This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2020 at 06:05:15 (UTC).

Bert Thompson v. Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder, et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 Bert Thompson filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-56460

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS, LLP

DOES, 1 through 10 inclusive

MORTGAGE PASS THRU CERTIFICATES

NCI BY SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, its attorney in fact, all persons unknown, claiming any legal or quitable right, title, estate, lien, or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to plaintiff's title

LSI TITLE COMPANY

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, as Trustee for HSI Asset Securitization Trust 2007-NCI

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

AMERICA'S SERVICING COMPANY

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVING, its attorney in fact, all persons unknown, claiming any legal or quitable right, title, estate, hen, or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to plaintiff's title, or any cloud on plaintiff's title ther

Plaintiff / Appellant

BERT THOMPSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

James Thomas Lee

Attorney at Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP

20955 Pathfinder Road

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

Brian S. Edwards Esquire

Attorney at Fidelity National Law Group

4 Executive Circle, Suite 270

Irvine, CA 92614

Andrew Jonathan Mase

Attorney at Ryan Firm

30 Corporate Park, Suite 310

Irvine, CA 92606

Timothy M. Ryan Esquire

Attorney at Ryan Firm

30 Corporate Park, Suite 310

Irvine, CA 92606

Edward D. Vogel Esquire

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

501 West Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

J. Barrett Marum Esquire

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

501 West Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Richard Lawrence Antognini

Attorney at Law Office of Richard L. Antognini

2036 Nevada City Highway, Suite 636

Grass Valley, CA 95945

 

Court Documents

1 #5

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11543208] (LW) [Entered: 12/24/2019 09:57 AM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 01/28/2020, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11561844] (BLS) [Entered: 01/14/2020 01:28 PM]

1 #3

Mediation Letter

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Bert Thompson Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/30/2019. [11547341] [19-56460] (Antognini, Richard) [Entered: 12/30/2019 08:01 PM]

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11590249] (BLS) [Entered: 02/07/2020 03:56 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11590249] (BLS) [Entered: 02/07/2020 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 01/28/2020, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11561844] (BLS) [Entered: 01/14/2020 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • (#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/30/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11547377]. [19-56460] (AD) [Entered: 12/31/2019 06:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Bert Thompson Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/30/2019. [11547341] [19-56460] (Antognini, Richard) [Entered: 12/30/2019 08:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11543208] (LW) [Entered: 12/24/2019 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Bert Thompson Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/23/2019. Transcript ordered by 01/13/2020. Transcript due 02/11/2020. Appellant Bert Thompson opening brief due 03/23/2020. Appellees America's Servicing Company, Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Does, LSI Title Company, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Mortgage Pass Thru Certificates, NCI by Specialized Loan Servicing, Specialized Loan Serving and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answering brief due 04/22/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11533011] (JBS) [Entered: 12/16/2019 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.