This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:02:44 (UTC).

Barbara Major v. State of Indiana, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Barbara Major filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against State of Indiana. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2349

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

STATE OF INDIANA

INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Plaintiff / Appellant

BARBARA MAJOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Benjamin M. L. Jones

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

302 W. Washington Street, Indiana Government Center South

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770

Aaron T. Craft

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

302 W. Washington Street, Indiana Government Center South

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Thomas F. Godfrey

Three Bristol Drive

Michigan City, IN 46360

 

Court Documents

5 #2

July 17, 2019

#4

(#4) ORDER: Appellant Barbara Major is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Barbara Major by 08/16/2019.. [4] [7021302] [19-2349] (AD) [Entered: 08/02/2019 12:00 PM]

#8

(#8) ORDER: In light of appellant Barbara Majors failure to respond to the courts orders of July 17, 2019 and August 9, 2019, IT IS ORDERED that appellees file, on or before September 17, 2019, a responsive memorandum addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the courts order of July 17, 2019. [8] [7028730] [19-2349] (VG) [Entered: 09/06/2019 04:07 PM]

1 #4

Fee Notice

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#3

(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Aaron T. Craft for Appellees Indiana Department of Corrections and State of Indiana. [3] [7018387] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-2349]--[Edited 07/19/2019 by MM to reflect termination and addition of counsel.] (Craft, Aaron) [Entered: 07/19/2019 02:48 PM]

#1

Civil Case

5 #1

Other RSC Order Filed

6 #2

C.R. 3(b) Fee Notice

#2

(#2) ORDER: Appellant Major, on or before July 31, 2019, shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be LIMITED to a review of the orders entered on April 29, 2019 and June 14, 2019, denying appellants post-judgment motions. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be suspended pending further court order.(See order for further details) [7017825] DW [2] [7017825] [19-2349] (AP) [Entered: 07/17/2019 12:13 PM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

6 #1

D.C. notice denying IFP filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: In light of appellant Barbara Majors failure to respond to the courts orders of July 17, 2019 and August 9, 2019, IT IS ORDERED that appellees file, on or before September 17, 2019, a responsive memorandum addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the courts order of July 17, 2019. [8] [7028730] [19-2349] (VG) [Entered: 09/06/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • (#7) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Thomas F. Godfrey for Appellant Barbara Major has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [7] [7025186] [19-2349] (LJ) [Entered: 08/22/2019 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Barbara Major leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 07/25/2019. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 09/12/2019 for Appellant Barbara Major [7023227] [6] [7023227] [19-2349] (CAG) [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff-appellant Barbara Major to show cause for her failure to respond to the courts order of July 17, 2019. Plaintiff-Appellant Major shall file her response on or before August 26, 2019. Appellant is advised that failure to respond may result in the dismissal of this appeal. The clerk is directed to attach a copy of the courts order of July 17, 2019, to appellants copy of this order. DW.. [5] [7022734] [19-2349] (AP) [Entered: 08/09/2019 12:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Appellant Barbara Major is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Barbara Major by 08/16/2019.. [4] [7021302] [19-2349] (AD) [Entered: 08/02/2019 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Aaron T. Craft for Appellees Indiana Department of Corrections and State of Indiana. [3] [7018387] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-2349]--[Edited 07/19/2019 by MM to reflect termination and addition of counsel.] (Craft, Aaron) [Entered: 07/19/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER: Appellant Major, on or before July 31, 2019, shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be LIMITED to a review of the orders entered on April 29, 2019 and June 14, 2019, denying appellants post-judgment motions. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be suspended pending further court order.(See order for further details) [7017825] DW [2] [7017825] [19-2349] (AP) [Entered: 07/17/2019 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Barbara Major by 07/22/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 07/30/2019. Fee or IFP forms due on 07/30/2019 for Appellant Barbara Major. [1] [7017651] [19-2349] (AG) [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.