This case was last updated from PACER on 03/21/2021 at 06:00:43 (UTC).

Betteroads Asphalt, LLC, et al v. Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 Betteroads Asphalt, LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Banco Popular de Puerto Rico. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1047

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Debtors

BETTEROADS ASPHALT, LLC

BETTERECYCLING CORPORATION

Appellees

ST. JAMES SECURITY, INC.

CHAMPION PETROLEUM, INC.

CONTROL FORCE, CORP.

PUERTO RICO ASPHALT, LLC

ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT BANK FOR PUERTO RICO

PUERTO RICO GAS AND PETROLEUM, LLC

FACSIMILE PAPER CONNECTION, INC.

BANCO SANTANDER DE PUERTO RICO

BANCO POPULAR DE PUERTO RICO

FIRST BANK PUERTO RICO, INC.

SARGEANT TRADING LIMITED

SARGEANT MARINE, INC.

FACSIMIL PAPER CONNECTION, INC.

Interested Parties

US BANKRUPTCY COURT, PUERTO RICO

MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS

San Juan, PR 00902-4003

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Wigberto Lugo Mender

Attorney at Lugo Mender Group LLC

100 Carr 165, Ste 501

Guaynabo, PR 00968-8052

Alexis Alberto Betancourt Vincenty

Attorney at Lugo Mender Group LLC

100 Carr 165, Ste 501

Guaynabo, PR 00968-8052

Appellee Attorneys

Alexis Fuentes-Hernandez

Attorney at Fuentes Law Offices LLC

Po Box 9022726

San Juan, PR 00902-2726

Israel Oscar Alicea-Luciano

239 Arterial Hostos Ave, Capital Center Bldg

San Juan, PR 00918

Myrna L. Ruiz Olmo

Attorney at MRO Attorneys at Law, LLC

Po Box 367819

San Juan, PR 00936-7819

Ignacio J. Labarca-Morales

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Ivan Garau-Gonzalez

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Carolina Velaz-Rivero

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Valerie M. Blay-Soler

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Mauricio Oscar Muniz-Luciano

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Luis C. Marini-Biaggi

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Charles A. Cuprill-Hernandez

Attorney at Charles A. Cuprill PSC

356 Fortaleza St., 2Nd Floor

San Juan, PR 00901-0000

Fausto David Godreau-Zayas

Attorney at Latimer Biaggi Rachid & Godreau LLP

Po Box 9022512

San Juan, PR 00902-2512

Rafael Antonio Gonzalez-Valiente

Attorney at Latimer Biaggi Rachid & Godreau LLP

Po Box 9022512

San Juan, PR 00902-2512

Gustavo A. Chico-Barris

Attorney at Ferraiuoli LLC

Po Box 195168

San Juan, PR 00919-5168

Sonia Colon-Colon

Attorney at Ferraiuoli LLC

390 N Orange Ave

Orlando, FL 32801

Camille N. Somoza-Castello

Attorney at Ferraiuoli LLC

Po Box 195168

San Juan, PR 00919-5168

Jordi Guso Berger

Attorney at Berger Singerman LLP

1450 Brickell Ave, Ste 1900

Miami, FL 33131

Sonia E. Colon-Colon

Attorney at Ferraiuoli LLC

390 N Orange Ave

Orlando, FL 32801

Interested Party Attorney

Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas

Attorney at US Trustees Office

Po Box 9024003

San Juan, PR 00902-4003

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 02/26/2021, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless she registers for an appellate ECF account: Sonia Colon-Colon for Sargeant Marine, Inc. and Sargeant Trading Limited. [21-1047] (AL) [Entered: 02/12/2021 05:29 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander De Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico and First Bank Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Attorney Luis C. Marini-Biaggi. Certificate of service dated 02/03/2021. [21-1047] (LCM) [Entered: 02/03/2021 08:22 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander De Puerto Rico, First Bank Puerto Rico, Inc. and Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Ignacio J. Labarca-Morales. Certificate of service dated 02/02/2021. [21-1047] (IJL) [Entered: 02/02/2021 08:13 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander De Puerto Rico, First Bank Puerto Rico, Inc. and Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Carolina Velaz-Rivero. Certificate of service dated 02/02/2021. [21-1047] (CV) [Entered: 02/02/2021 08:09 PM]

Open Document #2

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Betteroads Asphalt, LLC and Betterecycling Corporation. Certificate of service dated 02/02/2021. [21-1047] (AAB) [Entered: 02/02/2021 02:40 PM]

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Betteroads Asphalt, LLC and Betterecycling Corporation filed by Attorney Wigberto Lugo Mender. Certificate of service dated 02/01/2021. [21-1047] (WL) [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:39 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Betteroads Asphalt, LLC and Betterecycling Corporation filed by Attorney Alexis A. Betancourt Vincenty. Certificate of service dated 02/01/2021. [21-1047] (AAB) [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:29 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 04/19/2021 for appellant Betterecycling Corporation and Betteroads Asphalt, LLC. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [21-1047] (AL) [Entered: 03/09/2021 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 02/26/2021, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless she registers for an appellate ECF account: Sonia Colon-Colon for Sargeant Marine, Inc. and Sargeant Trading Limited. [21-1047] (AL) [Entered: 02/12/2021 05:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander De Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico and First Bank Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Attorney Luis C. Marini-Biaggi. Certificate of service dated 02/03/2021. [21-1047] (LCM) [Entered: 02/03/2021 08:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander De Puerto Rico, First Bank Puerto Rico, Inc. and Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Ignacio J. Labarca-Morales. Certificate of service dated 02/02/2021. [21-1047] (IJL) [Entered: 02/02/2021 08:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander De Puerto Rico, First Bank Puerto Rico, Inc. and Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico filed by Attorney Carolina Velaz-Rivero. Certificate of service dated 02/02/2021. [21-1047] (CV) [Entered: 02/02/2021 08:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Betteroads Asphalt, LLC and Betterecycling Corporation. Certificate of service dated 02/02/2021. [21-1047] (AAB) [Entered: 02/02/2021 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Betteroads Asphalt, LLC and Betterecycling Corporation filed by Attorney Wigberto Lugo Mender. Certificate of service dated 02/01/2021. [21-1047] (WL) [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Betteroads Asphalt, LLC and Betterecycling Corporation filed by Attorney Alexis A. Betancourt Vincenty. Certificate of service dated 02/01/2021. [21-1047] (AAB) [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #91) filed by. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 02/03/2021. [21-1047] (KPC) [Entered: 01/20/2021 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Facsimil Paper Connection, Inc. is a litigant