This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:03:16 (UTC).

Blanca Argelia Arias v. Residence Inn by Marriott, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Blanca Argelia Arias filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Residence Inn by Marriott. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55803

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOTT, a Delaware limited liability company

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Delaware corporation

Plaintiff / Appellee

BLANCA ARGELIA ARIAS, individually and on behalf of herself and others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Brian Patrick Long Esquire

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

601 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3300

Los Angeles, CA 90017

William J. Dritsas

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street, Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Ramin R. Younessi Esquire

Attorney at Law Office of Ramin R. Younessi A.P.L.C.

3435 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Samvel Geshgian Esquire

Attorney at Law Offfices of Ramin R. Younessi, A.P.L.C.

3435 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

22 #2

Post Judgment Form

22 #1

Opinion

#16

(#16) Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 15 ] submitted by Blanca Argelia Arias is filed. Appellee is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format for delivery to the Court by 5:00 p.m. Pacific time today, July 31, 2019, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11383209] (LA) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:20 PM]

#15

(#15) Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Blanca Argelia Arias. Date of service: 07/31/2019. [11383191] [19-55803] (Younessi, Ramin) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:10 PM]

#14

(#14) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): Appellees motion for extension of time (Dkt. No. [ # 8 ]) is granted in part. The new deadline for appellees brief is Wednesday, July 31, 2019. No further extensions will be granted. [11377135] (OC) [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:49 PM]

#11

No Description Available

10 #2

ER Vol 2

10 #1

ER Vol 1

#9

(#13) Received 7 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 9 ] filed by Marriott International, Inc. and Residence Inn by Marriott. (sent to panel) [11376956] (LA) [Entered: 07/25/2019 02:43 PM]

#8

(#14) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): Appellees motion for extension of time (Dkt. No. [ # 8 ]) is granted in part. The new deadline for appellees brief is Wednesday, July 31, 2019. No further extensions will be granted. [11377135] (OC) [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:49 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Mr. Brian Patrick Long, Esquire for Appellants Marriott International, Inc. and Residence Inn by Marriott. Hearing in Pasadena on 08/13/2019 at 09:00 A.M. (Courtroom: 3). Filer sharing argument time: No. (Argument minutes: 15.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 07/23/2019. [11373943] [19-55803] (Long, Brian) [Entered: 07/23/2019 02:51 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellants Marriott International, Inc. and Residence Inn by Marriott Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/22/2019. [11371079] [19-55803] (Long, Brian) [Entered: 07/22/2019 10:01 AM]

