUGH, Secretary of the United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Plaintiff / Appellant

STEPHANIE L. BOBELU-BOONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Christine H. Lyman

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

201 3Rd Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Donald Glen Gilpin Esq.

Attorney at Gilpin Law Firm, LLC

6100 Indian School Road, Ne, Suite 115

Albuquerque, NM 87110-0000

Christopher P. Machin

Attorney at Gilpin Law Firm, LLC

6100 Indian School Road, Ne, Suite 115

Albuquerque, NM 87110-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10832594] Mandate issued. [21-2038] [Entered: 05/26/2021 08:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10832593] Rule 33 case terminated. Motion to dismiss is granted.; Procedural termination without judicial action; [21-2038] [Entered: 05/26/2021 08:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket[10832589] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting motion to dismiss case. Served on 05/26/2021. Text only entry - no attachment. [21-2038] Final order to be found in case termination entry. [Entered: 05/26/2021 08:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10832525] Motion filed by Appellant Stephanie L. Bobelu-Boone to dismiss case. Served on: 05/25/2021. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [21-2038] DGG [Entered: 05/25/2021 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10827365] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 05/25/2021 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [21-2038] [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10826842] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 05/03/2021. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 06/14/2021 for Stephanie L. Bobelu-Boone. [21-2038] [Entered: 05/03/2021 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket. [lg] This is a duplicate filing. [10826830] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Donald Glen Gilpin, Esq. for Stephanie L. Bobelu-Boone. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/03/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-2038] [Entered: 05/03/2021 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10826828] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Donald Glen Gilpin, Esq. for Stephanie L. Bobelu-Boone. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/03/2021. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 05/04/2021 by SDS to remove attorney Machin as he did not sign the notice of appearance] [21-2038] [Entered: 05/03/2021 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docket[10826818] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 05/10/2021 for Mitchell R. Elfers, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-2038] [Entered: 05/03/2021 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docket[10826790] Entry of appearance submitted by Donald G. Gilpin for for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/03/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 05/03/2021 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [21-2038] DGG [Entered: 05/03/2021 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10826783] Notice received from Stephanie L. Bobelu-Boone that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 05/03/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-2038] DGG [Entered: 05/03/2021 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docket[10826781] Entry of appearance submitted by Donald G. Gilpin for Appellant Stephanie L. Bobelu-Boone for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/03/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-2038]--[Edited 05/03/2021 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 5/3/2021] DGG [Entered: 05/03/2021 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10826776] Docketing statement filed by Stephanie L. Bobelu-Boone. Served on 05/03/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-2038] DGG [Entered: 05/03/2021 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10824702] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Christine H. Lyman for Denis McDonough. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/23/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-2038] [Entered: 04/23/2021 08:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • Docket[10824696] Entry of appearance submitted by Christine H. Lyman for Appellee Denis McDonough for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/23/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/23/2021 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [21-2038] CHL [Entered: 04/23/2021 08:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10823361] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/19/2021. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 05/03/2021 for Stephanie L. Bobelu-Boone. Notice of appearance due on 05/03/2021 for Denis McDonough. [21-2038] [Entered: 04/19/2021 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher P. Machin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald G Gilpin