This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/13/2022 at 06:10:14 (UTC).

Barrday, Inc. v. Lincoln Fabrics Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 Barrday, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Lincoln Fabrics Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1903

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

BARRDAY, INC.

BARRDAY CORP.

Defendant / Appellee

LINCOLN FABRICS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael J. Berchou

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Robert Fluskey II

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Michael J. Berchou as counsel for Appellants Barrday Corp. and Barrday, Inc.. Service: 06/20/2022 by email. [856367] [22-1903] [Michael Berchou] [Entered: 06/20/2022 12:54 PM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Barrday Corp. and Barrday, Inc.. Service: 06/21/2022 by email. [856447] [22-1903] [Michael Berchou] [Entered: 06/21/2022 10:18 AM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Barrday Corp. and Barrday, Inc.. Service: 06/21/2022 by email. [856449] [22-1903] [Michael Berchou] [Entered: 06/21/2022 10:19 AM]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for Robert J. Fluskey, Jr. as counsel for Appellee Lincoln Fabrics Inc.. Service: 06/29/2022 by email. [858111] [22-1903] [Robert Fluskey] [Entered: 06/29/2022 11:10 AM]

#6

(#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Lincoln Fabrics Inc.. Service: 06/29/2022 by email. [858112] [22-1903] [Robert Fluskey] [Entered: 06/29/2022 11:11 AM]

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Lincoln Fabrics Inc.. Service: 06/29/2022 by email. [858113] [22-1903] [Robert Fluskey] [Entered: 06/29/2022 11:12 AM]

#8

(#8) MOTION of Appellants Barrday, Inc. and Barrday Corp. to extend the time to 08/29/2022 to file brief. Service: 08/02/2022 by email. [864348] [22-1903] [Michael Berchou] [Entered: 08/02/2022 02:31 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 8 ] filed by Appellants Barrday, Inc. and Barrday Corp. The opening brief is due 08/29/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [864358] [JCW] [Entered: 08/02/2022 02:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION of Appellants Barrday, Inc. and Barrday Corp. to extend the time to 08/29/2022 to file brief. Service: 08/02/2022 by email. [864348] [22-1903] [Michael Berchou] [Entered: 08/02/2022 02:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Lincoln Fabrics Inc.. Service: 06/29/2022 by email. [858113] [22-1903] [Robert Fluskey] [Entered: 06/29/2022 11:12 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Lincoln Fabrics Inc.. Service: 06/29/2022 by email. [858112] [22-1903] [Robert Fluskey] [Entered: 06/29/2022 11:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Robert J. Fluskey, Jr. as counsel for Appellee Lincoln Fabrics Inc.. Service: 06/29/2022 by email. [858111] [22-1903] [Robert Fluskey] [Entered: 06/29/2022 11:10 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Barrday Corp. and Barrday, Inc.. Service: 06/21/2022 by email. [856449] [22-1903] [Michael Berchou] [Entered: 06/21/2022 10:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Barrday Corp. and Barrday, Inc.. Service: 06/21/2022 by email. [856447] [22-1903] [Michael Berchou] [Entered: 06/21/2022 10:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Michael J. Berchou as counsel for Appellants Barrday Corp. and Barrday, Inc.. Service: 06/20/2022 by email. [856367] [22-1903] [Michael Berchou] [Entered: 06/20/2022 12:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 06/10/2022. [855525] Entry of Appearance is due on 06/28/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/28/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 06/28/2022. Appellants' brief is due on 08/15/2022. [ALK] [Entered: 06/14/2022 02:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less