This case was last updated from PACER on 05/05/2021 at 06:00:24 (UTC).

Bautista REO PR Corp. v. Mora Development Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2021 Bautista REO PR Corp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mora Development Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1183

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAUTISTA CAYMAN ASSET COMPANY

Defendant

UNITED STATES

Defendant / Appellants

BRISAS DEL LAGO LLC

DONCELLA DEL MAR LLC

CLEOFE RUBI-GONZALEZ

MORAIMA CINTRON-AVILES

MORA DEVELOPMENT, S.E.

MORA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

MORA DEVELOPMENT CORP.

Plaintiff / Appellee

BAUTISTA REO PR CORP.

Interested Parties

WE MANAGE, LLC

MORA HOUSING MORA HOUSING MANAGEMENT, INC.

MORA HOUSING MANAGEMENT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Plaintiff Attorneys

Omayra Sepulveda-Vega

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges LLC

250 Munoz Rivera Ave, Ste 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges LLC

250 Munoz Rivera Ave, Ste 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

Natalia Marin-Catala

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges LLC

250 Munoz Rivera Ave, Ste 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

Antonio L. Roig-Lorenzo

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges LLC

250 Munoz Rivera Ave, Ste 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

Defendant Attorney

Mariana E. Bauza Almonte

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jorge Martinez-Luciano

Attorney at Ingenuitas Law Firm

Cobian'S Plaza, 1607 Ponce De Leon Ave

San Juan, PR 00909

Emil J. Rodriguez Escudero

Attorney at M.L. & R.E. Law Firm

Cobian'S Plaza, 1607 Ponce De Leon Ave

San Juan, PR 00909

Interested Party Attorney

Sergio Sanchez-Pagan

Attorney at Sanchez-Pagan & Ferrer

1519 Ave Ponce De Leon, Ste 1115

San Juan, PR 00909

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document #2

Transcript Acknowledgment

Open Document #1

Transcript Order Form

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Brisas del Lago LLC, Moraima Cintron-Aviles, Doncella del Mar LLC, Mora Development Corp. and Cleofe Rubi-Gonzalez indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 04/19/2021. [21-1183] (JM) [Entered: 04/19/2021 02:46 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Natalia Marin-Catala for Bautista Cayman Asset Company. [21-1183] (GB) [Entered: 04/07/2021 06:34 AM]

Open Document

ORDER directing appellant to file a corrected Transcript Report/Order Form by 04/06/2021 . [21-1183]. (ATC) [Entered: 03/30/2021 09:27 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 04/06/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless she registers for an appellate ECF account: Natalia Marin-Catala for Bautista Cayman Asset Company. [21-1183] (GB) [Entered: 03/23/2021 06:59 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Brisas del Lago LLC, Moraima Cintron-Aviles, Doncella del Mar LLC, Mora Development Corp., Mora Development, S.E. and Cleofe Rubi-Gonzalez indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 03/22/2021. [21-1183] (JM) [Entered: 03/22/2021 03:48 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Brisas del Lago LLC, Moraima Cintron-Aviles, Doncella del Mar LLC, Mora Development Corp., Mora Development, S.E. and Cleofe Rubi-Gonzalez. Certificate of service dated 03/22/2021. [21-1183] (JM) [Entered: 03/22/2021 03:42 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Brisas del Lago LLC, Moraima Cintron-Aviles, Doncella del Mar LLC, Mora Development Corp., Mora Development, S.E. and Cleofe Rubi-Gonzalez filed by Attorney Emil Rodriguez-Escudero. Certificate of service dated 03/22/2021. [21-1183] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, BY 03/25/2021. (JM) [Entered: 03/22/2021 03:39 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Bautista REO PR Corp. filed by Attorney Omayra Sepulveda-Vega. Certificate of service dated 03/16/2021. [21-1183] (OS) [Entered: 03/16/2021 09:19 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Bautista REO PR Corp. filed by Attorney Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera. Certificate of service dated 03/15/2021. [21-1183] (GAM) [Entered: 03/15/2021 11:57 AM]

