This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2020 at 06:40:56 (UTC).

Bey v. City of New York

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 Bey filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of New York. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-456

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Steven Seymour

Clyde Phillips

Salik Bey

Terrel Joseph

Defendant / Appellants

Karen Hurwitz

City of New York

John and Jane Doe 1-10

Shenecia Beecher

New York City Fire Department

Fire Commissioner Daniel A. Nigro

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Tahanie A. Aboushi Esq.

Attorney at The Aboushi Law Firm, PLLC

1441 Broadway

New York, NY 10018

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

James Edward Johnson Esq.

Attorney at Corporation Counsel of the City of New York

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Other Attorneys

Aymen Aboushi Esq.

Attorney at The Aboushi Law Firm, PLLC

1441 Broadway

New York, NY 10018

Richard Paul Dearing Esq.

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

David Alan Rosinus Esq. Jr.

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Nicolas Y. Riley

Attorney at Georgetown University Law Center

600 New Jersey Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Devin Slack

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#86

(#86) NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[2807943] [20-650] [Entered: 03/24/2020 01:34 PM]

#80

(#80) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [79], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Salik Bey, Terrel Joseph, Clyde Phillips and Steven Seymour, FILED.[2807323] [20-456] [Entered: 03/23/2020 04:29 PM]

#77

(#77) NOTICE, to Appellee-Cross-Appellant Salik Bey, Terrel Joseph, Clyde Phillips and Steven Seymour , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2807178] [20-456] [Entered: 03/23/2020 02:56 PM]

#74

(#74) NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[2807167] [20-456] [Entered: 03/23/2020 02:45 PM]

#64

No Description Available

#30

No Description Available

25 #1

Motion FILED

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#4

(#5) ATTORNEY, D. Alan Rosinus, Jr, [ # 4 ], in place of attorney James E. Johnson, SUBSTITUTED.[2773197] [20-456] [Entered: 02/07/2020 03:36 PM]

#4

No Description Available

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[2807943] [20-650] [Entered: 03/24/2020 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 81 ], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Salik Bey, Terrel Joseph, Clyde Phillips and Steven Seymour, FILED.[2807562] [20-456] [Entered: 03/24/2020 08:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docket(#82) ATTORNEY, Aymen Aboushi for Clyde Phillips Salik Bey Terrel Joseph Steven Seymour, in case 20-650, [ # 2807292-2 ], ADDED.[2807500] [20-650] [Entered: 03/23/2020 06:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Salik Bey, Terrel Joseph, Clyde Phillips and Steven Seymour, FILED. Service date 03/23/2020 by CM/ECF.[2807426] [20-456] [Entered: 03/23/2020 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [79], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Salik Bey, Terrel Joseph, Clyde Phillips and Steven Seymour, FILED.[2807323] [20-456] [Entered: 03/23/2020 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docket(#79) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Salik Bey, Terrel Joseph, Clyde Phillips and Steven Seymour, FILED. Service date 03/23/2020 by CM/ECF.[2807301] [20-456] [Entered: 03/23/2020 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee Shenecia Beecher, City of New York, Karen Hurwitz, New York City Fire Department and Daniel A. Nigro Brief due date as 05/19/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 05/19/2020, FILED.[2807189] [20-456] [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) NOTICE, to Appellee-Cross-Appellant Salik Bey, Terrel Joseph, Clyde Phillips and Steven Seymour , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2807178] [20-456] [Entered: 03/23/2020 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[2807167] [20-456] [Entered: 03/23/2020 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) ORDER, dated 03/23/2020, dismissing appeal by 04/06/2020 unless Apellanys Salik Bey, Terrel Joseph, Clyde Phillips, Steven Seymour submits Acknowledgement and Notice of Appearance form, FILED.[2807162] [20-650] [Entered: 03/23/2020 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY, Richard Paul Dearing for Shenecia Beecher City of New York New York City Fire Department Karen Hurwitz Daniel A. Nigro, in case 20-456, [7], ADDED.[2773920] [20-456] [Entered: 02/10/2020 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [6], on behalf of Appellee Salik Bey, Terrel Joseph, Clyde Phillips and Steven Seymour, FILED.[2773845] [20-456] [Entered: 02/10/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, New York City Fire Department, Karen Hurwitz, Shenecia Beecher and Daniel A. Nigro, FILED. Service date 02/07/2020 by CM/ECF. [2773378] [20-456] [Entered: 02/07/2020 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant New York City Fire Department, City of New York, Shenecia Beecher, Karen Hurwitz and Daniel A. Nigro, FILED. Service date 02/07/2020 by CM/ECF. [2773357] [20-456] [Entered: 02/07/2020 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Steven Seymour, Clyde Phillips, Terrel Joseph and Salik Bey, FILED. Service date 02/07/2020 by CM/ECF. [2773325] [20-456] [Entered: 02/07/2020 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY, D. Alan Rosinus, Jr, [ # 4 ], in place of attorney James E. Johnson, SUBSTITUTED.[2773197] [20-456] [Entered: 02/07/2020 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, Karen Hurwitz, New York City Fire Department, Daniel A. Nigro and Shenecia Beecher, FILED. Service date 02/07/2020 by CM/ECF. [2772777] [20-456] [Entered: 02/07/2020 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2771021] [20-456] [Entered: 02/05/2020 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM, ORDER, JUDGMENT, STAY, dated 01/30/2020, RECEIVED.[2771014] [20-456] [Entered: 02/05/2020 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Shenecia Beecher, City of New York, Karen Hurwitz, John and Jane Doe 1-10, New York City Fire Department and Daniel A. Nigro, FILED. [2770971] [20-456] [Entered: 02/05/2020 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less