This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2019 at 06:10:54 (UTC).

Lucy Sidberry v. Murphy-Brown, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Lucy Sidberry filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Murphy-Brown, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1375

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Plaintiff / Appellees

GERTIE JACOBS

LEOLA JACOBS

LENORA NICHOLSON

DIANE ARTIS

BEN ARTIS

EDDIE NICHOLSON

CLIFFORD NEWKIRK

JOHN TAYLOR

LENORA HOLMES

DONNIE MESSICK

PHYLLIS WRIGHT

ESTELLA WALKER

ETHEL NEWKIRK

JAMES HOLMES

ANNIE JACOBS

JAMES JACOBS

LUCY SIDBERRY

JOYCE MESSICK

JIMMY CARR

Defendant / Appellant

MURPHY-BROWN, LLC

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Mark P. Doby

Attorney at WALLACE & GRAHAM, PA

525 North Main Street

Salisbury, NC 28144-0000

Michael L. Kaeske Jr.

Attorney at KAESKE LAW FIRM

1301 West 25Th Street

Austin, TX 78705

Mona Lisa Wallace

Attorney at WALLACE & GRAHAM, PA

525 North Main Street

Salisbury, NC 28144-0000

John S. Hughes Esq.

Attorney at WALLACE & GRAHAM, PA

525 North Main Street

Salisbury, NC 28144-0000

Lynn Bradshaw

Attorney at KAESKE LAW FIRM

1301 West 25Th Street

Austin, TX 78705

Lisa Blue Baron

Attorney at BARON & BLUE

3300 Oak Lawn Avenue

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

James F. Neale

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

P. O. Box 1288

Charlottesville, VA 22902-0000

Michael William Stark

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

800 East Canal Street, P. O. Box 3916

Richmond, VA 23219

Christopher Edward Trible

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

800 East Canal Street, P. O. Box 3916

Richmond, VA 23219

Eugene Edward Mathews III

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

800 East Canal Street, P. O. Box 3916

Richmond, VA 23219

Mitchell Kirks Morris

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

919 East Main Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Christian E. Henneke

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

800 East Canal Street, P. O. Box 3916

Richmond, VA 23219

Tennille Jo Checkovich Esq.

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

800 East Canal Street, P. O. Box 3916

Richmond, VA 23219

Garrett H. Hooe

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

800 East Canal Street, P. O. Box 3916

Richmond, VA 23219

Jakarra Jenise Jones

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

800 East Canal Street, P. O. Box 3916

Richmond, VA 23219

Mark E. Anderson Esq.

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

P. O. Box 27507

Raleigh, NC 27611-7507

Stuart Alan Raphael

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Darin K. Waylett

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

800 East Canal Street, P. O. Box 3916

Richmond, VA 23219

Richard Charles Beaulieu

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

1230 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309-0000

Kevin Spencer Elliker

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

951 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER filed [1000526121] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 12/31/19. Number of days granted: 174. Opening brief and appendix due 12/31/2019. Response brief due 01/30/2020. Copies to all parties. [19-1375] TW [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:30 PM]

#9

(#9) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 07/10/2019. Response Brief due 08/09/2019 [19-1375] JHM [Entered: 05/31/2019 04:12 PM]

#8

(#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Murphy-Brown, LLC. [19-1375] Kevin Elliker [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:32 PM]

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Murphy-Brown, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000500064] [19-1375] Kevin Elliker [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:30 PM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by James Jacobs, Jimmy Carr, Lucy Sidberry, Joyce Messick, Willie Messick and Edna Allison. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000499475] [19-1375] Tillman Breckenridge [Entered: 04/24/2019 09:28 AM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tillman J. Breckenridge for James Jacobs, Jimmy Carr, Lucy Sidberry, Joyce Messick, Willie Messick and Edna Allison. [1000497202] [19-1375] Tillman Breckenridge [Entered: 04/20/2019 09:19 AM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kevin S. Elliker for Murphy-Brown, LLC. [1000493055] [19-1375] Kevin Elliker [Entered: 04/12/2019 01:40 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stuart A. Raphael for Murphy-Brown, LLC. [1000493049] [19-1375] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 04/12/2019 01:35 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 7:14-cv-00237-BR.. [19-1375] JHM [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:39 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:14-cv-00237-BR. Case manager: JMoore. [19-1375] JHM [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:49 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER filed [1000526121] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 12/31/19. Number of days granted: 174. Opening brief and appendix due 12/31/2019. Response brief due 01/30/2020. Copies to all parties. [19-1375] TW [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 07/10/2019. Response Brief due 08/09/2019 [19-1375] JHM [Entered: 05/31/2019 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Murphy-Brown, LLC. [19-1375] Kevin Elliker [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Murphy-Brown, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000500064] [19-1375] Kevin Elliker [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by James Jacobs, Jimmy Carr, Lucy Sidberry, Joyce Messick, Willie Messick and Edna Allison. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000499475] [19-1375] Tillman Breckenridge [Entered: 04/24/2019 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tillman J. Breckenridge for James Jacobs, Jimmy Carr, Lucy Sidberry, Joyce Messick, Willie Messick and Edna Allison. [1000497202] [19-1375] Tillman Breckenridge [Entered: 04/20/2019 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kevin S. Elliker for Murphy-Brown, LLC. [1000493055] [19-1375] Kevin Elliker [Entered: 04/12/2019 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stuart A. Raphael for Murphy-Brown, LLC. [1000493049] [19-1375] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 04/12/2019 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 7:14-cv-00237-BR.. [19-1375] JHM [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:14-cv-00237-BR. Case manager: JMoore. [19-1375] JHM [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Murphy-Brown LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Charles Beaulieu

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Garrett H. Hooe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tennille Jo Checkovich Esq.