Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2020 at 06:32:51 (UTC).

Bilal Muhammad v. Richard Wiles, et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 Bilal Muhammad filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Richard Wiles. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-50279

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DAVID STOUT

RICARDO SAMANIEGO

EL PASO COUNTY

CARLOS LEON

ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, L.L.C.

JOHN DOE 1-125

DELIA GOMEZ

CARL ROBINSON

JOHN HANNER

ERIC FOSS

JOANNE BERNAL

KEVIN LANAHAN

ARAMARK SERVICES, INCORPORATED

VINCENT PEREZ

RICHARD WILES

MARCO VARGAS

Plaintiff / Appellant

BILAL MUHAMMAD

El Paso, TX 79938-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

John E. Untereker

Attorney at County Attorney's Office

500 E. San Antonio Avenue

El Paso, TX 79901-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Bilal Muhammad

Attorney at El Paso County Jail Annex

12501 Montana Avenue

El Paso, TX 79938-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9328835-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-50279] (LEF) [Entered: 06/05/2020 03:24 PM]

Open Document

CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9323450-2] NOA filed on 5/26/2020, by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad. [9323450-1] [20-50279] (MVM) [Entered: 05/29/2020 03:33 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9321804-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-50279] (CB) [Entered: 05/28/2020 09:03 AM]

Open Document

CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9317804-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad. [9317804-1] [20-50279] (RLL) [Entered: 05/21/2020 10:29 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad [ # 9316783-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 07/15/2020 for Appellant Bilal Muhammad [20-50279] (CNF) [Entered: 05/20/2020 08:34 AM]

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #1

Unfiled Motion

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad to extend time to file brief as appellant [9316783-2]. [20-50279] (CNF) [Entered: 05/20/2020 08:33 AM]

Open Document #2

MOT-1 Letter

Open Document

CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9301335-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad. [9301335-1] [20-50279] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/27/2020 11:37 AM]

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #1

Unfiled Motion

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad for injunction pending appeal [9298010-2]. [20-50279] (CNF) [Entered: 04/21/2020 03:01 PM]

Open Document

LETTER filed by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad referencing his appeal and motions. [20-50279] (CNF) [Entered: 04/21/2020 11:56 AM]

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad to expedite the appeal [9295782-2]. [20-50279] (CNF) [Entered: 04/17/2020 01:21 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9293181-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee or motion for IFP in DC due on 06/08/2020 for Appellant Bilal Muhammad [20-50279] (LEF) [Entered: 04/14/2020 04:17 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad advising transcript unnecessary [20-50279] (CNF) [Entered: 04/13/2020 03:24 PM]

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad [20-50279] (RSM) [Entered: 04/07/2020 03:54 PM]

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9328835-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-50279] (LEF) [Entered: 06/05/2020 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9323450-2] NOA filed on 5/26/2020, by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad. [9323450-1] [20-50279] (MVM) [Entered: 05/29/2020 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:19-CV-367. Supplemental Electronic ROA due on 06/12/2020. [20-50279] (CB) [Entered: 05/28/2020 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9321804-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-50279] (CB) [Entered: 05/28/2020 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9317804-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad. [9317804-1] [20-50279] (RLL) [Entered: 05/21/2020 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad [ # 9316783-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 07/15/2020 for Appellant Bilal Muhammad [20-50279] (CNF) [Entered: 05/20/2020 08:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the motion to bar appellee's brief received from Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad because the briefing notice as ordered by this Court will not be expand interrupted [20-50279] (CNF) [Entered: 05/28/2020 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad to extend time to file brief as appellant [9316783-2]. [20-50279] (CNF) [Entered: 05/20/2020 08:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad to appoint counsel [9316764-2]. [20-50279] (CNF) [Entered: 05/20/2020 08:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:19-CV-367. Electronic ROA due on 05/27/2020. [20-50279] (LEF) [Entered: 05/12/2020 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: to advise appellant the status of his appeal [20-50279] (CNF) [Entered: 05/07/2020 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad to protect him from Judge Cardone's illegal actions and remove documents from record [9308768-2]. Date of service: 04/23/2020 [20-50279] (CNF) [Entered: 05/07/2020 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9301335-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad. [9301335-1] [20-50279] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/27/2020 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the estoppel motion received from Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad because we cannot determine what relief appellant is seeking within this document [20-50279] (CNF) [Entered: 04/21/2020 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad for injunction pending appeal [9298010-2]. [20-50279] (CNF) [Entered: 04/21/2020 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER filed by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad referencing his appeal and motions. [20-50279] (CNF) [Entered: 04/21/2020 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad to expedite the appeal [9295782-2]. [20-50279] (CNF) [Entered: 04/17/2020 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9293181-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee or motion for IFP in DC due on 06/08/2020 for Appellant Bilal Muhammad [20-50279] (LEF) [Entered: 04/14/2020 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad advising transcript unnecessary [20-50279] (CNF) [Entered: 04/13/2020 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Bilal Muhammad [20-50279] (RSM) [Entered: 04/07/2020 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where El Paso County is a litigant

Latest cases where Aramark Correctional Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Aramark Services, Inc. is a litigant