This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 05:31:20 (UTC).

Beverly Oaks Physicians Surgic v. Blue Cross & Blue Shield of IL, et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2019 Beverly Oaks Physicians Surgic filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Blue Cross Blue Shield of IL. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55820

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DOES, 1 through 100

BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS

Plaintiff / Appellant

BEVERLY OAKS PHYSICIANS SURGICAL CENTER, LLC, A California Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Richard D. Williams Esquire

Attorney at Williams Law Firm PC

1539 Westwood Boulevard, Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Amir Shlesinger Esquire

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/25/2019. Appellant Beverly Oaks Physicians Surgical Center, LLC opening brief due 09/16/2019. Appellees Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and Does answering brief due 10/15/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11367610] (JBS) [Entered: 07/18/2019 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.