This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/14/2022 at 06:01:51 (UTC).

Belo Plaintiffs v. BP Exploration & Production Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 Belo Plaintiffs filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-10099

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

BELO PLAINTIFFS

Defendant / Appellees

BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC

BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Dylan Boigris

Attorney at The Downs Law Group

3250 Mary St Ste 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Frank Jacob D'Amico

Attorney at Frank J. D'Amico APLC

622 Baronne St

New Orleans, LA 70113

Charles David Durkee

Attorney at The Downs Law Group

3250 Mary St Ste 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Jarrett S. Falcon

Attorney at Falcon Law Firm

5044 Lapalco Blvd

Marrero, LA 70072

Timothy John Falcon

Attorney at Falcon Law Firm

5044 Lapalco Blvd

Marrero, LA 70072

Gary L. Fuller

Attorney at The Nations Law Firm

3131 Briarpark Dr Ste 208

Houston, TX 77042

Patrick Russell Kirby

Attorney at The Nations Law Firm

3131 Briarpark Dr Ste 208

Houston, TX 77042

Jason Matthew Larey

Attorney at The Downs Law Group

3250 Mary St Ste 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Allen W. Lindsay Jr.

Attorney at Lindsay & Lindsay, PA

5218 Willing St

Milton, FL 32570

Jennifer L. Martin

Attorney at Falcon Law Firm

5044 Lapalco Blvd

Marrero, LA 70072

Howard L. Nations

Attorney at Howard L. Nations, PC

9703 Richmond Ave Ste 200

Houston, TX 77042

Daniel Robert Sanders

Attorney at Law Offices of Daniel R. Sanders

3298 Summit Blvd Ste 32

Pensacola, FL 32503

Jeremiah A. Sprague

Attorney at Falcon Law Firm

5044 Lapalco Blvd

Marrero, LA 70072

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ericson W. Enger

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy, LLC

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy Ste 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Jerry Dean Hamilton

Attorney at Hamilton Miller & Birthisel, LLP

150 Se 2Nd Ave Fl 12

Miami, FL 33131

Adrianne Katrine Jakola

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, LLP

300 N Lasalle St Ste 3800

Chicago, IL 60654

Vanessa Anne Barsanti

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, LLP

300 N Lasalle St Ste 3800

Chicago, IL 60654

Stefan G. Bourn

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy, LLC

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy Ste 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Lance Christian Bullock

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis

701 Poydras St Ste 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139

Richard M. Crump

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy, LLC

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy Ste 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

24 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER: Joint motion to stay the appeal pending this Courts issuance of a final decision in Causey v. BP Exploration & Production Inc. et al., No. 21-11548-DD is GRANTED. Appellants counsel is directed to file a status report every 30 days from the date of this order. Appellants brief will be due 30 days from a decision in appeal BP Exploration & Production Inc. et al., No. 21-11548-DD. [ # 9599315-2 ] AJ (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 03/01/2022 11:06 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by [22-10099] (ECF: Allen Lindsay) [Entered: 02/22/2022 10:50 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

MOTION to stay further appellate proceedings filed by BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc. Joint Stipulation of Parties. [9599315-1] [22-10099] (ECF: Kevin Hodges) [Entered: 02/15/2022 04:45 PM]

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Belo Plaintiffs. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/21/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. NOTICE INCLUDES CONSOLIDATED: appeal nos. 22-10099, 22-10101, 22-10102, 22-10103, 22-10105, 22-10107, 22-10108, 22-10109, 22-10111, 22-10112, 22-10113, 22-10114, 22-10115, 22-10116, 22-10118, 22-10119, 22-10120, 22-10121, 22-10122, 22-10123, 22-10124, 22-10125, 22-10127, 22-10128, 22-10129, 22-10130, 22-10131, 22-10133, and 22-10134. See 2/8/22, Order-"The parties and the Clerks Office are DIRECTED to docket all filings related to the Consolidated Appeals in only the main appeal, no. 22-10099." [Entered: 02/15/2022 10:55 AM]

