This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/14/2021 at 06:18:49 (UTC).

Barlow v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 Barlow filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Nationstar Mortgage LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1483

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Bank of America, N.A., a National Corporation

Nationstar Mortgage LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

First Franklin Finance Corporation, a Delaware Corporation

Plaintiff / Appellant

Michael Barlow

Sanborn, NY 14132

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Heather E. Saydah

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Connie Flores Jones Esq.

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

800 Capitol Street

Houston, TX 77002

Charles Jeanfreau Esq.

Attorney at McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC

485 Route 1 South, Building F

Iselin, NJ 08830

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael Barlow

6348 Ward Road

Sanborn, NY 14132

 

Court Documents

#32

#29

#27

#26

#24

#21

#20

#19

#18

#16

#15

#13

#11

#6

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 09/16/2021, appellees' briefs due date as 10/21/2021, copy to pro se, TRANSMITTED.[3155714] [21-1483] [Entered: 08/12/2021 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [ # 26 ], [ # 29 ], on behalf of Appellee Nationstar Mortgage LLC, FILED.[3154803] [21-1483] [Entered: 08/11/2021 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Nationstar Mortgage LLC, FILED. Service date 08/09/2021 by US mail.[3154782] [21-1483] [Entered: 08/11/2021 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, copy to pro se appellant, ASSIGNED.[3154484] [21-1483] [Entered: 08/11/2021 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [25], on behalf of Appellee Nationstar Mortgage LLC, FILED.[3153324] [21-1483] [Entered: 08/10/2021 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docket(#25) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Nationstar Mortgage LLC, FILED. Service date 08/09/2021 by US mail.[3153128] [21-1483] [Entered: 08/09/2021 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America, N.A. and First Franklin Finance Corporation, FILED. Service date 08/09/2021 by US mail.[3153115] [21-1483] [Entered: 08/09/2021 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE, to Appellee Bank of America, N.A., First Franklin Finance Corporation and Nationstar Mortgage LLC, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3150687] [21-1483] [Entered: 08/05/2021 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Michael Barlow, FILED. Service date 07/27/2021 by US mail, email.[3150685] [21-1483] [Entered: 08/05/2021 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Michael Barlow, FILED. Service date 07/15/2021 by US mail.[3145034] [21-1483] [Entered: 07/27/2021 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgement and Notice of Appearance, [10], on behalf of Appellee Nationstar Mortgage LLC, FILED.[3125371] [21-1483] [Entered: 06/24/2021 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY, Connie Flores Jones, [ # 11 ], in place of attorney Heather E. Saydah, SUBSTITUTED.[3125345] [21-1483] [Entered: 06/24/2021 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America, N.A. and First Franklin Finance Corporation, FILED. Service date 06/23/2021 by US mail. [3125124] [21-1483] [Entered: 06/23/2021 07:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Nationstar Mortgage LLC, FILED. Service date 06/23/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3124565] [21-1483] [Entered: 06/23/2021 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3121076] [21-1483] [Entered: 06/16/2021 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3121051] [21-1483] [Entered: 06/16/2021 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Michael Barlow, USCA receipt # BUF072433, FILED.[3121049] [21-1483] [Entered: 06/16/2021 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/18/2021, RECEIVED.[3121047] [21-1483] [Entered: 06/16/2021 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/17/2021, RECEIVED.[3121035] [21-1483] [Entered: 06/16/2021 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Michael Barlow, FILED. [3121020] [21-1483] [Entered: 06/16/2021 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Franklin Financial Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant