This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/30/2021 at 06:09:19 (UTC).

Board of Trustees of the IBEW v. Cigna Health and Life Insuranc

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 Board of Trustees of the IBEW filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Cigna Health and Life Insuranc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16424

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE IBEW LOCAL NO. 640 AND ARIZONA CHAPTER NECA HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND, as fiduciary of its welfare plan

Defendant / Appellee

CIGNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

John Kenneth Kelley

Attorney at Ryan Rapp & Underwood, PLC

3200 N Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Herman Daniel Hofman

Attorney at Varnum, LLP

333 Bridge Street, Nw, P.O. Box 352

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0352

Aaron M. Phelps

Attorney at Varnum, LLP

333 Bridge Street, Nw, P.O. Box 352

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0352

Perrin Rynders

Attorney at Varnum, LLP

333 Bridge Street, Nw, P.O. Box 352

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0352

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John Clifton West

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie, LLP

201 E Washington Street, Suite 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2595

Warren Haskel

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery

1 Vanderbilt Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Richard W. Nicholson, Jr.

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery

1 Vanderbilt Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Joshua B. Simon

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery

1 Vanderbilt Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Dmitriy Tishyevich

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery

1 Vanderbilt Avenue

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #5

Case Opening Packet for Attorneys

#11

(#11) Filed (ECF) Appellant Board of Trustees of the IBEW Local No. 640 and Arizona Chapter NECA Health and Welfare Trust Fund Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/08/2021. [12223094] [21-16424] (Rynders, Perrin) [Entered: 09/08/2021 01:10 PM]

#13

(#13) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 09/27/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12226048] (VS) [Entered: 09/11/2021 06:45 PM]

#14

(#14) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12246068] (VS) [Entered: 10/04/2021 10:00 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12246068] (VS) [Entered: 10/04/2021 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 09/27/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12226048] (VS) [Entered: 09/11/2021 06:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docket(#12) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/08/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12223765]. [21-16424] (AD) [Entered: 09/08/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed (ECF) Appellant Board of Trustees of the IBEW Local No. 640 and Arizona Chapter NECA Health and Welfare Trust Fund Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/08/2021. [12223094] [21-16424] (Rynders, Perrin) [Entered: 09/08/2021 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docket(#10) Added Attorney(s) Aaron M. Phelps, Perrin Rynders, Herman Daniel Hofman for party(s) Appellant Board of Trustees of the IBEW Local No. 640 and Arizona Chapter NECA Health and Welfare Trust Fund, in case 21-16424. [12222983] (RR) [Entered: 09/08/2021 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Herman D. Hofman (Varnum LLP, Bridgewater Place, P.O. Box 352, Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0352) for Appellant Board of Trustees of the IBEW Local No. 640 and Arizona Chapter NECA Health and Welfare Trust Fund. Date of service: 09/08/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12222811] [21-16424] (Hofman, Herman) [Entered: 09/08/2021 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Aaron M. Phelps (Varnum LLP, Bridgewater Place, P.O. Box 352, Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0352) for Appellant Board of Trustees of the IBEW Local No. 640 and Arizona Chapter NECA Health and Welfare Trust Fund. Date of service: 09/08/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12222801] [21-16424] (Phelps, Aaron) [Entered: 09/08/2021 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Perrin Rynders (Varnum LLP, Bridgewater Place, P.O. Box 352, Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0352) for Appellant Board of Trustees of the IBEW Local No. 640 and Arizona Chapter NECA Health and Welfare Trust Fund. Date of service: 09/08/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12222782] [21-16424] (Rynders, Perrin) [Entered: 09/08/2021 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docket(#6) Added Attorney(s) Dmitriy Tishyevich, Joshua B. Simon, Warren Haskel, Richard W. Nicholson, Jr. for party(s) Appellee Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, in case 21-16424. [12222295] (RR) [Entered: 09/07/2021 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard W. Nicholson, Jr. (McDermott Will & Emery LLP, One Vanderbilt Avenue, New York, NY 10017-5404) for Appellee Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. Date of service: 09/07/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12222018] [21-16424] (Nicholson, Jr., Richard) [Entered: 09/07/2021 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Dmitriy Tishyevich (McDermott Will & Emery LLP, One Vanderbilt Avenue, New York, NY 10017-5404) for Appellee Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. Date of service: 09/07/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12221957] [21-16424] (Tishyevich, Dmitriy) [Entered: 09/07/2021 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Warren Haskel (McDermott Will & Emery LLP, One Vanderbilt Avenue, New York, NY 10017-5404) for Appellee Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. Date of service: 09/07/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12221920] [21-16424] (Haskel, Warren) [Entered: 09/07/2021 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joshua B. Simon (McDermott Will & Emery LLP, One Vanderbilt Avenue, New York, NY 10017-5404) for Appellee Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. Date of service: 09/07/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12221896] [21-16424] (Simon, Joshua) [Entered: 09/07/2021 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Board of Trustees of the IBEW Local No. 640 and Arizona Chapter NECA Health and Welfare Trust Fund Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/07/2021. Transcript ordered by 09/29/2021. Transcript due 10/29/2021. Appellant Board of Trustees of the IBEW Local No. 640 and Arizona Chapter NECA Health and Welfare Trust Fund opening brief due 12/08/2021. Appellee Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company answering (JPD) [Entered: 08/31/2021 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dmitriy G Tishyevich

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua B. Simon