This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/24/2022 at 06:02:36 (UTC).

Bishop of Charleston v. Marcia Adams

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 Bishop of Charleston filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Marcia Adams. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1175

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

BISHOP OF CHARLESTON, d/b/a Roman Catholic Diocese of Charleston, a Corporation Sole

SOUTH CAROLINA INDEPENDENT COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES, INC.

Defendant / Appellees

MARCIA ADAMS, in her official capacity as the Executive Director of the South Carolina Department of Administration

BRIAN GAINES, in his official capacity as budget director for the South Carolina Department of Administration

HENRY DARGAN MCMASTER, in his official capacity as Governor of South Carolina

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee

STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Richard Sears Dukes Jr.

Attorney at TURNER, PADGET, GRAHAM & LANEY, PA

P. O. Box 22129

Charleston, SC 29413-0000

Jeffrey Daniel Jennings

Attorney at LIBERTY JUSTICE CENTER

440 North Wells Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Daniel Robert Suhr

Attorney at LIBERTY JUSTICE CENTER

440 North Wells Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Eugene Matthews

Attorney at RICHARDSON PLOWDEN & ROBINSON, PA

P. O. Drawer 7788

Columbia, SC 29202-0000

William Grayson Lambert Esq.

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR OF SOUTH CAROLINA

1100 Gervais Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Thomas Ashley Limehouse Esq. Jr.

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR OF SOUTH CAROLINA

1100 Gervais Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Christopher Ernest Mills

Attorney at SPERO LAW LLC

557 East Bay Street

Charleston, SC 29465

Vordman Carlisle Traywick

Attorney at ROBINSON GRAY STEPP & LAFFITTE, LLC

P. O. Box 11449

Columbia, SC 29211

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Thomas T. Hydrick

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA

P. O. Box 11549

Columbia, SC 29211

James Emory Smith Esq. Jr.

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA

P. O. Box 11549

Columbia, SC 29211

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption. [1001149114] [22-1175] KS [Entered: 04/20/2022 12:17 PM]

#22

(#22) Docket correction requested from Bishop of Charleston and South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities, Inc. Correction due: 04/25/2022. [1001149046] [22-1175] KS [Entered: 04/20/2022 11:38 AM]

#21

(#21) JOINT APPENDIX by Bishop of Charleston and South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities, Inc.. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1001148758] [22-1175] Daniel Suhr [Entered: 04/19/2022 09:16 PM]

#20

(#20) BRIEF by South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities, Inc. and Bishop of Charleston. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1001148757] [22-1175] Daniel Suhr [Entered: 04/19/2022 09:14 PM]

#19

(#19) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marcia Adams and Brian Gaines. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001134915] [22-1175] Eugene Matthews [Entered: 03/28/2022 09:11 AM]

#18

(#18) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Eugene H. Matthews for Marcia Adams and Brian Gaines. [1001134910] [22-1175] Eugene Matthews [Entered: 03/28/2022 09:10 AM]

#17

(#17) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Marcia Adams and Brian Gaines for filing of appearance form and disclosure form. Forms due on 03/24/2022. [1001131219] [22-1175] TF [Entered: 03/21/2022 12:22 PM]

#16

(#16) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Traywick. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001125044] Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/19/2022. Response Brief due 05/19/2022 [22-1175] TF [Entered: 03/10/2022 10:57 AM]

15 #1

Docketing Statement

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James Emory Smith, Jr. for State of South Carolina. [1001124368] [22-1175] James Smith [Entered: 03/09/2022 12:07 PM]

#8

(#8) ORDER filed granting Motion to amend/correct [ # 7 ] Copies to all parties. [1001123184] [22-1175] TF [Entered: 03/07/2022 05:19 PM]

#7

(#8) ORDER filed granting Motion to amend/correct [ # 7 ] Copies to all parties. [1001123184] [22-1175] TF [Entered: 03/07/2022 05:19 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christopher Mills for Henry Dargan McMaster. [1001115802] [22-1175] Christopher Mills [Entered: 02/23/2022 04:16 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Wm. Grayson Lambert for Henry Dargan McMaster. [1001115782] [22-1175] William Lambert [Entered: 02/23/2022 04:03 PM]

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Henry Dargan McMaster. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001115774] [22-1175] Thomas Limehouse [Entered: 02/23/2022 04:00 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thomas A. Limehouse, Jr. for Henry Dargan McMaster. [1001115768] [22-1175] Thomas Limehouse [Entered: 02/23/2022 03:58 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:21-cv-01093-BHH. Mailed to: Traywick. [1001115657] [22-1175] TF [Entered: 02/23/2022 02:36 PM]

#1

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:21-cv-01093-BHH. Mailed to: Traywick. [1001115657] [22-1175] TF [Entered: 02/23/2022 02:36 PM]

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption. [1001149114] [22-1175] KS [Entered: 04/20/2022 12:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket correction requested from Bishop of Charleston and South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities, Inc. Correction due: 04/25/2022. [1001149046] [22-1175] KS [Entered: 04/20/2022 11:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) JOINT APPENDIX by Bishop of Charleston and South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities, Inc.. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1001148758] [22-1175] Daniel Suhr [Entered: 04/19/2022 09:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) BRIEF by South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities, Inc. and Bishop of Charleston. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1001148757] [22-1175] Daniel Suhr [Entered: 04/19/2022 09:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marcia Adams and Brian Gaines. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001134915] [22-1175] Eugene Matthews [Entered: 03/28/2022 09:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Eugene H. Matthews for Marcia Adams and Brian Gaines. [1001134910] [22-1175] Eugene Matthews [Entered: 03/28/2022 09:10 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Marcia Adams and Brian Gaines for filing of appearance form and disclosure form. Forms due on 03/24/2022. [1001131219] [22-1175] TF [Entered: 03/21/2022 12:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Traywick. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001125044] Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/19/2022. Response Brief due 05/19/2022 [22-1175] TF [Entered: 03/10/2022 10:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Bishop of Charleston and South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities, Inc... [1001124823] [22-1175] Daniel Suhr [Entered: 03/09/2022 05:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1001124820] [22-1175] Daniel Suhr [Entered: 03/09/2022 05:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State of South Carolina. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001124374] [22-1175] James Smith [Entered: 03/09/2022 12:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James Emory Smith, Jr. for State of South Carolina. [1001124368] [22-1175] James Smith [Entered: 03/09/2022 12:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER filed granting Motion to amend/correct [ # 7 ] Copies to all parties. [1001123184] [22-1175] TF [Entered: 03/07/2022 05:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Bishop of Charleston and South Carolina Independent Colleges and Universities, Inc. to amend/correct caption. Date and method of service: 03/04/2022 ecf. [1001121830] [22-1175] Daniel Suhr [Entered: 03/04/2022 01:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christopher Mills for Henry Dargan McMaster. [1001115802] [22-1175] Christopher Mills [Entered: 02/23/2022 04:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Wm. Grayson Lambert for Henry Dargan McMaster. [1001115782] [22-1175] William Lambert [Entered: 02/23/2022 04:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Henry Dargan McMaster. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001115774] [22-1175] Thomas Limehouse [Entered: 02/23/2022 04:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thomas A. Limehouse, Jr. for Henry Dargan McMaster. [1001115768] [22-1175] Thomas Limehouse [Entered: 02/23/2022 03:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:21-cv-01093-BHH. Mailed to: Traywick. [1001115657] [22-1175] TF [Entered: 02/23/2022 02:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:21-cv-01093-BHH. Case manager: TFischer. [1001115655] [22-1175] TF [Entered: 02/23/2022 02:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bishop of Charleston, The is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Tyler Hydrick

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Emory Smith Jr.