This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/15/2019 at 06:07:50 (UTC).

Berkeley County School Distric v. Scott Pokorney

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 Berkeley County School Distric filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Scott Pokorney. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1170

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Defendants

HUB INTERNATIONAL SOUTHEAST

HUB INTERNATIONAL MIDWEST LIMITED

STANLEY J. POKORNEY

HUB INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

KNAUFF INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.

BRANTLEY THOMAS

Plaintiff / Appellee

BERKELEY COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendant / Appellant

SCOTT POKORNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jeffrey A. Breit

Attorney at BREIT DRESCHER IMPREVENTO PC

600 22Nd Street

Virginia Beach, VA 23451

Joshua S. Whitley

Attorney at SMYTH WHITLEY, LLC

126 Seven Farms Drive

Charleston, SC 29492

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Robert H. Jordan

Attorney at PARKER, POE, ADAMS & BERNSTEIN, LLP

200 Meeting Street

Charleston, SC 29401-0000

Amanda C. Williams

Attorney at PARKER, POE, ADAMS & BERNSTEIN, LLP

200 Meeting Street

Charleston, SC 29401-0000

 

Court Documents

#2

#1

#26

#25

#24

#23

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

#12

#11

#10

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • (#25) Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 23 ] by HUB International Limited and HUB International Midwest Limited in 19-1158, Scott Pokorney in 19-1170, Stanley J. Pokorney in 19-1171. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [1]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [397]. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 03/27/2019. [1000484515] [19-1158, 19-1170, 19-1171] KS [Entered: 03/29/2019 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • (#24) Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 22 ] by HUB International Limited and HUB International Midwest Limited in 19-1158, Scott Pokorney in 19-1170, Stanley J. Pokorney in 19-1171. Number of pages: [74]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 03/27/2019. [1000484513] [19-1158, 19-1170, 19-1171] KS [Entered: 03/29/2019 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by HUB International Limited, HUB International Midwest Limited and Berkeley County School District in 19-1158, Scott Pokorney and Berkeley County School District in 19-1170, Stanley J. Pokorney and Berkeley County School District in 19-1171. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 03/27/2019. [1000482344] [19-1158, 19-1170, 19-1171] Thomas Wiegand [Entered: 03/26/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) BRIEF by HUB International Limited and HUB International Midwest Limited in 19-1158, Scott Pokorney in 19-1170, Stanley J. Pokorney in 19-1171 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/27/2019. [1000482332] [19-1158, 19-1170, 19-1171] Thomas Wiegand [Entered: 03/26/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christy Ford Allen for HUB International Limited and HUB International Midwest Limited in 19-1158. [1000469025] [19-1158, 19-1170, 19-1171] Christy Allen [Entered: 03/04/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John A. Massalon for HUB International Limited and HUB International Midwest Limited in 19-1158. [1000469006] [19-1158, 19-1170, 19-1171] John Massalon [Entered: 03/04/2019 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Stanley J. Pokorney in 19-1171. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000465798] [19-1171, 19-1158, 19-1170] Deborah Barbier [Entered: 02/27/2019 08:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Deborah B. Barbier for Stanley J. Pokorney in 19-1171. [1000465796] [19-1171, 19-1158, 19-1170] Deborah Barbier [Entered: 02/27/2019 08:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Amanda C. Williams for Scott Pokorney in 19-1170. [1000465639] [19-1170, 19-1158, 19-1171] Amanda Williams [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Scott Pokorney. [19-1170] Robert Jordan [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thomas J. Wiegand for HUB International Limited and HUB International Midwest Limited in 19-1158. [1000465260] [19-1158, 19-1170, 19-1171] Thomas Wiegand [Entered: 02/26/2019 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by HUB International Limited in 19-1158. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000465258] [19-1158, 19-1170, 19-1171] Thomas Wiegand [Entered: 02/26/2019 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Amended DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by HUB International Midwest Limited in 19-1158. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000465256] [19-1158, 19-1170, 19-1171] Thomas Wiegand [Entered: 02/26/2019 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by HUB International Midwest Limited in 19-1158. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000465231] [19-1158, 19-1170, 19-1171]--[Edited 02/26/2019 by KS - see ECF 10] Thomas Wiegand [Entered: 02/26/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Berkeley County School District in 19-1158, 19-1170, 19-1171. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000458188] [19-1158, 19-1170, 19-1171] Jeffrey Breit [Entered: 02/14/2019 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jeffrey A. Breit for Berkeley County School District in 19-1158, 19-1170, 19-1171. [1000458182] [19-1158, 19-1170, 19-1171] Jeffrey Breit [Entered: 02/14/2019 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Joshua Steven Whitley, Thomas J. Wiegand, Amanda Coney Williams. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/26/2019. Response Brief due 04/25/2019. [19-1158, 19-1170, 19-1171] KS [Entered: 02/14/2019 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER filed [1000457761] consolidating cases 19-1170 and 19-1171 with 19-1158 (L). Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Joshua Steven Whitley, Thomas J. Wiegand, Amanda Coney Williams. [19-1158, 19-1170, 19-1171] KS [Entered: 02/14/2019 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 2:18-cv-00151-DCN-MGB. Mailed to: Joshua Steven Whitley, Amanda Coney Williams. [19-1170] KS [Entered: 02/14/2019 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:18-cv-00151-DCN-MGB. Case manager: KStump. [19-1170] KS [Entered: 02/14/2019 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Berkeley County School District is a litigant

Latest cases where HUB International LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where Hub International Midwest Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert H. Jordan