Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/27/2021 at 05:57:29 (UTC).

Bellflower Unified School Dist v. Christina Jimenez, et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 Bellflower Unified School Dist filed an Other lawsuit against Christina Jimenez. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55250

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ELIAS JIMENEZ, Parent, on behalf of N.J. a minor

CHRISTINA JIMENEZ, Parent, on behalf of N.J. a minor

Plaintiff / Appellant

BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Timothy A. Adams

Attorney at ADAMS & ASSOCIATES

1930 Old Tustin Avenue

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Lauren-Ashley Caron

Attorney at ADAMS & ASSOCIATES

1930 Old Tustin Avenue

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Richard Brady

Attorney at Law Offices of Eric Bathen

650 Town Center Dr., Suite 1200

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Eric John Bathen

Attorney at Law Offices of Eric Bathen

650 Town Center Dr., Suite 1200

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Bellflower Unified School District Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/24/2021. [12051961] [21-55250] (Brady, Richard) [Entered: 03/24/2021 12:22 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet for Attorneys

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/24/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12051993]. [21-55250] (AD) [Entered: 03/24/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Bellflower Unified School District Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/24/2021. [12051961] [21-55250] (Brady, Richard) [Entered: 03/24/2021 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Lauren-Ashley Caron for party(s) Appellee Christina Jiminez Appellee Elias Jimenez. [12049595] (RL) [Entered: 03/22/2021 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lauren-Ashley L. Caron (Adams & Associates, 1930 Old Tustin Ave., Ste. A, Santa Ana, CA 92705) for Appellees Elias Jimenez and Christina Jiminez. Date of service: 03/22/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12049396] [21-55250] (Caron, Lauren-Ashley) [Entered: 03/22/2021 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Bellflower Unified School District Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/26/2021. Transcript ordered by 04/19/2021. Transcript due 05/17/2021. Appellant Bellflower Unified School District opening brief due 06/28/2021. Appellees Elias Jimenez and Christina Jiminez answering brief due 07/26/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12047222] (JPD) [Entered: 03/19/2021 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELLFLOWER UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant