This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/19/2021 at 06:02:58 (UTC).

Bishop of Charleston v. Orangeburg County

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 Bishop of Charleston filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Orangeburg County. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1912

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

BISHOP OF CHARLESTON, d/b/a Roman Catholic Diocese of Charleston, a Corporation Sole

SOUTH CAROLINA INDEPENDENT COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES, INC.

Defendant / Appellees

MARCIA ADAMS, in her official capacity as the Executive Director of the South Carolina Department of Administration

BRIAN GAINES, in his official capacity as budget director for the South Carolina Department of Administration

HENRY DARGAN MCMASTER, in his official capacity as Governor of South Carolina

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee

STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA

Petitioner / Appellants

ORANGEBURG COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT

SOUTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Richard Sears Dukes Jr.

Attorney at TURNER, PADGET, GRAHAM & LANEY, PA

P. O. Box 22129

Charleston, SC 29413-0000

Daniel Robert Suhr

Attorney at LIBERTY JUSTICE CENTER

141 West Jackson Boulevard

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Eugene Matthews

Attorney at RICHARDSON PLOWDEN & ROBINSON, PA

P. O. Drawer 7788

Columbia, SC 29202-0000

William Grayson Lambert Esq.

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR OF SOUTH CAROLINA

P. O. Box 11829

Columbia, SC 29211-0000

Thomas Ashley Limehouse Esq. Jr.

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR OF SOUTH CAROLINA

P. O. Box 11829

Columbia, SC 29211-0000

Christopher Ernest Mills

Attorney at SPERO LAW LLC

557 East Bay Street

Charleston, SC 29465

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee Attorney

James Emory Smith Esq. Jr.

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA

P. O. Box 11549

Columbia, SC 29211

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Phillip Donald Barber

Attorney at RICHARD A. HARPOOTLIAN, PA

1410 Laurel Street, P. O. Box 1090

Columbia, SC 29201

Kelsi Brown Corkran

Attorney at GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY LAW CENTER

600 New Jersey Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Skyler Bradley Hutto

Attorney at WILLIAMS & WILLIAMS

1281 Russell Street, P. O. Box 1084

Orangeburg, SC 29116-1084

Amy L. Marshak

Attorney at GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY LAW CENTER

600 New Jersey Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Joseph Wilfred Mead

Attorney at INSTITUTE FOR CONSTITUTIONAL ADVOCACY & PROTECTION

600 New Jersey Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christopher E. Mills for Henry Dargan McMaster. [1001040563] [21-1912] Christopher Mills [Entered: 10/13/2021 04:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) BRIEF by Orangeburg County School District and South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1001039507] [21-1912] Joseph Mead [Entered: 10/12/2021 03:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) JOINT APPENDIX by Orangeburg County School District and South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1001038604] [21-1912] Joseph Mead [Entered: 10/11/2021 05:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State of South Carolina. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001038573] [21-1912] James Smith [Entered: 10/11/2021 12:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER filed granting Motion to file separate brief [ # 25 ] Copies to all parties. [1001036704] [21-1912] TF [Entered: 10/06/2021 01:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION by Bishop of Charleston and South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities, Inc. to file separate briefs [25]. Date and method of service: 10/05/2021 ecf. [1001035582] [21-1912] Daniel Suhr [Entered: 10/05/2021 11:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER filed granting Motion to amend caption [ # 23 ]. Copies to all parties. [1001029615] [21-1912] TF [Entered: 09/24/2021 01:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION by Bishop of Charleston and South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities, Inc. to amend/correct caption. Date and method of service: 09/24/2021 ecf. [1001029387] [21-1912] Daniel Suhr [Entered: 09/24/2021 10:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marcia Adams and Brian Gaines. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001028037] [21-1912] Eugene Matthews [Entered: 09/22/2021 12:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Eugene H. Matthews for Marcia Adams and Brian Gaines. [1001028032] [21-1912] Eugene Matthews [Entered: 09/22/2021 12:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Orangeburg County School District. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001013068] [21-1912] Joseph Mead [Entered: 08/30/2021 12:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Amended DOCKETING STATEMENT by Orangeburg County School District and South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP. [21-1912] Joseph Mead [Entered: 08/28/2021 02:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Orangeburg County School District and South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP. [21-1912] Joseph Mead [Entered: 08/28/2021 01:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joseph W. Mead for Orangeburg County School District and South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP. [1001012392] [21-1912] Joseph Mead [Entered: 08/27/2021 02:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kelsi Corkran for Orangeburg County School District and South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP. [1001012256] [21-1912] Kelsi Corkran [Entered: 08/27/2021 01:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thomas A. Limehouse, Jr. for Henry McMaster. [1001008077] [21-1912] Thomas Limehouse [Entered: 08/20/2021 05:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Henry McMaster. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001008059] [21-1912] William Lambert [Entered: 08/20/2021 04:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Wm. Grayson Lambert for Henry McMaster. [1001008058] [21-1912] William Lambert [Entered: 08/20/2021 04:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:21-cv-01093-BHH. Mailed to: Dukes, Hutto, Jennings, Suhr, Traywick. [21-1912] TF [Entered: 08/20/2021 12:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:21-cv-01093-BHH. Case manager: TFischer. [21-1912] TF [Entered: 08/20/2021 12:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where South Carolina State Conference of the NAACP is a litigant

Latest cases where Bishop of Charleston, The is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillip Donald Barber

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy L Marshak PHV