#2

Case Opening Packet

2 #1

Docketing Letter

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) FILED OPINION (CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN, D. MICHAEL FISHER and MORGAN B. CHRISTEN) We vacate the district courts judgment and remand on an open record for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. The district court may hold such further proceedings as it deems appropriate to permit the parties to submit evidence and arguments on the amount in controversy. The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. VACATED and REMANDED. Judge: CMC Authoring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [11417967] (AKM) [Entered: 09/03/2019 08:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • (#21) ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN, D. MICHAEL FISHER and MORGAN B. CHRISTEN. [11395991] (DLM) [Entered: 08/13/2019 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • (#20) Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Samvel Geshgian, Esquire for Appellee Blanca Argelia Arias. Hearing in Pasadena on 08/13/2019 at 09:00 A.M. (Courtroom: 3). Filer sharing argument time: No. (Argument minutes: 15.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 08/08/2019. [11391427] [19-55803] (Geshgian, Samvel) [Entered: 08/08/2019 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • (#19) Added Attorney Samvel Geshgian for Appellee Blanca Argelia Arias, in case 19-55803. [11390519] (HH) [Entered: 08/07/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • (#18) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Samvel Geshgian (Law Offices of Ramin R. Younessi, A Professional Law Corporation, 3435 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 2200, Los Angeles, CA, 90010) for Appellee Blanca Argelia Arias. Date of service: 08/07/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11390504] [19-55803] (Geshgian, Samvel) [Entered: 08/07/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Received 7 paper copies of Answering Brief [ # 15 ] filed by Blanca Argelia Arias. (sent to panel) [11384131] (LA) [Entered: 08/01/2019 12:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 15 ] submitted by Blanca Argelia Arias is filed. Appellee is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format for delivery to the Court by 5:00 p.m. Pacific time today, July 31, 2019, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11383209] (LA) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Blanca Argelia Arias. Date of service: 07/31/2019. [11383191] [19-55803] (Younessi, Ramin) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): Appellees motion for extension of time (Dkt. No. [ # 8 ]) is granted in part. The new deadline for appellees brief is Wednesday, July 31, 2019. No further extensions will be granted. [11377135] (OC) [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Received 7 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 9 ] filed by Marriott International, Inc. and Residence Inn by Marriott. (sent to panel) [11376956] (LA) [Entered: 07/25/2019 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Marriott International, Inc. and Residence Inn by Marriott. Date of service: 07/25/2019. [11376484] [19-55803] (Long, Brian) [Entered: 07/25/2019 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Marriott International, Inc. and Residence Inn by Marriott. Date of service: 07/25/2019. [11376403] [19-55803] (Long, Brian) [Entered: 07/25/2019 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) Appellee Blanca Argelia Arias Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 08/02/2019. Date of service: 07/24/2019. [11375861] [19-55803] (Younessi, Ramin) [Entered: 07/24/2019 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Mr. Brian Patrick Long, Esquire for Appellants Marriott International, Inc. and Residence Inn by Marriott. Hearing in Pasadena on 08/13/2019 at 09:00 A.M. (Courtroom: 3). Filer sharing argument time: No. (Argument minutes: 15.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 07/23/2019. [11373943] [19-55803] (Long, Brian) [Entered: 07/23/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#6) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/22/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11371575][19-55803] (AD) [Entered: 07/22/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) Appellants Marriott International, Inc. and Residence Inn by Marriott Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/22/2019. [11371079] [19-55803] (Long, Brian) [Entered: 07/22/2019 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#4) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 07/22/2019. [11370992] (BY) [Entered: 07/22/2019 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • (#3) Notice of Oral Argument on Tuesday, August 13, 2019 - 09:00 A.M. - Courtroom 3 - Pasadena CA. View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case # here . Be sure to review the # GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to arrive (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible). If you are the specific attorney or self-represented party who will be arguing, use the # ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE filing type in CM/ECF no later than 21 days before Tuesday, August 13, 2019. No form or other attachment is required. If you will not be arguing, do not file an acknowledgment of hearing notice.[11363606][Array,19-55803] (AW) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Marriott International, Inc. and Residence Inn by Marriott opening brief due 07/25/2019. Appellee Blanca Argelia Arias answering brief due 07/25/2019. [11363154] (RT) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • (#1) Filed order (WILLIAM C. CANBY and SUSAN P. GRABER, Circuit Judges) in case no. 18-80171 on July 15, 2019: The petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1453(c) is granted. See Coleman v. Estes Express Lines, Inc., 627 F.3d 1096, 1100 (9th Cir. 2010). Within 7 days after the filing date of this order, petitioners shall perfect the appeal pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1453(c)(2), the court shall complete all action on this appeal, including rendering judgment, not later than 60 days after the date on which the appeal was filed. See also Bush v. Cheaptickets, Inc., 425 F.3d 683, 685 (9th Cir. 2005) (stating that 60-day time period begins to run when the court accepts the appeal). The parties shall submit, via electronic filing, simultaneous briefs and excerpts of record within 10 days after the filing date of this order. No reply briefs will be accepted. Also, within 10 days after the filing date of this order, by 5:00 p.m. (Pacific time), the parties shall submit to the Clerks Office in San Francisco 7 copies of the briefs and 4 copies of the excerpts of record in paper format, accompanied by certification that the briefs are identical to the versions submitted electronically. Any motion to extend time to file the briefs shall strictly comply with the requirements set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1453(c)(3). The Clerk shall calendar this case during the week of August 12, 2019, in Pasadena, California. [11363137] (RT) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.