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 06/14/2021 for appellants Brisas del Lago LLC, Moraima Cintron-Aviles, Doncella del Mar LLC, Mora Development Corp., Mora Development, S.E. and Cleofe Rubi-Gonzalez. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [21-1183] (GB) [Entered: 05/03/2021 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of filing the following transcript in district court by Court Reporter Zulma Migdalia Ruiz: 01/25/2021, Motion Hearing. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [21-1183] (GB) [Entered: 05/03/2021 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ordered: 01/25/2021, Motion Hearing. Transcript due 06/21/2021 from Court Reporter Zulma Migdalia Ruiz [21-1183] (GB) [Entered: 04/21/2021 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Brisas del Lago LLC, Moraima Cintron-Aviles, Doncella del Mar LLC, Mora Development Corp. and Cleofe Rubi-Gonzalez indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 04/19/2021. [21-1183] (JM) [Entered: 04/19/2021 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellants are directed to file a corrected transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Corrected transcript report/order form due 04/21/2021 . [21-1183] (GB) [Entered: 04/07/2021 06:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Natalia Marin-Catala for Bautista Cayman Asset Company. [21-1183] (GB) [Entered: 04/07/2021 06:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER directing appellant to file a corrected Transcript Report/Order Form by 04/06/2021 . [21-1183]. (ATC) [Entered: 03/30/2021 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 04/06/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless she registers for an appellate ECF account: Natalia Marin-Catala for Bautista Cayman Asset Company. [21-1183] (GB) [Entered: 03/23/2021 06:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Brisas del Lago LLC, Moraima Cintron-Aviles, Doncella del Mar LLC, Mora Development Corp., Mora Development, S.E. and Cleofe Rubi-Gonzalez indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 03/22/2021. [21-1183] (JM) [Entered: 03/22/2021 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Brisas del Lago LLC, Moraima Cintron-Aviles, Doncella del Mar LLC, Mora Development Corp., Mora Development, S.E. and Cleofe Rubi-Gonzalez. Certificate of service dated 03/22/2021. [21-1183] (JM) [Entered: 03/22/2021 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Brisas del Lago LLC, Moraima Cintron-Aviles, Doncella del Mar LLC, Mora Development Corp., Mora Development, S.E. and Cleofe Rubi-Gonzalez filed by Attorney Emil Rodriguez-Escudero. Certificate of service dated 03/22/2021. [21-1183] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, BY 03/25/2021. (JM) [Entered: 03/22/2021 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Brisas del Lago LLC, Moraima Cintron-Aviles, Doncella del Mar LLC, Mora Development Corp., Mora Development, S.E. and Cleofe Rubi-Gonzalez filed by Attorney Jorge Martinez-Luciano. Certificate of service dated 03/22/2021. [21-1183] (JM) [Entered: 03/22/2021 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Bautista REO PR Corp. filed by Attorney Omayra Sepulveda-Vega. Certificate of service dated 03/16/2021. [21-1183] (OS) [Entered: 03/16/2021 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Bautista REO PR Corp. filed by Attorney Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera. Certificate of service dated 03/15/2021. [21-1183] (GAM) [Entered: 03/15/2021 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #126) filed by Appellants Brisas del Lago LLC, Moraima Cintron-Aviles, Doncella del Mar LLC, Mora Development Corporation, Mora Development, S.E. and Cleofe Rubi-Gonzalez. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 03/22/2021 . [21-1183] (GB) [Entered: 03/07/2021 06:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #126) filed by Appellants Brisas del Lago LLC, Moraima Cintron-Aviles, Doncella del Mar LLC, Mora Development Corporation, Mora Development, S.E. and Cleofe Rubi-Gonzalez. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 03/22/2021 . [21-1183] (GB) [Entered: 03/07/2021 06:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WE MANAGE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MORA DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Bautista Cayman Asset Company is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant