This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2019 at 06:15:50 (UTC).

Barnett v. National Railroad Passenger Co

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 Barnett filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against National Railroad Passenger Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-91

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Anthony Barnett

Maplewood, NJ 07040

Defendant / Appellee

National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Amtrak

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Anthony Barnett

787 Prospect Street

Maplewood, NJ 07040

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

William H. Ng Esq.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

290 Broadhollow Road

Melville, NY 11747

Lisa Marie Griffith

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

290 Broadhollow Road

Melville, NY 11747

 

Court Documents

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

1 #2

Case FILED

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 12/10/2018, RECEIVED.[2472187] [19-91] [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:00 PM]

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/12/2018, RECEIVED.[2472194] [19-91] [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:07 PM]

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#5

(#5) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Anthony Barnett, district court receipt # 465401226013, FILED.[2472204] [19-91] [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:13 PM]

#6

(#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2476257] [19-91] [Entered: 01/16/2019 10:51 AM]

#7

(#7) NOTICE, to Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2482479] [19-91] [Entered: 01/25/2019 12:19 PM]

#8

(#8) ORDER, dated 01/28/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/11/2019, unless Appellant Anthony Barnett, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se, FILED.[2483000] [19-91] [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:12 AM]

#9

(#9) ORDER, dated 01/28/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/11/2019, unless Appellant Anthony Barnett, submits the Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se, FILED.[2483035] [19-91] [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:35 AM]

#30

(#30) NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2513567] [19-91] [Entered: 03/08/2019 11:32 AM]

#26

(#26) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation, FILED. Service date 02/27/2019 by US mail.[2506402] [19-91] [Entered: 02/27/2019 11:43 AM]

#25

(#25) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [24], on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation, FILED.[2505977] [19-91] [Entered: 02/27/2019 08:47 AM]

#23

(#23) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [16] from the docket, FILED.[2504184] [19-91] [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:44 AM]

#20

(#20) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Anthony Barnett, FILED. Service date 02/13/2019 by US mail.[2501699] [19-91] [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:06 AM]

#19

(#19) ORDER, dated 02/08/2019, dismissing appeal by 03/01/2019, unless Appellant Anthony Barnett, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se, FILED.[2492259] [19-91] [Entered: 02/08/2019 08:58 AM]

#17

(#17) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [16], on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation, FILED.[2491028] [19-91] [Entered: 02/06/2019 03:59 PM]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2513567] [19-91] [Entered: 03/08/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [ # 26 ], on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation, FILED.[2506636] [19-91] [Entered: 02/27/2019 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation, FILED. Service date 02/27/2019 by US mail.[2506402] [19-91] [Entered: 02/27/2019 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [24], on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation, FILED.[2505977] [19-91] [Entered: 02/27/2019 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • (#24) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation, FILED. Service date 02/26/2019 by US mail.[2505334] [19-91] [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [16] from the docket, FILED.[2504184] [19-91] [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Anthony Barnett, FILED. Service date 02/13/2019 by US mail.[2501699] [19-91] [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER, dated 02/08/2019, dismissing appeal by 03/01/2019, unless Appellant Anthony Barnett, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se, FILED.[2492259] [19-91] [Entered: 02/08/2019 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • (#18) ADDRESS CHANGE REQUEST, dated 02/05/2019, COMPLETED.[2491035] [19-91] [Entered: 02/06/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [16], on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation, FILED.[2491028] [19-91] [Entered: 02/06/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation, FILED. Service date 01/29/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2484472] [19-91] [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER, dated 01/28/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/11/2019, unless Appellant Anthony Barnett, submits the Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se, FILED.[2483035] [19-91] [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER, dated 01/28/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/11/2019, unless Appellant Anthony Barnett, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se, FILED.[2483000] [19-91] [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE, to Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2482479] [19-91] [Entered: 01/25/2019 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2476257] [19-91] [Entered: 01/16/2019 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Anthony Barnett, district court receipt # 465401226013, FILED.[2472204] [19-91] [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2472196] [19-91] [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/12/2018, RECEIVED.[2472194] [19-91] [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 12/10/2018, RECEIVED.[2472187] [19-91] [Entered: 01/10/2019 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Anthony Barnett, FILED. [2472176] [19-91] [Entered: 01/10/2019 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.