This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/15/2021 at 06:36:33 (UTC).

Blue Gentian, LLC v. Tristar Products, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Blue Gentian, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Tristar Products, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2317

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

BLUE GENTIAN, LLC

NATIONAL EXPRESS, INC.

TELEBRANDS CORPORATION

Defendant / Appellee

TRISTAR PRODUCTS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

George C. Jones Esq.

Attorney at McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP

1300 Mount Kemble Avenue, Po Box 2075

Morristown, NJ 07962

David Smart Stone

Attorney at Stone & Magnanini LLP

100 Connell Drive

Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Edward P. Bakos Esq.

Attorney at Ward & Olivo

382 Springfield Avenue

Summit, NJ 07901

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#2

(#2) ORDER consolidating appeals (21-2316, 21-2317). Appellants' opening briefs are due no later than November 15, 2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [801170] [21-2316, 21-2317] [JCW] [Entered: 09/22/2021 04:04 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • Docket(#3) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 21-2316 Lead with 21-2317 Member Case. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [801172] [21-2316, 21-2317] [JCW] [Entered: 09/22/2021 04:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER consolidating appeals (21-2316, 21-2317). Appellants' opening briefs are due no later than November 15, 2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [801170] [21-2316, 21-2317] [JCW] [Entered: 09/22/2021 04:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 09/14/2021. [799897] Entry of Appearance is due on 09/30/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/30/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 09/30/2021. Appellants' brief is due on 11/15/2021. [JCW] [Entered: 09/16/2021 10:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRISTAR PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TELEBRANDS CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where National Express Group, PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWARD PAUL BAKOS