This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2019 at 06:01:25 (UTC).

Barbara Sopkin v. Jill Mendelson

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 Barbara Sopkin filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Jill Mendelson. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1763

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

RICHARD S. MENDELSON TRUST

LAND CLARK CARROLL MENDELSON BLAIR P.C.

JILL C. MENDELSON, Executor of Estate of Richard S. Mendelson

Plaintiff / Appellant

BARBARA SOPKIN, General Partner for Interlase Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Robert E. Draim

Attorney at HUDGINS LAW FIRM

2331 Mill Road, Suite 100, 22314

Alexandria, VA 22314-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

John Simon Lopatto III

1776 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-0000

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/16/2019. Response Brief due 10/16/2019 [19-1763] TF [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:21 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00058-AJT-MSN. [19-1763] TF [Entered: 07/22/2019 11:46 AM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John S. Lopatto III for Barbara Sopkin. [1000560483] [19-1763] John Lopatto [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:30 PM]

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Barbara Sopkin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000560487] [19-1763] John Lopatto [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:33 PM]

3 #4

Additional Document

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Richard S. Mendelson Trust. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000561859] [19-1763] David Hudgins [Entered: 08/06/2019 04:30 PM]

3 #1

Appearance of counsel

#13

(#13) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Barbara Sopkin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000562492] [19-1763] John Lopatto [Entered: 08/07/2019 01:58 PM]

#6

(#6) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Barbara Sopkin. [19-1763] John Lopatto [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:35 PM]

#12

(#12) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1763] LHP [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:57 AM]

#14

(#14) ORDER filed [1000575386] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 10/25/2019. Response brief due 12/13/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1763] DL [Entered: 08/27/2019 02:18 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00058-AJT-MSN. Case manager: TFischer. [19-1763] TF [Entered: 07/22/2019 11:21 AM]

#3

Additional Document

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Land Clark Carroll Mendelson Blair P.C.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000561861] [19-1763] David Hudgins [Entered: 08/06/2019 04:30 PM]

#11

(#11) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Jill C. Mendelson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000561863] [19-1763] David Hudgins [Entered: 08/06/2019 04:31 PM]

#7

(#7) Docket correction requested from Land Clark Carroll Mendelson Blair P.C., Jill C. Mendelson and Richard S. Mendelson Trust. [19-1763] TF [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:14 AM]

3 #2

Additional Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER filed [1000575386] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 10/25/2019. Response brief due 12/13/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1763] DL [Entered: 08/27/2019 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Barbara Sopkin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000562492] [19-1763] John Lopatto [Entered: 08/07/2019 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1763] LHP [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Jill C. Mendelson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000561863] [19-1763] David Hudgins [Entered: 08/06/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Land Clark Carroll Mendelson Blair P.C.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000561861] [19-1763] David Hudgins [Entered: 08/06/2019 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Richard S. Mendelson Trust. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000561859] [19-1763] David Hudgins [Entered: 08/06/2019 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/16/2019. Response Brief due 10/16/2019 [19-1763] TF [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Docket correction requested from Land Clark Carroll Mendelson Blair P.C., Jill C. Mendelson and Richard S. Mendelson Trust. [19-1763] TF [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Barbara Sopkin. [19-1763] John Lopatto [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Barbara Sopkin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000560487] [19-1763] John Lopatto [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John S. Lopatto III for Barbara Sopkin. [1000560483] [19-1763] John Lopatto [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robert E. Draim for Land Clark Carroll Mendelson Blair P.C., Jill C. Mendelson and Richard S. Mendelson Trust. [1000560292] [19-1763] David Hudgins [Entered: 08/05/2019 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00058-AJT-MSN. [19-1763] TF [Entered: 07/22/2019 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00058-AJT-MSN. Case manager: TFischer. [19-1763] TF [Entered: 07/22/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.