21-5049
02/26/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Labor - Labor Standard
Benoit Brookens
Larhonda Gamble, President Local 12, AFGE, AFL-CIO
Billie Jo Agambar, Security Director, U.S. Department of Labor
Al Stewart, Acting U.S. Secretary of Labor
Local 12 American Federation of Government Employees
Martin J. Walsh, Acting U.S. Secretary of Labor
Benoit Brookens
Gony Frieder Goldberg
Gregory G. Watts
Rushab Sanghvi
R. Craig Lawrence
Paul Cirino
Exhibit C
Exhibit B
Exhibit A
Motion Filed
Exhibit B - Order on Reconsideration
Exhibit A -- Memorandum Opinion and Order
Motion Filed
form(s) sent
form(s) sent
form(s) sent
form(s) sent
Order Sent
Document Sent
Order Sent
DocketCONSOLIDATED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1895775] to motion for summary affirmance [ # 1894195-2 ], motion for summary affirmance [ # 1894135-2 ] styled as opposition to motions for summary reversal filed by Benoit Brookens [Service Date: 04/22/2021 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Length Certification: 2,378 words. [21-5049] [Entered: 04/23/2021 11:51 AM]
[-] Read LessDocketMOTION [1894195] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/22/2021) filed by Local 12 American Federation of Government Employees and Larhonda Gamble (Service Date: 04/12/2021 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail) Length Certification: 2,591 words. [21-5049] (Watts, Gregory) [Entered: 04/12/2021 04:35 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketMOTION [1894135] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/22/2021) filed by Billie Jo Agambar and Martin J. Walsh (Service Date: 04/12/2021 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 2,991 words. [21-5049] (Cirino, Paul) [Entered: 04/12/2021 01:25 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1892366] to intial submissions filed by Benoit Brookens. [21-5049] [Entered: 03/30/2021 04:44 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1892365] filed by Benoit Brookens. [21-5049] [Entered: 03/30/2021 04:42 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1892364] submitted by [Service Date: 03/26/2021] [21-5049] [Entered: 03/30/2021 04:41 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1892363] filed by Benoit Brookens [Service Date: 03/26/2021]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [21-5049] [Entered: 03/30/2021 04:41 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketSTATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1892362] filed by Benoit Brookens [Service Date: 03/26/2021] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [21-5049] [Entered: 03/30/2021 04:40 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1892361] filed by Benoit Brookens [Service Date: 03/26/2021] [21-5049] [Entered: 03/30/2021 04:39 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1892360] filed by Benoit Brookens [Service Date: 03/26/2021] [21-5049] [Entered: 03/30/2021 04:38 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1891947] filed by Gregory G. Watts and co-counsel Rushab Sanghvi on behalf of Appellees Larhonda Gamble and Local 12 American Federation of Government Employees. [21-5049] (Watts, Gregory) [Entered: 03/26/2021 02:28 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1891944] filed by Larhonda Gamble and Local 12 American Federation of Government Employees [Service Date: 03/26/2021 ] [21-5049] (Watts, Gregory) [Entered: 03/26/2021 02:26 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE [1890459] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for payment of docketing fee [Case Number 21-5049: Fee Paid] [21-5049] [Entered: 03/18/2021 11:41 AM]
[-] Read LessDocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1890623] filed by Benoit Brookens [Service Date: 03/12/2021 ] [21-5049] [Entered: 03/19/2021 10:04 AM]
[-] Read LessDocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1890622] received from Ben Brookens [signed for on 03/15/2021] for order [1887530-2] sent to Appellant Benoit Brookens [21-5049] [Entered: 03/19/2021 10:03 AM]
[-] Read LessDocketCERTIFIED MAIL and FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1887530] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3040 0001 1261 3240] of order [ # 1887478-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 03/29/2021 from Benoit Otis Brookens II. [21-5049] [Entered: 02/26/2021 04:52 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketCLERK'S ORDER [1887478] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 03/29/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 03/29/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 03/29/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 03/29/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 03/29/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 03/29/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 03/29/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 03/29/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 04/12/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 03/29/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 03/29/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 03/29/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 04/12/2021. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [21-5049] [Entered: 02/26/2021 03:09 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketCLERK'S ORDER [1887477] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 03/29/2021. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [21-5049] [Entered: 02/26/2021 03:01 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1887473] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-01740-CRC filed by Benoit Otis Brookens, II. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-5049. [21-5049] [Entered: 02/26/2021 02:55 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [21-5049] [Entered: 02/26/2021 02:54 PM]
[-] Read Less