This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/15/2021 at 06:38:16 (UTC).

Bay Area Unitarian v. Paxton

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Bay Area Unitarian filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Paxton. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-20491

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church

Drink Houston Better, L.L.C., doing business as Antidote Coffee

Perk You Later, L.L.C.

Defendant / Appellants

Texas Attorney General Ken Paxton

Presiding Officer Kim Lemaux

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Alla Lefkowitz

P.O. Box 4184

New York, NY 10017

Charlotte Taylor Esq.

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

William Roquemore Taylor

Attorney at Jones Day

717 Texas Street

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Michael Abrams

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711

Todd A. Dickerson Esq.

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548 (Mc-019)

Austin, TX 78711-2548

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [21-20491] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Ms. Kim Lemaux and Mr. Ken Paxton advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 09/21/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Dickerson; Attorney for Appellees: Lefkowitz, Taylor, Taylor; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Lefkowitz [21-20491] (Todd A. Dickerson ) [Entered: 09/21/2021 09:20 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20491] (Michael Abrams ) [Entered: 09/21/2021 11:02 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9671765-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-20491] (CCR) [Entered: 09/23/2021 11:38 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Charlotte Taylor, Esq. for Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, L.L.C. and Perk You Later, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20491] (Charlotte Taylor ) [Entered: 09/24/2021 09:50 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/08/2021 for Appellants Kim Lemaux and Ken Paxton. [21-20491] (CMB) [Entered: 09/28/2021 10:33 AM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 [9690130-2]. Date of service: 10/15/2021 [21-20491] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Ms. Kim Lemaux and Mr. Ken Paxton to dismiss the appeal [9690130-2]. Date of service: 10/15/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Abrams, Dickerson; Attorney for Appellees: Taylor, Taylor; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Lefkowitz [21-20491] (Michael Abrams ) [Entered: 10/15/2021 02:13 PM]

Open Document #1

MDT-1 Letter

Open Document #2

DIS-4 Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 filed by Appellants Mr. Ken Paxton and Ms. Kim Lemaux [ # 9690130-2 ] [21-20491] (CCR) [Entered: 10/15/2021 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 [9690130-2]. Date of service: 10/15/2021 [21-20491] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Ms. Kim Lemaux and Mr. Ken Paxton to dismiss the appeal [9690130-2]. Date of service: 10/15/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Abrams, Dickerson; Attorney for Appellees: Taylor, Taylor; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Lefkowitz [21-20491] (Michael Abrams ) [Entered: 10/15/2021 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/08/2021 for Appellants Kim Lemaux and Ken Paxton. [21-20491] (CMB) [Entered: 09/28/2021 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-20491] (CMB) [Entered: 09/28/2021 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Charlotte Taylor for Appellee Perk You Later, L.L.C. in 21-20491, Attorney Charlotte Taylor for Appellee Drink Houston Better, L.L.C. in 21-20491, Attorney Charlotte Taylor for Appellee Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church in 21-20491 [21-20491] (CCR) [Entered: 09/27/2021 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Charlotte Taylor, Esq. for Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, L.L.C. and Perk You Later, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20491] (Charlotte Taylor ) [Entered: 09/24/2021 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:20-CV-3081. Electronic ROA due on 10/08/2021. [21-20491] (CCR) [Entered: 09/23/2021 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9671765-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-20491] (CCR) [Entered: 09/23/2021 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michael Abrams for party(s) Appellant Kim Lemaux Appellant Ken Paxton, in case 21-20491 [21-20491] (CCR) [Entered: 09/22/2021 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20491] (Michael Abrams ) [Entered: 09/21/2021 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [21-20491] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Ms. Kim Lemaux and Mr. Ken Paxton advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 09/21/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Dickerson; Attorney for Appellees: Lefkowitz, Taylor, Taylor; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Lefkowitz [21-20491] (Todd A. Dickerson ) [Entered: 09/21/2021 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Kim Lemaux and Mr. Ken Paxton [21-20491] (ABT) [Entered: 09/16/2021 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd A. Dickerson Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Abrams