This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2021 at 06:07:57 (UTC).

Barry Smith, Sr., et al v. Community Care Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 Barry Smith, Sr filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Community Care Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3363

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

BARRY J. SMITH, SR.

Milwaukee, WI 53209-0000

FRANCILLYA BLAKE

Milwaukee, WI 53205

Defendant / Appellees

GUARDIANTRAC LLC

COMMUNITY CARE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Barry J. Smith Sr.

3124 W. Silver Spring Drive

Milwaukee, WI 53209-0000

Francillya Blake

1811 W. Galena Street

Milwaukee, WI 53205

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Erin M. Cook

Attorney at GODFREY & KAHN S.C.

833 E. Michigan Street

Milwaukee, WI 53202-5615

Anthony J. Anzelmo

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP

511 N. Broadway

Milwaukee, WI 53202-3819

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER: Appellant Francillya Blake is directed to showcause as to why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution pursuant to C. R. 31(c)(2). LJ. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. Response to Rule to Showcause due for Appellant Francillya Blake by 02/09/2021. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7020 2420 0001 4762 3047. [6] [7137227] [20-3363] (LJ) [Entered: 01/26/2021 03:39 PM]

#5

(#5) 10 copies Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Barry J. Smith, Sr.. Disk not required. [5] [7133911] [20-3363] (LJ) [Entered: 01/12/2021 09:38 AM]

#4

(#4) ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 01/14/2021 for Francillya Blake and Barry J. Smith Sr.. Appellee's brief due on or before 02/16/2021 for Community Care Inc. and Guardiantrac LLC. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 03/08/2021 for Appellants Francillya Blake and Barry J. Smith Sr. [4] [7128497] [20-3363] (CM) [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:39 AM]

#3

(#3) Filed notice from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee was received. [3] [7128495] [20-3363] (CM) [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:38 AM]

#2

(#2) ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). DW [7127002] [2] [7127002] [20-3363] (AP) [Entered: 12/08/2020 04:02 PM]

1 #4

Fee Notice

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Appellant Francillya Blake is directed to showcause as to why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution pursuant to C. R. 31(c)(2). LJ. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. Response to Rule to Showcause due for Appellant Francillya Blake by 02/09/2021. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7020 2420 0001 4762 3047. [6] [7137227] [20-3363] (LJ) [Entered: 01/26/2021 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) 10 copies Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Barry J. Smith, Sr.. Disk not required. [5] [7133911] [20-3363] (LJ) [Entered: 01/12/2021 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 01/14/2021 for Francillya Blake and Barry J. Smith Sr.. Appellee's brief due on or before 02/16/2021 for Community Care Inc. and Guardiantrac LLC. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 03/08/2021 for Appellants Francillya Blake and Barry J. Smith Sr. [4] [7128497] [20-3363] (CM) [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed notice from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee was received. [3] [7128495] [20-3363] (CM) [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). DW [7127002] [2] [7127002] [20-3363] (AP) [Entered: 12/08/2020 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 12/18/2020. Fee or IFP forms due on 12/18/2020 for Appellants Francillya Blake and Barry J. Smith Sr. [1] [7126217] [20-3363] (CG) [Entered: 12/07/2020 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Anzelmo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin M Cook