This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2019 at 06:07:39 (UTC).

Baxalta Inc. v. Genentech, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/12/2019 Baxalta Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Genentech, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1527

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD.

Plaintiff / Appellants

BAXALTA INC.

BAXALTA GMBH

Defendant / Appellee

GENENTECH, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Natalie A. Bennett Esq.

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Julie S. Goldemberg

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Sanjay K. Murthy

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

77 W Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Karon Nicole Fowler

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

77 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

William R. Peterson

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1000 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Eric Alan Stone

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

David Cole

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Kenneth A. Gallo

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Jennifer Gordon

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Nicholas P. Groombridge

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Josephine Young

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Alexander Atkins

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Marissa Doran

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Naz Wehrli

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) MOTION of Appellants Baxalta Inc. and Baxalta GmbH to extend the time to 04/29/2019 to file the Appellants' Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 04/02/2019 by email. [597216] [19-1527] [Natalie Bennett] [Entered: 04/02/2019 01:46 PM]

#21

(#21) Entry of appearance for Naz E. Wherli as of counsel for Appellee Genentech, Inc.. Service: 03/27/2019 by email. [595812] [19-1527] [Eric Stone] [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:03 AM]

#18

(#18) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Genentech, Inc.. Service: 02/26/2019 by email. [588675] [19-1527] [Eric Stone] [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:29 AM]

#17

(#17) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Genentech, Inc.. Service: 02/26/2019 by email. [588674] [19-1527] [Eric Stone] [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:28 AM]

#16

(#16) Entry of appearance for David E. Cole as of counsel for Appellee Genentech, Inc.. Service: 02/26/2019 by email. [588673] [19-1527] [Eric Stone] [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:26 AM]

#15

(#15) Entry of appearance for Josephine Young as of counsel for Appellee Genentech, Inc.. Service: 02/26/2019 by email. [588668] [19-1527] [Eric Stone] [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:23 AM]

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Baxalta Inc. and Baxalta GmbH. Service: 02/25/2019 by email. [588418] [19-1527] [Natalie Bennett] [Entered: 02/25/2019 02:48 PM]

#5

(#7) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 5 ], ERROR: The contact information listed on the entry of appearance for Karon Fowler does not match the information in the attorney's user account. CORRECTION: Please update as needed to ensure that the information on the entry of appearance and in the user account matches. [587406] [MMA] [Entered: 02/20/2019 11:32 AM]

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for William R. Peterson as of counsel for Appellants Baxalta Inc. and Baxalta GmbH. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587225] [19-1527] [William Peterson] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:30 PM]

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for Sanjay K. Murthy as of counsel for Appellants Baxalta Inc. and Baxalta GmbH. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587224] [19-1527] [Sanjay Murthy] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:29 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Natalie A. Bennett as principal counsel for Appellants Baxalta Inc. and Baxalta GmbH. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587222] [19-1527] [Natalie Bennett] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:27 PM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 23 ] filed by Appellants Baxalta Inc. and Baxalta GmbH. Appellants' brief is due 04/29/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [597278] [MMA] [Entered: 04/02/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION of Appellants Baxalta Inc. and Baxalta GmbH to extend the time to 04/29/2019 to file the Appellants' Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 04/02/2019 by email. [597216] [19-1527] [Natalie Bennett] [Entered: 04/02/2019 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Entry of appearance for Alexander F. Atkins as of counsel for Appellee Genentech, Inc.. Service: 03/27/2019 by email. [595813] [19-1527] [Eric Stone] [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Entry of appearance for Naz E. Wherli as of counsel for Appellee Genentech, Inc.. Service: 03/27/2019 by email. [595812] [19-1527] [Eric Stone] [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Entry of appearance for Marissa C.M. Doran as of counsel for Appellee Genentech, Inc.. Service: 03/27/2019 by email. [595811] [19-1527] [Eric Stone] [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 16 ], ERROR: (1) Attorney David E. Cole is not a registered CM/ECF filer for the Federal Circuit. (2) The contact information contained on the entry of appearance does not match the contact information in the attorney's user account. CORRECTION: (1) Pursuant to FCR 25(a)(2), attorneys who appear before this court must register for the court's CM/ECF system. Please register promptly. (2) Please update as needed to ensure the contact information on the entry of appearance and in the user account match. [588947] [MMA] [Entered: 02/27/2019 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Genentech, Inc.. Service: 02/26/2019 by email. [588675] [19-1527] [Eric Stone] [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Genentech, Inc.. Service: 02/26/2019 by email. [588674] [19-1527] [Eric Stone] [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Entry of appearance for David E. Cole as of counsel for Appellee Genentech, Inc.. Service: 02/26/2019 by email. [588673] [19-1527] [Eric Stone] [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Entry of appearance for Josephine Young as of counsel for Appellee Genentech, Inc.. Service: 02/26/2019 by email. [588668] [19-1527] [Eric Stone] [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Baxalta Inc. and Baxalta GmbH. Service: 02/25/2019 by email. [588420] [19-1527] [Natalie Bennett] [Entered: 02/25/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Baxalta Inc. and Baxalta GmbH. Service: 02/25/2019 by email. [588418] [19-1527] [Natalie Bennett] [Entered: 02/25/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellants Baxalta GmbH and Baxalta Inc. indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 02/21/2019 by email. [587646] [19-1527] [Natalie Bennett] [Entered: 02/21/2019 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 5 ], ERROR: The contact information listed on the entry of appearance for Karon Fowler does not match the information in the attorney's user account. CORRECTION: Please update as needed to ensure that the information on the entry of appearance and in the user account matches. [587406] [MMA] [Entered: 02/20/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Entry of appearance for Julie S. Goldemberg as of counsel for Appellants Baxalta Inc. and Baxalta GmbH. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587228] [19-1527] [Julie Goldemberg] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Entry of appearance for Karon N. Fowler as of counsel for Appellants Baxalta Inc. and Baxalta GmbH. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587227] [19-1527] [Karon Fowler] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Entry of appearance for William R. Peterson as of counsel for Appellants Baxalta Inc. and Baxalta GmbH. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587225] [19-1527] [William Peterson] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for Sanjay K. Murthy as of counsel for Appellants Baxalta Inc. and Baxalta GmbH. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587224] [19-1527] [Sanjay Murthy] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Natalie A. Bennett as principal counsel for Appellants Baxalta Inc. and Baxalta GmbH. Service: 02/19/2019 by email. [587222] [19-1527] [Natalie Bennett] [Entered: 02/19/2019 06:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 02/08/2019. [585080] Entry of Appearance due 02/26/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 02/26/2019. Docketing Statement due 02/26/2019. Appellants' brief is due 04/15/2019. [MMA] [Entered: 02/12/2019 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.