This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/30/2022 at 06:01:05 (UTC).

Berube v. Assurant Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 Berube filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Assurant Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1505

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendant

GEICO

Plaintiff / Appellant

PAULINE BERUBE

Fall River, MA 02720

Defendant / Appellee

ASSURANT INC., a/k/a American Security Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

James T. Huggard

Attorney at Burns & Farrey, P.C.

76 Westminster St.

Providence, RI 02903

Mark P. Dolan

Attorney at Rice Dolan & Kershaw

72 Pine St, Ste 300

Providence, RI 02903-0000

Thomas B. Farrey

Attorney at Burns & Farrey PC

446 Main St, 22Nd Flr

Worcester, MA 01608-0000

James Patrick McLarnon Jr.

Attorney at Burns & Farrey PC

446 Main St, 22Nd Flr

Worcester, MA 01608-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Pauline Berube

4001 North Main St, Apt 515

Fall River, MA 02720

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Assurant Inc. filed by Attorney Thomas B. Farrey, III. Served on 07/20/2022. [22-1505] (TBF) [Entered: 07/20/2022 10:07 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Assurant Inc. filed by Attorney James P. McLarnon, Jr.. Served on 07/21/2022. [22-1505] (JPM) [Entered: 07/21/2022 09:58 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 08/25/2022, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: James T. Huggard for Assurant Inc. and Geico. [22-1505] (GRC) [Entered: 08/11/2022 04:45 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Pauline Berube. Served on 08/23/2022. [22-1505] (GRC) [Entered: 08/24/2022 04:01 PM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney James T. Huggard for Appellee Assurant Inc. and Not Party Geico. Copy of notice issued August 11, 2022. Forwarding address unknown. [22-1505] (ATC) [Entered: 08/26/2022 10:57 AM]

Open Document

ORDER entered by Gustavo A. Gelpi, Jr., Appellate Judge. Plaintiff moves the court to appoint counsel in this civil appeal. Though this court has discretion to appoint pro bono counsel in civil matters, there is no constitutional or statutory right to counsel. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e); King v. Greenblatt , 149 F.3d 9, 14 (1st Cir. 1998) (no constitutional right to counsel in a civil case). We conclude that appointment is not warranted in this case. The motion to appoint counsel is therefore denied. The time for plaintiff to file her brief is hereby extended to thirty days from the date of this order. [22-1505] (GB) [Entered: 08/25/2022 04:46 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered by Gustavo A. Gelpi, Jr., Appellate Judge. Plaintiff moves the court to appoint counsel in this civil appeal. Though this court has discretion to appoint pro bono counsel in civil matters, there is no constitutional or statutory right to counsel. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e); King v. Greenblatt , 149 F.3d 9, 14 (1st Cir. 1998) (no constitutional right to counsel in a civil case). We conclude that appointment is not warranted in this case. The motion to appoint counsel is therefore denied. The time for plaintiff to file her brief is hereby extended to thirty days from the date of this order. [22-1505] (GB) [Entered: 08/25/2022 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned as undeliverable to Attorney James T. Huggard for Appellee Assurant Inc. and Not Party Geico. Copy of notice issued August 11, 2022. Forwarding address unknown. [22-1505] (ATC) [Entered: 08/26/2022 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Pauline Berube. Served on 08/23/2022. [22-1505] (GRC) [Entered: 08/24/2022 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 08/25/2022, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: James T. Huggard for Assurant Inc. and Geico. [22-1505] (GRC) [Entered: 08/11/2022 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Assurant Inc. filed by Attorney James P. McLarnon, Jr.. Served on 07/21/2022. [22-1505] (JPM) [Entered: 07/21/2022 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Assurant Inc. filed by Attorney Thomas B. Farrey, III. Served on 07/20/2022. [22-1505] (TBF) [Entered: 07/20/2022 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 08/23/2022 for appellant Pauline Berube. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [22-1505] (GRC) [Entered: 07/14/2022 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #51) filed by Appellant Pauline Berube. [22-1505]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GRC) [Entered: 07/01/2022 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Assurant, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Geico is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark P. Dolan, Jr.