This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/20/2020 at 06:16:49 (UTC).

Benedith v. Department of Medicine Metro H

Case Summary

On 04/21/2020 Benedith filed an Other lawsuit against Department of Medicine Metro H. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1327

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Peter C. Benedith

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Defendant / Appellees

Department of Hematology/Oncology University Hospital, Cleveland OH

Department of Medicine Metro Health Medical Center, Cleveland OH

University Hospital, Cleveland OH

Metro Health Medical Center, Cleveland OH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Peter C. Benedith

819 Santee Street

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Daniel Adam Messeloff Esq.

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

75 Eisenhower Parkway

Roseland, NJ 07068

Victoria Vance Esq.

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

David Aaron Bernstein Esq.

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Department of Hematology/Oncology University Hospital, Department of Medicine Metro Health Medical Center, Metro Health Medical Center and University Hospital Brief due date as 07/31/2020, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2860342] [20-1327] [Entered: 06/12/2020 09:18 AM]

#32

(#32) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Department of Hematology/Oncology University Hospital, Department of Medicine Metro Health Medical Center, Metro Health Medical Center and University Hospital, informing Court of proposed due date 07/31/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 06/11/2020 by US mail.[2859417] [20-1327] [Entered: 06/11/2020 11:40 AM]

#30

(#30) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, brief and appendix[13], [12], on behalf of Appellant Peter C. Benedith, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2859276] [20-1327] [Entered: 06/11/2020 10:46 AM]

#29

(#29) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, copy to pro se appellant, ASSIGNED.[2859206] [20-1327] [Entered: 06/11/2020 10:27 AM]

25 #2

Certificate of Service of Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel

25 #1

Notice of Appearance for Additional or Substitute Counsel FILED

24 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

#16

No Description Available

#15

(#15) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Peter C. Benedith, FILED. Service date 05/16/2020 by US mail.[2841818] [20-1327] [Entered: 05/18/2020 04:51 PM]

#6

(#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2824500] [20-1327] [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:54 PM]

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/23/2020, RECEIVED.[2824485] [20-1327] [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:45 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/23/2020, RECEIVED.[2824481] [20-1327] [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:44 PM]

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Department of Hematology/Oncology University Hospital, Department of Medicine Metro Health Medical Center, Metro Health Medical Center and University Hospital Brief due date as 07/31/2020, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2860342] [20-1327] [Entered: 06/12/2020 09:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Department of Hematology/Oncology University Hospital, Department of Medicine Metro Health Medical Center, Metro Health Medical Center and University Hospital, informing Court of proposed due date 07/31/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 06/11/2020 by US mail.[2859417] [20-1327] [Entered: 06/11/2020 11:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, brief and appendix[13], [12], on behalf of Appellant Peter C. Benedith, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2859276] [20-1327] [Entered: 06/11/2020 10:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, copy to pro se appellant, ASSIGNED.[2859206] [20-1327] [Entered: 06/11/2020 10:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ATTORNEY, David Aaron Bernstein for Department of Hematology/Oncology University Hospital University Hospital Metro Health Medical Center Department of Medicine Metro Health Medical Center, in case 20-1327, [ # 25 ], ADDED.[2850893] [20-1327] [Entered: 05/29/2020 04:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Department of Hematology/Oncology University Hospital, Department of Medicine Metro Health Medical Center, Metro Health Medical Center and University Hospital, FILED. Service date 05/29/2020 by US mail. [2850222] [20-1327] [Entered: 05/29/2020 10:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Department of Hematology/Oncology University Hospital, Department of Medicine Metro Health Medical Center, Metro Health Medical Center and University Hospital, FILED. Service date 05/27/2020 by US mail.[2847937] [20-1327] [Entered: 05/27/2020 10:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ATTORNEY, Victoria Vance, [ # 20 ], in place of attorney Daniel Messeloff, SUBSTITUTED.[2847237] [20-1327] [Entered: 05/26/2020 03:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [ # 20 ], on behalf of Appellee Department of Hematology/Oncology University Hospital, Department of Medicine Metro Health Medical Center, Metro Health Medical Center and University Hospital, FILED.[2847235] [20-1327] [Entered: 05/26/2020 03:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Department of Hematology/Oncology University Hospital, Department of Medicine Metro Health Medical Center, Metro Health Medical Center and University Hospital, FILED. Service date 05/26/2020 by CM/ECF. [2847161] [20-1327] [Entered: 05/26/2020 02:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Peter C. Benedith, FILED. Service date 05/16/2020 by US mail.[2841818] [20-1327] [Entered: 05/18/2020 04:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • Docket(#13) APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-88), on behalf of Appellant Peter C. Benedith, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by No service.[2840044] [20-1327] [Entered: 05/15/2020 08:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • Docket(#12) BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Peter C. Benedith, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by US mail. [2840040] [20-1327] [Entered: 05/15/2020 08:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docket(#7) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Daniel Adam Messeloff, Esq. for Appellee Department of Medicine Metro Health Medical Center, Department of Hematology/Oncology University Hospital, Metro Health Medical Center and University Hospital, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2824507] [20-1327] [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2824500] [20-1327] [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2824491] [20-1327] [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Peter C. Benedith, district court receipt # 465401257612, FILED.[2824488] [20-1327] [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/23/2020, RECEIVED.[2824485] [20-1327] [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/23/2020, RECEIVED.[2824481] [20-1327] [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Peter C. Benedith, FILED. [2824473] [20-1327] [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Metro Health Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where University Hospitals of Cleveland Inc. OH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel A. Messeloff