This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/16/2023 at 06:08:30 (UTC).

Berg Dental Offices PC v. Cincinnati Insurance Co, et al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 Berg Dental Offices PC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Cincinnati Insurance Co,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-3146

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

BERG DENTAL OFFICES PC, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellees

CINCINNATI INSURANCE CO

CINCINNATI CASUALTY CO

CINCINNATI INDEMNITY CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Kelly K. Iverson Esq.

Attorney at Lynch Carpenter

1133 Penn Avenue, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Gary F. Lynch Esq.

Attorney at Lynch Carpenter

1133 Penn Avenue, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Trisha A. Gill Esq.

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo

603 Stanwix Street, 10Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Daniel G. Litchfield Esq.

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo

303 West Madison Street, Suite 303

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER (Clerk) The actions at Nos. 22-3143, 22-3144, 22-3145, 22-3146, 22-3147, 22-3148, 22-3149, and 22-3150 are hereby consolidated for all purposes. The parties are advised that all case opening forms, motions, and briefs must be electronically filed in all cases on the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system. The appeals are stayed pursuant to the Court's order consolidating several similar appeals. This stay does not apply to certain case-opening obligations. See order for details. [22-3143, 22-3144, 22-3145, 22-3146, 22-3147, 22-3148, 22-3149, 22-3150] (CJG) [Entered: 11/17/2022 04:45 PM]

#1

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Order

1 #3

Opinion

1 #4

Caption

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Trisha A. Gill, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) The Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company and The Cincinnati Indemnity Company. [22-3143, 22-3144, 22-3145, 22-3146, 22-3147, 22-3148, 22-3149, 22-3150] (TAG) [Entered: 11/30/2022 09:45 AM]

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Cincinnati Casualty Co, Cincinnati Insurance Co and Cincinnati Indemnity Co in 22-3143, 22-3144, 22-3145, 22-3146, 22-3147, 22-3148, 22-3149, 22-3150. [22-3143, 22-3144, 22-3145, 22-3146, 22-3147, 22-3148, 22-3149, 22-3150] (TAG) [Entered: 11/30/2022 10:01 AM]

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel G. Litchfield on behalf of Appellee(s) The Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company and The Cincinnati Indemnity Company. [22-3143, 22-3144, 22-3145, 22-3146, 22-3147, 22-3148, 22-3149, 22-3150] (DGL) [Entered: 11/30/2022 10:34 AM]

#15

(#16) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Home Plate Concessions LLC, Sports/Facility LLC, Washco Ballpark Management LLC, Washington County Family Entertainment LLC and Washington Frontier League Baseball LLC in 22-3148 advising this court that transcripts are not needed. Barbara Metz Loch. [22-3148, 22-3143, 22-3144, 22-3145, 22-3146, 22-3147, 22-3149, 22-3150] (RJ) [Entered: 12/11/2022 09:47 PM]

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kelly K. Iverson on behalf of Appellant(s) Berg Dental Offices PC. [22-3146] (KKI) [Entered: 12/01/2022 11:43 AM]

#12

(#12) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Berg Dental Offices PC. [22-3146] (KKI) [Entered: 12/01/2022 11:45 AM]

13 #1

Concise Summary of the Case

13 #2

Amended Opinion

13 #3

Amended Order

#14

(#14) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Berg Dental Offices PC advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [22-3146] (KKI) [Entered: 12/01/2022 11:49 AM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Home Plate Concessions LLC, Sports/Facility LLC, Washco Ballpark Management LLC, Washington County Family Entertainment LLC and Washington Frontier League Baseball LLC in 22-3148 advising this court that transcripts are not needed. Barbara Metz Loch. [22-3148, 22-3143, 22-3144, 22-3145, 22-3146, 22-3147, 22-3149, 22-3150] (RJ) [Entered: 12/11/2022 09:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Berg Dental Offices PC. [22-3146] (KKI) [Entered: 12/01/2022 11:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Berg Dental Offices PC advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [22-3146] (KKI) [Entered: 12/01/2022 11:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Berg Dental Offices PC. [22-3146] (KKI) [Entered: 12/01/2022 11:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Berg Dental Offices PC. [22-3146] (KKI) [Entered: 12/01/2022 11:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kelly K. Iverson on behalf of Appellant(s) Berg Dental Offices PC. [22-3146] (KKI) [Entered: 12/01/2022 11:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel G. Litchfield on behalf of Appellee(s) The Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company and The Cincinnati Indemnity Company. [22-3143, 22-3144, 22-3145, 22-3146, 22-3147, 22-3148, 22-3149, 22-3150] (DGL) [Entered: 11/30/2022 10:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Cincinnati Casualty Co, Cincinnati Insurance Co and Cincinnati Indemnity Co in 22-3143, 22-3144, 22-3145, 22-3146, 22-3147, 22-3148, 22-3149, 22-3150. [22-3143, 22-3144, 22-3145, 22-3146, 22-3147, 22-3148, 22-3149, 22-3150] (TAG) [Entered: 11/30/2022 10:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Trisha A. Gill, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) The Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company and The Cincinnati Indemnity Company. [22-3143, 22-3144, 22-3145, 22-3146, 22-3147, 22-3148, 22-3149, 22-3150] (TAG) [Entered: 11/30/2022 09:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Clerk) The actions at Nos. 22-3143, 22-3144, 22-3145, 22-3146, 22-3147, 22-3148, 22-3149, and 22-3150 are hereby consolidated for all purposes. The parties are advised that all case opening forms, motions, and briefs must be electronically filed in all cases on the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system. The appeals are stayed pursuant to the Court's order consolidating several similar appeals. This stay does not apply to certain case-opening obligations. See order for details. [22-3143, 22-3144, 22-3145, 22-3146, 22-3147, 22-3148, 22-3149, 22-3150] (CJG) [Entered: 11/17/2022 04:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SLC) [Entered: 11/17/2022 02:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Berg Dental Offices PC in District Court No. 2-20-cv-01261. (SLC) [Entered: 11/17/2022 02:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Cincinnati Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where The Cincinnati Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant