This case was last updated from PACER on 05/24/2019 at 06:11:10 (UTC).

BBX v. FDIC Corp, et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 BBX filed an Other lawsuit against FDIC Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11172

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

BBX CAPITAL, f.k.a. BankAtlantic Bankcorp, Inc.

Defendant / Appellees

BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD

FDIC CORP, in its corporate capacity

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jenea M. Reed

Attorney at Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson, PA

150 W Flagler St Ste 2200

Miami, FL 33130

Grace Lee Mead

Attorney at Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson, PA

150 W Flagler St Ste 2200

Miami, FL 33130

Eugene E. Stearns

Attorney at Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson, PA

150 W Flagler St Ste 2200

Miami, FL 33130

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher John Becker

Attorney at Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System

20Th St And Constitution Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20551

Joshua Paul Chadwick

Attorney at Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System

20Th St And Constitution Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20551

Sarah E. Faust

Attorney at Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

3501 N Fairfax Dr

Arlington, VA 22226

Duncan Stevens

Attorney at Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

3501 N Fairfax Dr

Arlington, VA 22226

Erik Bond

Attorney at Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

3501 N Fairfax Dr

Arlington, VA 22226

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Duncan Stevens for Appellee FDIC Corp. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11172] (ECF: Duncan Stevens) [Entered: 04/17/2019 10:11 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Jenea M. Reed for Appellant BBX. Transcript(s) ordered. [19-11172] (ECF: Jenea Reed) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:02 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jenea M. Reed for BBX. [19-11172] (ECF: Jenea Reed) [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:33 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joshua Paul Chadwick for Board of Governors of Federal Reserve Board. [19-11172] (ECF: Joshua Chadwick) [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:53 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jenea M. Reed for Appellant BBX. [19-11172] (ECF: Jenea Reed) [Entered: 04/15/2019 04:30 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Eugene E. Stearns for BBX. [19-11172] (ECF: Eugene Stearns) [Entered: 04/09/2019 04:23 PM]

Open Document #2

usdc 72

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant BBX. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/17/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:55 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jenea M. Reed for Appellant BBX. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11172] (ECF: Jenea Reed) [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:20 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Duncan Stevens for Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation [19-11172] (ECF: Duncan Stevens) [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:50 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Grace Lee Mead for BBX. [19-11172] (ECF: Grace Mead) [Entered: 04/10/2019 12:03 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Dawn M. Savino, Filer: BBX Capital, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 05/08/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 11/09/2018. [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:35 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher John Becker for Board of Governors of Federal Reserve Board. [19-11172] (ECF: Christopher Becker) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:28 PM]

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

usdc 67

Open Document #4

CORRECTED DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Christopher John Becker for Appellee Board of Governors of Federal Reserve Board. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11172] (ECF: Christopher Becker) [Entered: 04/19/2019 10:27 AM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Briefing Notice issued to Appellant BBX. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/17/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Dawn M. Savino, Filer: BBX Capital, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 05/08/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 11/09/2018. [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Christopher John Becker for Appellee Board of Governors of Federal Reserve Board. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11172] (ECF: Christopher Becker) [Entered: 04/19/2019 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Duncan Stevens for Appellee FDIC Corp. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11172] (ECF: Duncan Stevens) [Entered: 04/17/2019 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jenea M. Reed for Appellant BBX. [19-11172] (ECF: Jenea Reed) [Entered: 04/15/2019 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: BBX Capital, Court Reporter: Dawn M. Savino, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 11/09/2018. [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Grace Lee Mead for BBX. [19-11172] (ECF: Grace Mead) [Entered: 04/10/2019 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Eugene E. Stearns for BBX. [19-11172] (ECF: Eugene Stearns) [Entered: 04/09/2019 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jenea M. Reed for Appellant BBX. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11172] (ECF: Jenea Reed) [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher John Becker for Board of Governors of Federal Reserve Board. [19-11172] (ECF: Christopher Becker) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Jenea M. Reed for Appellant BBX. Transcript(s) ordered. [19-11172] (ECF: Jenea Reed) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joshua Paul Chadwick for Board of Governors of Federal Reserve Board. [19-11172] (ECF: Joshua Chadwick) [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jenea M. Reed for BBX. [19-11172] (ECF: Jenea Reed) [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Duncan Stevens for Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation [19-11172] (ECF: Duncan Stevens) [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant BBX on 03/25/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/08/2019 as to Appellant BBX Capital. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/22/2019 as to Appellees Board of Governors of Federal Reserve Board and FDIC Corp [Entered: 04/01/2019 08:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.