This case was last updated from PACER on 05/17/2019 at 06:07:18 (UTC).

Bishay, et al v. Supreme Court of MA, et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 Bishay filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Supreme Court of MA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1257

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MERRILL LYNCH CREDIT CORP., a/k/a Bank of America, N.A.

JON FREEMAN

REAL ESTATE GROWTH FUND, LLC

SCOTT KAFKER, in individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts

BARBARA A. LENK, in individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts

RALPH D. GANTS, in his individual and official capacity as Chief Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts

PETER D. KYBURG

DAVID A. LOWY, in individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts

ELSPETH B. CYPHER, in individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts

KIMBERLY SUZANNE BUDD, in individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts

MICHAEL P. GIUNTA

MASSACHUSETTS SUPREME JUDICIAL COURT

FRANK M. GAZIANO, in individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts

BARBARA A. LENK, in her individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts

ELSPETH B. CYPHER, in her individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts

FRANK M. GAZIANO, in his individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts

SCOTT KAFKER, in his individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts

DAVID A. LOWY, in her individual and official capacity as Associate Justice of the Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts

Plaintiff / Appellants

MARY T. BISHAY

Norwood, MA 02062

BAHIG F. BISHAY

Norwood, MA 02062

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John E. McCann III

Attorney at Shechtman Halperin Savage LLP

1080 Main St

Pawtucket, RI 02860-0000

Connie Flores Jones

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

1111 Louisiana St, 25Th Flr

Houston, TX 77002

Robert R. Pierce

Attorney at Pierce & Mandell PC

11 Beacon St, Ste 800

Boston, MA 02108-0000

Elizabeth A. Kaplan

Attorney at MA Attorney General's Office

1 Ashburton Pl

Boston, MA 02108-0000

Charles F. Rourke II

Attorney at Sloane & Walsh LLP

1 Center Plaza, 8Th Flr

Boston, MA 02108-0000

Edward T. Hinchey

Attorney at Slone & Welsh

3 Center Plaza

Boston, MA 02108-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Mary T. Bishay

Po Box 396

Norwood, MA 02062

Bahig F. Bishay

Po Box 396

Norwood, MA 02062

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MOTION for leave to file oversized brief filed by Appellants Bahig F. Bishay and Mary T. Bishay. Certificate of service dated 05/06/2019. [19-1257] (GRC) [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:17 AM]

Open Restricted Document #3

BRIEF tendered by Appellants Bahig F. Bishay and Mary T. Bishay. [19-1257] CLERK'S NOTE: Additional attachments must be filed separately. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (BFB) [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:25 PM]

Open Restricted Document #2

BRIEF tendered by Appellants Bahig F. Bishay and Mary T. Bishay. [19-1257] CLERK'S NOTE: Additional attachments must be filed separately. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (BFB) [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:25 PM]

Open Restricted Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 60 (Electronic Order entered on April 9, 2019 by Judge Sorokin granting [59] Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis). [19-1257] (GK) [Entered: 04/29/2019 09:02 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: John E. McCann, III for Merrill Lynch Credit Corp.. [19-1257] (GRC) [Entered: 04/25/2019 04:51 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 04/19/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: John E. McCann, III for Merrill Lynch Credit Corp.. [19-1257] (GRC) [Entered: 04/05/2019 03:51 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Kimberly Suzanne Budd, Elspeth B. Cypher, Ralph D. Gants, Frank M. Gaziano, Scott Kafker, Barbara A. Lenk, David A. Lowy and SJC filed by Attorney Elizabeth Kaplan. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1257] (EAK) [Entered: 03/28/2019 03:13 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Merrill Lynch Credit Corp. filed by Attorney Connie Flores Jones. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1257] (CFJ) [Entered: 03/27/2019 12:08 PM]

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Bahig F. Bishay. Certificate of service dated 03/25/2019. [19-1257] (BFB) [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:54 AM]

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for leave to file oversized brief filed by Appellants Bahig F. Bishay and Mary T. Bishay. Certificate of service dated 05/06/2019. [19-1257] (GRC) [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEF tendered by Appellants Bahig F. Bishay and Mary T. Bishay. [19-1257] CLERK'S NOTE: Additional attachments must be filed separately. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (BFB) [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Request to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal filed by Appellants Bahig F. Bishay and Mary T. Bishay was granted in the district court by order dated 04/09/2019. [19-1257] (GK) [Entered: 04/29/2019 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 60 (Electronic Order entered on April 9, 2019 by Judge Sorokin granting [59] Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis). [19-1257] (GK) [Entered: 04/29/2019 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: John E. McCann, III for Merrill Lynch Credit Corp.. [19-1257] (GRC) [Entered: 04/25/2019 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. After 04/19/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: John E. McCann, III for Merrill Lynch Credit Corp.. [19-1257] (GRC) [Entered: 04/05/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Kimberly Suzanne Budd, Elspeth B. Cypher, Ralph D. Gants, Frank M. Gaziano, Scott Kafker, Barbara A. Lenk, David A. Lowy and SJC filed by Attorney Elizabeth Kaplan. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1257] (EAK) [Entered: 03/28/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Merrill Lynch Credit Corp. filed by Attorney Connie Flores Jones. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1257] (CFJ) [Entered: 03/27/2019 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and appendix due 05/06/2019 for appellant Bahig F. Bishay and Mary T. Bishay. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1257] (GRC) [Entered: 03/26/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Bahig F. Bishay. Certificate of service dated 03/25/2019. [19-1257] (BFB) [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #51) filed by Appellants Bahig F. Bishay and Mary T. Bishay. Fee due 04/01/2019. [19-1257] (GRC) [Entered: 03/18/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less