This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/08/2021 at 06:03:09 (UTC).

Beniak Enterprises Inc v. Chubb Ltd, et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 Beniak Enterprises Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Chubb Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2683

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

CHUBB LTD

INDEMNITY INSURANCE CO OF NORTH AMERICA

Plaintiff / Appellant

BENIAK ENTERPRISES INC, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, DBA Benito Ristorante

Not Yet Classified

ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James E. Cecchi Esq.

Attorney at Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello

5 Becker Farm Road

Roseland, NJ 07068

Stuart A. Davidson Esq.

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd

120 East Palmetto Park Road, Suite 500

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Paul J. Geller Esq.

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd

120 East Palmetto Park Road, Suite 500

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Samuel H. Rudman Esq.

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd

58 South Service Road, Suite 200

Melville, NY 11747

Christopher A. Seeger Esq.

Attorney at Seeger Weiss

55 Challenger Road, 6Th Floor

Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660

Lindsey H. Taylor Esq.

Attorney at Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello

5 Becker Farm Road

Roseland, NJ 07068

Stephen A. Weiss Esq.

Attorney at Seeger Weiss

55 Challenger Road, 6Th Floor

Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Barbara M. Almeida Esq.

Attorney at Clyde & Co

340 Mount Kemble Avenue, Suite 300

Morristown, NJ 07960

Jeremy Girton Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers

1625 Eye Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Jonathan D. Hacker Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers

1625 Eye Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Daren S. McNally Esq.

Attorney at Clyde & Co

340 Mount Kemble Avenue, Suite 300

Morristown, NJ 07960

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Indemnity Insurance Co of North America. [21-2683] (DSM) [Entered: 10/15/2021 05:30 PM]

#15

(#15) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Barbara M. Almeida, Esq., Jeremy Girton, Esq., Jonathan D. Hacker, Esq. and Daren S. McNally, Esq. for Indemnity Insurance Co of North America requesting Corporate Disclosure Statement on or before 10/29/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 10/15/2021 02:11 PM]

#14

(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeremy Girton, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. [21-2683] (DSM) [Entered: 10/14/2021 01:12 PM]

#13

(#13) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan Hacker, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. [21-2683] (DSM) [Entered: 10/14/2021 01:11 PM]

#12

(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Barbara M. Almeida, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. [21-2683] (DSM) [Entered: 10/14/2021 01:09 PM]

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daren S. McNally, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. [21-2683] (DSM) [Entered: 10/14/2021 01:01 PM]

#10

(#10) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Daren S. McNally, Esq. for Indemnity Insurance Co of North America requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form and Disclosure Statement on or before 10/08/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 09/24/2021 01:31 PM]

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #2

District Court Opinion 8/26/21

#1

Civil Case Docketed

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Indemnity Insurance Co of North America. [21-2683] (DSM) [Entered: 10/15/2021 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Barbara M. Almeida, Esq., Jeremy Girton, Esq., Jonathan D. Hacker, Esq. and Daren S. McNally, Esq. for Indemnity Insurance Co of North America requesting Corporate Disclosure Statement on or before 10/29/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 10/15/2021 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeremy Girton, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. [21-2683] (DSM) [Entered: 10/14/2021 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan Hacker, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. [21-2683] (DSM) [Entered: 10/14/2021 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Barbara M. Almeida, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. [21-2683] (DSM) [Entered: 10/14/2021 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daren S. McNally, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. [21-2683] (DSM) [Entered: 10/14/2021 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Daren S. McNally, Esq. for Indemnity Insurance Co of North America requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form and Disclosure Statement on or before 10/08/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 09/24/2021 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Beniak Enterprises Inc advising this court that no transcripts are available. [21-2683] (LHT) [Entered: 09/13/2021 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Beniak Enterprises Inc. [21-2683] (LHT) [Entered: 09/13/2021 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Beniak Enterprises Inc. [21-2683] (LHT) [Entered: 09/13/2021 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Beniak Enterprises Inc. [21-2683] (LHT) [Entered: 09/13/2021 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James E. Cecchi on behalf of Appellant(s) Beniak Enterprises, Inc.. [21-2683] (JEC) [Entered: 09/13/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lindsey H. Taylor on behalf of Appellant(s) Beniak Enterprises, Inc.. [21-2683] (LHT) [Entered: 09/13/2021 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Clerk) staying the appeal pursuant to the Court's order consolidating several similar appeals. This stay does not apply to certain case-opening obligations. See order for details. (CJG) [Entered: 09/09/2021 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 09/09/2021 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Beniak Enterprises Inc in District Court No. 2-20-cv-05536. (CJG) [Entered: 09/09/2021 08:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chubb Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ACE American Insurance Company, a Pennsylvania corporation, and ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co., a Pennsylvania corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan D. Hacker