Open Document #2

Appearance of counsel form not processed

Open Document #1

ATTY-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jarrett S. Falcon for Belo Plaintiffs. [22-10099] (ECF: Jeremiah Sprague) [Entered: 02/10/2022 05:57 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jeremiah A. Sprague for Appellant Belo Plaintiffs. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10099] (ECF: Jeremiah Sprague) [Entered: 02/10/2022 05:46 PM]

Open Document

Letter regarding consolidation of appeals filed by Attorney Kevin Michael Hodges for Appellees BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc. [22-10099] (ECF: Kevin Hodges) [Entered: 02/01/2022 09:46 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Youlin Yuan for BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company [22-10099] (ECF: Youlin Yuan) [Entered: 01/27/2022 06:03 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kevin M. Hodges for BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company [22-10099] (ECF: Kevin Hodges) [Entered: 01/27/2022 05:23 PM]

Open Document

Notice regarding consolidation of cases for appeal filed by Attorney Timothy John Falcon for Appellant Belo Plaintiffs. [22-10099] (ECF: Timothy Falcon) [Entered: 01/26/2022 03:25 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE to Parties [22-10116, 22-10099, 22-10101, 22-10102, 22-10103, 22-10105, 22-10107, 22-10108, 22-10109, 22-10111, 22-10112, 22-10113, 22-10114, 22-10115, 22-10118, 22-10119, 22-10120, 22-10121, 22-10122, 22-10123, 22-10124, 22-10125, 22-10127, 22-10128, 22-10129, 22-10130, 22-10131, 22-10133, 22-10134] [Entered: 01/18/2022 04:34 PM]

