This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/11/2019 at 06:11:22 (UTC).

Banks v. Opat, et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2019 Banks filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Opat. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3073

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

JUNCTION CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT

RILEY COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT

GEARY COUNTY, KANSAS

TOPEKA POLICE DEPARTMENT

Defendant / Appellees

KANSAS BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION

STEVEN L. OPAT

RON MILLER

BRAD SCHOEN

VIRGIN MOBILE USA/SPRINT PCS

SPRINT/NEXTEL WIRELESS TELEPHONE COMPANY

TIMOTHY BROWN

GLEN F. VIRDEN

Plaintiff / Appellant

ALBERT DEWAYNE BANKS

Leavenworth, KS 66048

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Carrie Barney

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General for the State of Kansas

120 Sw 10Th Street, 2Nd Floor

Topeka, KS 66612

Toby Crouse

Attorney at Crouse LLC

11814 Antioch, Unit 253

Overland Park, KS 66210

Eric V. Turner

Attorney at Foulston Siefkin

9225 Indian Creek Parkway, 32 Corporate Woods, Suite 600

Overland Park, KS 66210-2000

Lauren E. Laushman

Attorney at Fisher Patterson Sayler & Smith

3550 Sw Fifth Street

Topeka, KS 66606

David R. Cooper

Attorney at Fisher Patterson Sayler & Smith

3550 Sw Fifth Street

Topeka, KS 66606

Michael L. Walden

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

Jay E. Heidrick

Attorney at Polsinelli

900 West 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112

Michael K. Seck

Attorney at Fisher Patterson Sayler & Smith

9393 West 110Th Street, Suite 300

Overland Park, KS 67210

Jeannette Lynn Wolpink

Attorney at Fisher Patterson Sayler & Smith

9393 West 110Th Street, Suite 300

Overland Park, KS 67210

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Albert Dewayne Banks

Attorney at C.C.A. Leavenworth

100 Highway Terrace

Leavenworth, KS 66048

 

Court Documents

Open Document #3

Envelope

Open Document #2

Attachments

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10648245] 2nd Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Albert Dewayne Banks. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/08/2019 on court only. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3073] [Entered: 05/13/2019 01:28 PM]

Open Document

[10647586] Entry of appearance filed by Carrie Barney for Kansas Bureau of Investigation and Mr. Glen F. Virden. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/09/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-3073] [Entered: 05/09/2019 01:32 PM]

Open Document #2

Volume II - Pleadings (continued)

Open Document #1

Volume I - Pleadings

Open Document

[10646665] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Albert Dewayne Banks. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/02/2019 on court only. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3073] [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:47 PM]

Open Document

[10646028] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: appellees Kansas Department of Corrections and Glen Virden have not filed an entry of appearance. Notice of appearance due on 05/13/2019 for Glen F. Virden and Kansas Bureau of Investigation. [19-3073] [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:25 AM]

Open Document

[10645556] Notice of withdraw filed by attorney Michael L. Walden for Sprint/Nextel Wireless Telephone Company and Virgin Mobile USA/Sprint PCS. Served on 05/02/2019 by US mail.--[Edited 05/02/2019 by MLB to clarify docket text] [19-3073] MLW [Entered: 05/02/2019 08:15 AM]

Open Document

[10645433] Jurisdictional review complete. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 05/22/2019. Appellant's brief due on 06/10/2019 for Albert Dewayne Banks. [19-3073] [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:11 PM]

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10642713] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Eric V. Turner and Mr. Toby Crouse for Mr. Steven L. Opat. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/19/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email [19-3073] [Entered: 04/19/2019 01:32 PM]

Open Document

[10642543] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 05/20/2019 for Lauren E. Laushman. [19-3073] [Entered: 04/19/2019 08:25 AM]

Open Document

[10642259] Entry of appearance filed by David R. Cooper and Lauren E. Laushman for Brad Schoen. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/18/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [19-3073] [Entered: 04/18/2019 10:43 AM]

Open Document

[10641915] Entry of appearance filed by Michael K. Seck and Jeannette Lynn Wolpink for Timothy Brown. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/17/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [19-3073] [Entered: 04/17/2019 09:54 AM]

