This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/17/2021 at 06:21:12 (UTC).

Bela Animal Legal Defense, et al v. City of Des Moines, et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 Bela Animal Legal Defense filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Des Moines. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3337

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Bela Animal Legal Defense and Rescue

Heather Hildreth

Michael Kurt Fahrney

Jordan Witbracht

Defendant / Appellees

City of Des Moines

Jeffrey Lester

James Butler

Katharine Massier

Scott Sanders

Des Moines City Council

Animal Rescue League of Iowa, Inc.

Josh Colvin

Tina Updegrove

Jason M. Casini

Whitfield & Eddy, P.L.C.

Jeremy Whitaker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jaysen McCleary

4807 Kingman Boulevard

Des Moines, IA 50311

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michelle Mackel-Wiederanders

Attorney at CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

City Hall, 400 Robert D. Ray Drive

Des Moines, IA 50309-0000

Jason Michael Casini

Attorney at WHITFIELD & EDDY

Suite 2000, 699 Walnut Street

Des Moines, IA 50309-0000

Janice M. Thomas

Attorney at BRADSHAW & FOWLER

Suite 3700, 801 Grand Avenue

Des Moines, IA 50309-8004

Benjamin J. Kenkel

Attorney at BRADSHAW & FOWLER

Suite 3700, 801 Grand Avenue

Des Moines, IA 50309-8004

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

MOTION for remand - FOR CAL, or in the alternative a motion for extension of time to file brief until 01/25/2022, filed by Attorney Mr. Jaysen McCleary for Appellants Bela Animal Legal Defense and Rescue, Mr. Michael Kurt Fahrney, Heather Hildreth and Mr. Jordan Witbracht w/service 11/29/2021. [5102489] [21-3337]--[Edited to add remand and for cal reliefs 11/30/2021 by MVP] (JM) [Entered: 11/29/2021 11:54 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: The motion to remand is taken with the case. The alternative motion for extension of time to file the appellants brief is granted in part. The deadline is extended to January 7, 2022. Appendix due January 7, 2022 [ # 5102489-2 ] - FOR CAL [5102804] [21-3337] (MVP) [Entered: 11/30/2021 12:21 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Benjamin J. Kenkel for Appellees Mr. Jason M. Casini and Whitfield & Eddy, P.L.C. w/service 12/06/2021 [5104949] [21-3337] (BJK) [Entered: 12/06/2021 01:03 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Benjamin J. Kenkel for Appellees Mr. Jason M. Casini and Whitfield & Eddy, P.L.C. w/service 12/06/2021 [5104949] [21-3337] (BJK) [Entered: 12/06/2021 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER: The motion to remand is taken with the case. The alternative motion for extension of time to file the appellants brief is granted in part. The deadline is extended to January 7, 2022. Appendix due January 7, 2022 [ # 5102489-2 ] - FOR CAL [5102804] [21-3337] (MVP) [Entered: 11/30/2021 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for remand - FOR CAL, or in the alternative a motion for extension of time to file brief until 01/25/2022, filed by Attorney Mr. Jaysen McCleary for Appellants Bela Animal Legal Defense and Rescue, Mr. Michael Kurt Fahrney, Heather Hildreth and Mr. Jordan Witbracht w/service 11/29/2021. [5102489] [21-3337]--[Edited to add remand and for cal reliefs 11/30/2021 by MVP] (JM) [Entered: 11/29/2021 11:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 11/29/2021. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Bela Animal Legal Defense and Rescue, Michael Kurt Fahrney, Heather Hildreth and Jordan Witbracht due 11/29/2021. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5088303] [21-3337] (CAH) [Entered: 10/18/2021 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order 3/23/21, judgment 3/24/21, order 9/8/21. [5088300] [21-3337] (CAH) [Entered: 10/18/2021 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5088292] [21-3337] (CAH) [Entered: 10/18/2021 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANIMAL RESCUE LEAGUE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Janice M Thomas