Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2020 at 06:08:56 (UTC).

Beatrice Bruning v. William Attmore, et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 Beatrice Bruning filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against William Attmore. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-50772

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Jack O'Boyle & Associates

Ditech Financial, L.L.C.

LRS Financial Network, Incorporated, doing business as HNB Mortgage

Ras Crane L.L.C.

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated

William Attmore

Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, L.L.P.

Plaintiff / Appellant

Beatrice Bruning

Midland, TX 79707

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Frank Jeffrey Catalano Esq.

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford, P.L.L.C.

6688 N. Central Expressway

Dallas, TX 75206

Gregg D. Stevens Esq.

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford, P.L.L.C.

6688 N. Central Expressway

Dallas, TX 75206

Daniel P. Troiano

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford, P.L.L.C.

6688 N. Central Expressway

Dallas, TX 75206

W. Clark Lea

Attorney at Cotton, Bledsoe, Tighe & Dawson, P.C.

500 W. Illinois Avenue

Midland, TX 79701

Cheyenne M. Zokaie

Attorney at Padgett Law Group

5501 Lyndon B. Johnson Freeway

Dallas, TX 75240

Michael Carrer

Attorney at Hall Maines Lugrin, P.C.

2800 Post Oak Boulevard, Williams Tower

Houston, TX 77056-6125

Ellen Horton Raine

Attorney at Hall Maines Lugrin, P.C.

2800 Post Oak Boulevard, Williams Tower

Houston, TX 77056-6125

Mark D. Hopkins

Attorney at Hopkins Law, P.L.L.C.

3 Lakeway Centre Court

Austin, TX 78734

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Beatrice Bruning

6505 Sequoia Drive

Midland, TX 79707

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50772] (Ellen Horton Raine ) [Entered: 10/19/2020 03:46 PM]

Open Document

Attorney Ellen H. Raine is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [20-50772] (LBM) [Entered: 10/19/2020 03:12 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/16/2020 for Appellant Beatrice Bruning. [20-50772] (DDL) [Entered: 10/06/2020 02:40 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Michael Carrer for Mr. William Attmore and Ras Crane L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50772] (Michael Carrer ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 09:59 AM]

Open Document

Attorney Ellen Horton Raine is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [20-50772] (LBM) [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:39 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50772] (Michael Carrer ) [Entered: 09/30/2020 10:07 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50772] (Shelley Luan Hopkins ) [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:23 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Mark D. Hopkins for Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, L.L.P. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50772] (Mark D. Hopkins ) [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:19 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Frank Jeffrey Catalano, Esq. for Ditech Financial, L.L.C. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50772] (Frank Jeffrey Catalano ) [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:05 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50772] (Gregg D. Stevens ) [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:02 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9403551-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-50772] (SEP) [Entered: 09/18/2020 04:24 PM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Beatrice Bruning [20-50772] (MVM) [Entered: 09/10/2020 11:11 AM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Ellen Horton Raine for party(s) Appellee Ras Crane L.L.C. Appellee William Attmore, in case 20-50772 [20-50772] (MFY) [Entered: 10/21/2020 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50772] (Ellen Horton Raine ) [Entered: 10/19/2020 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Ellen H. Raine is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [20-50772] (LBM) [Entered: 10/19/2020 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/16/2020 for Appellant Beatrice Bruning. [20-50772] (DDL) [Entered: 10/06/2020 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-50772] (DDL) [Entered: 10/06/2020 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Michael Carrer for Appellee Ras Crane L.L.C. in 20-50772, Attorney Michael Carrer for Appellee William Attmore in 20-50772 [20-50772] (CB) [Entered: 10/02/2020 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Michael Carrer for Mr. William Attmore and Ras Crane L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50772] (Michael Carrer ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Ellen Horton Raine is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [20-50772] (LBM) [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Gregg D. Stevens for Appellee Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated in 20-50772 [20-50772] (MFY) [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50772] (Michael Carrer ) [Entered: 09/30/2020 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Mark D. Hopkins for Appellee Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, L.L.P. in 20-50772 [20-50772] (MFY) [Entered: 09/24/2020 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Gregg D. Stevens for party(s) Appellee LRS Financial Network, Incorporated Appellee Ditech Financial, L.L.C., in case 20-50772 [20-50772] (CNF) [Entered: 09/24/2020 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50772] (Shelley Luan Hopkins ) [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Mark D. Hopkins for Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel, L.L.P. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50772] (Mark D. Hopkins ) [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Frank Jeffrey Catalano, Esq. for Ditech Financial, L.L.C. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50772] (Frank Jeffrey Catalano ) [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50772] (Gregg D. Stevens ) [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 7:19-CV-60. Electronic ROA due on 10/05/2020. [20-50772] (SEP) [Entered: 09/18/2020 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9403551-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-50772] (SEP) [Entered: 09/18/2020 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketFEE PAID by Appellant Ms. Beatrice Bruning. [20-50772] (SEP) [Entered: 09/18/2020 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Beatrice Bruning [20-50772] (MVM) [Entered: 09/10/2020 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ras Crane, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JACK O'BOYLE & ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant