This case was last updated from PACER on 01/23/2021 at 06:10:04 (UTC).

Bedford, et al v. Nowlin, et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 Bedford filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Nowlin. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-7070

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

 

Party Details

Defendant

THE HELEN AND MARY NOWLIN IRREVOCABLE COMMON LAW TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 28, 1927

P.O. Box 55

Glenoma, WA 98336

Defendant / Appellant

MARY NOWLIN

Tucson, AZ 85741

Plaintiff / Appellees

SONDRA N. PACE

WILLIAM SCOTT BEDFORD

RAY H. PACE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

The Helen and Mary Nowlin Irrevocable Common Law Trust Dated February 28, 1927

P.O. Box 55

Glenoma, WA 98336

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Mary Nowlin

2600 West Ina Road, Apartment 165

Tucson, AZ 85741

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Matt B. Mickle

Attorney at Mickle Law Offices

323 West Main Street

Durant, OK 74701

Michael Pacewicz

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy

321 South Boston Avenue, Suite 500, 500 Kennedy Building

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10801955] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach denying appellant's motion for reconsideration filed by Mary Nowlin. No further requests for reconsideration of the courts 01/11/2021 order will be considered. Appellees brief remains due 01/27/2021. Served on 01/21/2021. [20-7070] [Entered: 01/21/2021 04:57 PM]

Open Document

[10801404] Objections and take exception - court granting appellees' motion to supplement (construed as a motion for reconsideration) filed by Mary Nowlin. Served on 01/12/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 01/21/2021 by MLB to edit docket text][20-7070] [Entered: 01/20/2021 01:34 PM]

Open Document

[10798887] Supplemental record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Supp ROA Vol I - Pleadings. [20-7070] [Entered: 01/11/2021 11:17 AM]

Open Document

[10798885] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach granting appellees' motion to supplement the record on appeal. Served on 01/11/2021. [20-7070] [Entered: 01/11/2021 11:15 AM]

Open Document

[10798804] Motion filed by Appellees William Scott Bedford, Ray H. Pace and Sondra N. Pace to supplement the record on appeal. Served on: 01/11/2021. Manner of service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-7070] MP [Entered: 01/11/2021 08:54 AM]

Open Document

[10795786] Appellant's opening brief filed by Mary Nowlin. Original and 4 copies. Served on 12/28/2020 by Clerk via email. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? n. Appellees' brief due 01/27/2021 for William Scott Bedford, Ray H. Pace and Sondra N. Pace. [20-7070] [Entered: 12/28/2020 12:41 PM]

Open Document

[10794660] Entry of appearance filed by Mary Nowlin. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (some parties previously disclosed). Served on 12/15/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-7070] [Entered: 12/21/2020 01:34 PM]

Open Document

[10791651] Entry of appearance filed by Michael Pacewicz for William Scott Bedford, Ray H. Pace and Sondra N. Pace. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/08/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-7070] [Entered: 12/08/2020 09:57 AM]

Open Document

[10790719] Notice received from Mary Nowlin that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. [20-7070] [Entered: 12/03/2020 12:25 PM]

Open Document

[10790708] Notice of change of address filed by Mary Nowlin. [20-7070] [Entered: 12/03/2020 12:10 PM]

Open Document

[10790383] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Vol I - Pleadings. [20-7070] [Entered: 12/02/2020 12:18 PM]

Open Document

[10789345] Jurisdictional review complete. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 12/21/2020. Appellant's brief due on 01/11/2021 for Mary Nowlin [20-7070] [Entered: 11/30/2020 07:40 AM]

Open Document #2

General Docketing Letter - Pro Se

Open Document #1

Preliminary Record

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10801955] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach denying appellant's motion for reconsideration filed by Mary Nowlin. No further requests for reconsideration of the courts 01/11/2021 order will be considered. Appellees brief remains due 01/27/2021. Served on 01/21/2021. [20-7070] [Entered: 01/21/2021 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10801404] Objections and take exception - court granting appellees' motion to supplement (construed as a motion for reconsideration) filed by Mary Nowlin. Served on 01/12/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 01/21/2021 by MLB to edit docket text][20-7070] [Entered: 01/20/2021 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10798887] Supplemental record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Supp ROA Vol I - Pleadings. [20-7070] [Entered: 01/11/2021 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10798885] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach granting appellees' motion to supplement the record on appeal. Served on 01/11/2021. [20-7070] [Entered: 01/11/2021 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10798804] Motion filed by Appellees William Scott Bedford, Ray H. Pace and Sondra N. Pace to supplement the record on appeal. Served on: 01/11/2021. Manner of service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-7070] MP [Entered: 01/11/2021 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10795786] Appellant's opening brief filed by Mary Nowlin. Original and 4 copies. Served on 12/28/2020 by Clerk via email. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? n. Appellees' brief due 01/27/2021 for William Scott Bedford, Ray H. Pace and Sondra N. Pace. [20-7070] [Entered: 12/28/2020 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10794660] Entry of appearance filed by Mary Nowlin. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (some parties previously disclosed). Served on 12/15/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-7070] [Entered: 12/21/2020 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docket[10792323] Returned mail filed. Addressed To: Helen and Mary Nowlin Irrevocable Common Law Trust. Reason Returned: refused. Document Returned: case opening letter. Action Taken: none- party removed from service list. [20-7070] [Entered: 12/10/2020 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10791651] Entry of appearance filed by Michael Pacewicz for William Scott Bedford, Ray H. Pace and Sondra N. Pace. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/08/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-7070] [Entered: 12/08/2020 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docket[10791639] Entry of appearance submitted by Michael R. Pacewicz for Appellees William Scott Bedford, Ray H. Pace and Sondra N. Pace for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/08/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-7070]--[Edited 12/08/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 12/8/20] MP [Entered: 12/08/2020 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10790719] Notice received from Mary Nowlin that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. [20-7070] [Entered: 12/03/2020 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10790708] Notice of change of address filed by Mary Nowlin. [20-7070] [Entered: 12/03/2020 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10790383] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Vol I - Pleadings. [20-7070] [Entered: 12/02/2020 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10789345] Jurisdictional review complete. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 12/21/2020. Appellant's brief due on 01/11/2021 for Mary Nowlin [20-7070] [Entered: 11/30/2020 07:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10788287] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/24/2020 Notice of appearance due on 12/08/2020 for William Scott Bedford, Ray H. Pace and Sondra N. Pace, and Notice of appearance due on 12/24/2020 for Mary Nowlin. [20-7070] [Entered: 11/24/2020 08:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less