This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 05:36:35 (UTC).

Blanca Ochoa-Diaz v. William Barr

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Blanca Ochoa-Diaz filed an Other lawsuit against William Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-70393

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BLANCA DIANA OCHOA-DIAZ

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Thomas Damien Pamilla

Attorney at Law Offices of Thomas D. Pamilla, APC

3100 Mowry Avenue, Suite 200

Fremont, CA 94538

Respondent Attorney

OIL

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Counsel Case Information Packet

1 #4

Petition For Review and BIA Decision

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#2) Resources Available As you get ready to prepare your opening brief, please consult the Immigration Outline ( # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/guides/immigration_outline.php ) prepared by court staff and also consider contacting the court's mentoring program (see Appellate Mentoring Program at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/attorneys/ ) for help with the brief and argument. (Notice sent to counsel for petitioner.) [11597333]. [20-70393] (CD) [Entered: 02/13/2020 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED BIA Petition for Review. COUNSELED. Petitioner detained? NO. Certified Administrative Record due 03/19/2020. Petitioner opening brief due 05/18/2020 for Blanca Diana Ochoa-Diaz. Respondent brief due 07/17/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. [11596879] (HC) [Entered: 02/13/2020 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less