Open Document #4

DC R&R doc 359

Open Document #3

DC Order doc 387

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Joint motion to stay the appeal pending this Courts issuance of a final decision in Causey v. BP Exploration & Production Inc. et al., No. 21-11548-DD is GRANTED. Appellants counsel is directed to file a status report every 30 days from the date of this order. Appellants brief will be due 30 days from a decision in appeal BP Exploration & Production Inc. et al., No. 21-11548-DD. [ # 9599315-2 ] AJ (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 03/01/2022 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by [22-10099] (ECF: Allen Lindsay) [Entered: 02/22/2022 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 02/16/2022 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to stay further appellate proceedings filed by BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc. Joint Stipulation of Parties. [9599315-1] [22-10099] (ECF: Kevin Hodges) [Entered: 02/15/2022 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant Belo Plaintiffs. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/21/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. NOTICE INCLUDES CONSOLIDATED: appeal nos. 22-10099, 22-10101, 22-10102, 22-10103, 22-10105, 22-10107, 22-10108, 22-10109, 22-10111, 22-10112, 22-10113, 22-10114, 22-10115, 22-10116, 22-10118, 22-10119, 22-10120, 22-10121, 22-10122, 22-10123, 22-10124, 22-10125, 22-10127, 22-10128, 22-10129, 22-10130, 22-10131, 22-10133, and 22-10134. See 2/8/22, Order-"The parties and the Clerks Office are DIRECTED to docket all filings related to the Consolidated Appeals in only the main appeal, no. 22-10099." [Entered: 02/15/2022 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Jarrett S. Falcon for Belo Plaintiffs is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. [Entered: 02/11/2022 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Dylan Boigris for Belo Plaintiffs, Frank Jacob D'Amico for Belo Plaintiffs, Charles David Durkee for Belo Plaintiffs, Jarrett S. Falcon for Belo Plaintiffs, Timothy John Falcon for Belo Plaintiffs, Gary L. Fuller for Belo Plaintiffs, Patrick Russell Kirby for Belo Plaintiffs, Jason Matthew Larey for Belo Plaintiffs, Allen W. Lindsay, Jr. for Belo Plaintiffs, Jennifer L. Martin for Belo Plaintiffs, Howard L. Nations for Belo Plaintiffs and Jeremiah A. Sprague for Belo Plaintiffs. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 02/11/2022 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jarrett S. Falcon for Belo Plaintiffs. [22-10099] (ECF: Jeremiah Sprague) [Entered: 02/10/2022 05:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jeremiah A. Sprague for Appellant Belo Plaintiffs. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10099] (ECF: Jeremiah Sprague) [Entered: 02/10/2022 05:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kevin Michael Hodges for Appellees BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10099] (ECF: Kevin Hodges) [Entered: 02/10/2022 05:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Dylan Boigris for Belo Plaintiffs, Frank Jacob D'Amico for Belo Plaintiffs, Charles David Durkee for Belo Plaintiffs, Jarrett S. Falcon for Belo Plaintiffs, Timothy John Falcon for Belo Plaintiffs, Gary L. Fuller for Belo Plaintiffs, Patrick Russell Kirby for Belo Plaintiffs, Jason Matthew Larey for Belo Plaintiffs, Allen W. Lindsay, Jr. for Belo Plaintiffs, Jennifer L. Martin for Belo Plaintiffs, Howard L. Nations for Belo Plaintiffs, Daniel Robert Sanders for Belo Plaintiffs and Jeremiah A. Sprague for Belo Plaintiffs. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 02/09/2022 06:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Transcript Order Form has not been filed as to Appellant Belo Plaintiffs. The appellant is hereby notified that upon expiration of 14 days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the default has been corrected. [Entered: 02/09/2022 06:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE: Pursuant to the Court's February 8, 2022 order, the parties are directed to docket all filings related to this appeal only in no. 22-10099. See no. 22-10099 for all further filings related to this appeal. [22-10099, 22-10101, 22-10102, 22-10103, 22-10105, 22-10107, 22-10108, 22-10109, 22-10111, 22-10112, 22-10113, 22-10114, 22-10115, 22-10116, 22-10118, 22-10119, 22-10120, 22-10121, 22-10122, 22-10123, 22-10124, 22-10125, 22-10127, 22-10128, 22-10129, 22-10130, 22-10131, 22-10133, 22-10134] [Entered: 02/09/2022 08:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The parties did not object to the consolidation of these appeals, the following appeals are CONSOLIDATED: appeal nos. 22-10101, 22-10102, 22-10103, 22-10105, 22-10107, 22-10108, 22-10109, 22-10111, 22-10112, 22-10113, 22-10114, 22-10115, 22-10116, 22-10118, 22-10119, 22-10120, 22-10121, 22-10122, 22-10123, 22-10124, 22-10125, 22-10127, 22-10128, 22-10129, 22-10130, 22-10 (the "Consolidated Appeals"). AJ (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 02/08/2022 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter regarding consolidation of appeals filed by Attorney Kevin Michael Hodges for Appellees BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc. [22-10099] (ECF: Kevin Hodges) [Entered: 02/01/2022 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Youlin Yuan for BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company [22-10099] (ECF: Youlin Yuan) [Entered: 01/27/2022 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kevin M. Hodges for BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company [22-10099] (ECF: Kevin Hodges) [Entered: 01/27/2022 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice regarding consolidation of cases for appeal filed by Attorney Timothy John Falcon for Appellant Belo Plaintiffs. [22-10099] (ECF: Timothy Falcon) [Entered: 01/26/2022 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE to Parties [22-10116, 22-10099, 22-10101, 22-10102, 22-10103, 22-10105, 22-10107, 22-10108, 22-10109, 22-10111, 22-10112, 22-10113, 22-10114, 22-10115, 22-10118, 22-10119, 22-10120, 22-10121, 22-10122, 22-10123, 22-10124, 22-10125, 22-10127, 22-10128, 22-10129, 22-10130, 22-10131, 22-10133, 22-10134] [Entered: 01/18/2022 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Belo Plaintiffs on 01/12/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/27/2022 as to Appellant Belo Plaintiffs. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/10/2022 as to Appellee BP America Production Company [Entered: 01/14/2022 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ericson W. Enger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adrianne Katrine Jakola(Designation Retained)