Open Document #2

New General Dkt Letter - Pro Se

Open Document #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10654773] Appellant's brief filed by Mr. Albert Dewayne Banks. Served on 06/08/2019 by US mail. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? n. Appellees' brief due 07/08/2019 for Glen F. Virden, Kansas Bureau of Investigation, Brad Schoen, Steven L. Opat, Sprint/Nextel Wireless Telephone Company, Virgin Mobile USA/Sprint PCS and Timothy Brown. [19-3073] [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10648245] 2nd Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Albert Dewayne Banks. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/08/2019 on court only. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3073] [Entered: 05/13/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10647586] Entry of appearance filed by Carrie Barney for Kansas Bureau of Investigation and Mr. Glen F. Virden. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/09/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-3073] [Entered: 05/09/2019 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • [10647554] Entry of appearance submitted by Carrie A. Barney for Appellees Kansas Bureau of Investigation and Mr. Glen F. Virden for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/09/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 05/09/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 5/9/19][19-3073] CB [Entered: 05/09/2019 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10647480] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 3. Volumes I, II and III - Pleadings. Volume III is restricted - pleading stricken in district court. [19-3073] [Entered: 05/09/2019 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10646665] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Albert Dewayne Banks. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/02/2019 on court only. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3073] [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10646028] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: appellees Kansas Department of Corrections and Glen Virden have not filed an entry of appearance. Notice of appearance due on 05/13/2019 for Glen F. Virden and Kansas Bureau of Investigation. [19-3073] [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10645556] Notice of withdraw filed by attorney Michael L. Walden for Sprint/Nextel Wireless Telephone Company and Virgin Mobile USA/Sprint PCS. Served on 05/02/2019 by US mail.--[Edited 05/02/2019 by MLB to clarify docket text] [19-3073] MLW [Entered: 05/02/2019 08:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10645433] Jurisdictional review complete. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 05/22/2019. Appellant's brief due on 06/10/2019 for Albert Dewayne Banks. [19-3073] [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10645429] District court order granting 1915(b) motion. [19-3073] [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2019
  • [10643556] Attorney Lauren E. Laushman for Brad Schoen admitted to the bar of this court. [19-3073] [Entered: 04/24/2019 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10642713] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Eric V. Turner and Mr. Toby Crouse for Mr. Steven L. Opat. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/19/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email [19-3073] [Entered: 04/19/2019 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • [10642709] Entry of appearance submitted by Toby Crouse and Eric Turner for Appellee Mr. Steven L. Opat for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/19/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/19/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 4/19/19][19-3073] TC [Entered: 04/19/2019 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10642543] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 05/20/2019 for Lauren E. Laushman. [19-3073] [Entered: 04/19/2019 08:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10642259] Entry of appearance filed by David R. Cooper and Lauren E. Laushman for Brad Schoen. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/18/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [19-3073] [Entered: 04/18/2019 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • [10642232] Entry of appearance submitted by David R. Cooper and Lauren E. Laushman for Appellee Brad Schoen for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/18/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-3073]--[Edited 04/18/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] DRC [Entered: 04/18/2019 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • [10641922] Minute order filed - Notice of appearance or notice of non-participation due on 05/01/2019 for Kansas Bureau of Investigation and Brad Schoen. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3073] [Entered: 04/17/2019 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10641915] Entry of appearance filed by Michael K. Seck and Jeannette Lynn Wolpink for Timothy Brown. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/17/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [19-3073] [Entered: 04/17/2019 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • [10641895] Entry of appearance submitted by Michael K. Seck and Jeannette L. Wolpink for Appellee Mr. Timothy Brown for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/17/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-3073] --[Edited 04/17/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] MKS [Entered: 04/17/2019 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10641032] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/12/2019. Fee or 1915 forms due in district court 05/13/2019 for Albert Dewayne Banks. Notice of appearance due on 05/13/2019 for Albert Dewayne Banks. Notice of appearance due on 04/26/2019 for Timothy Brown, Steven L. Opat, Sprint/Nextel Wireless Telephone Company, Glen F. Virden and Virgin Mobile USA/Sprint PCS. [19-3073] [Entered: 04/12/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Topeka Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases where Kansas Bureau of Investigation is a litigant

Latest cases where RILEY COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where SPRINT NEXTEL CORPORATION is a litigant