This case was last updated from PACER on 04/10/2021 at 06:21:10 (UTC).

Banks v. City of Niagara Falls

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 Banks filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Niagara Falls. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-257

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Debra V. Johnson

Cassandra Weeden-Cooper

Charles Byrd

Raymond Barry Mitchell

Timothy Weston Swanson

Shelia Denise Hilson

Charles W. Wilson

Rick Dumas, Jr., Individually and as Parent and Natural Guardian of A.D., infant

Marcus Jermaine Lumpkin

Greg Butkowski, Sr.

Mary Sonya Price

Barbara Ann Young

Deborah Lynn Swanson

Bobby J. Betton

Cheri Lynn Mulder

Connie Y. Smith

Catherine Elizabeth Mixon

Defendant / Appellants

Occidental Chemical Corporation

City of Niagara Falls

Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc.

45 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Peter A. Kraus Esq.

Attorney at Waters & Kraus, LLP

3141 Hood Street

Dallas, TX 75219

Steven J. Phillips Esq.

Attorney at Phillips & Paolicelli, LLP

747 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Douglas E. Fleming Esq. III

Attorney at Dechert LLP

3 Bryant Park, 1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Andrew Patrick Devine Esq.

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

1 Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203

Kevin M. Hogan Esq.

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

1 Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203

Elizabeth Bove Esq.

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

1 Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203

Thomas J. DeBoy Esq.

Attorney at City of Niagara Falls Law Department

745 Main Street, P.O. Box 69

Niagara Falls, NY 14302

Other Attorneys

Brian Sutter

Attorney at Sugarman Law Firm LLP

1600 Rand Building, 14 Lafayette Square

Buffalo, NY 14203

Alice Jean Cunningham Esq.

Attorney at The Knoer Group, PLLC

424 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14202

Jeffrey D. Schulman Esq.

Attorney at Pillinger Miller Tarallo, LLP

507 Plum Street

Syracuse, NY 13204

Zackary D. Knaub Esq.

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

54 State Street

Albany, NY 12207

William G. Beck

Attorney at Lathrop GPM LLP

2345 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

Agnieszka Wilewicz Esq.

Attorney at Hurwitz & Fine, P.C.

1300 Liberty Building

Buffalo, NY 14202

Robert E. Knoer

Attorney at The Knoer Group, PLLC

424 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14202

Jeffrey Charles Stravino Esq.

Attorney at Hodgson Russ LLP

The Guaranty Building, 140 Pearl Street

Buffalo, NY 14202

 

Court Documents

#42

#39

#38

#36

#33

#32

#30

#26

#25

#24

#23

#21

#19

#18

#15

#14

#13

#10

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, designating 21-249 as the lead appeal, holding appeals 21-237, 21-245, 21-247, 21-248, 21-250, 21-251, 21-252, 21-253, 21-255, 21-256, 21-257, 21-259, 21-260, 21-264, 21-265, 21-269, 21-281, and 21-285 in abeyance pending the Courts decision in the lead appeal, directing opening forms be filed within 7 days, and setting the briefing schedule for lead appeal, by JON, FILED. [ # 30 ] [3058257][42] [21-257] [Entered: 03/17/2021 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [ # 38 ], [ # 39 ], on behalf of Appellant Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., FILED.[3056818] [21-257] [Entered: 03/16/2021 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/16/2021 by CM/ECF.[3056783] [21-257] [Entered: 03/16/2021 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [37], on behalf of Appellant Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., FILED.[3056753] [21-257] [Entered: 03/16/2021 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docket(#37) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/15/2021 by CM/ECF.[3056030] [21-257] [Entered: 03/15/2021 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) CAPTION, added Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc. as a Defendant-Appellant, AMENDED.[3055738] [21-257] [Entered: 03/15/2021 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ATTORNEY, Elizabeth Bove for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. Occidental Chemical Corporation Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., in case 21-257 , [ # 33 ], ADDED.[3055195] [21-257] [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ATTORNEY, Andrew Patrick Devine for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. Occidental Chemical Corporation Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., in case 21-257 , [ # 32 ], ADDED.[3055193] [21-257] [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/11/2021 by CM/ECF. [3054464] [21-257] [Entered: 03/11/2021 05:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/11/2021 by CM/ECF. [3054423] [21-257] [Entered: 03/11/2021 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CAPTION, Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates added, AMENDED.[3044794] [21-257] [Entered: 02/25/2021 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Scott Lawn Yard, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/25/2021 by CM/ECF.[3044587] [21-257] [Entered: 02/25/2021 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 02/24/2021 by CM/ECF.[3043593] [21-257] [Entered: 02/24/2021 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Roy's Plumbing, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/22/2021 by CM/ECF.[3041416] [21-257] [Entered: 02/22/2021 05:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docket(#7) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Peter A. Kraus, Esq. for Appellees Charles Byrd, Georgia Williams, Valerie Starks, Wanda Elaine Banks, Ula M. Seaberry, Bobby J. Betton, Vivian C. Betton, Louise Elder Blissett, Jean Bonanno, Linda Mae Buczak, Greg Butkowski, Sr., Christopher Lynn Carr, Lance D. Carter, Sr., Rick Dumas, Jr., Shelia Denise Hilson, Debra V. Johnson, Cynthia Jones, Russell Ambrose Lester, Thomas Wayne Lester, Evelyn Lowe, Genita Lowery, Marcus Jermaine Lumpkin, Quentin Vernon Lumpkin, Barbara E. Martin, Sherri Ann McMahon, Raymond Barry Mitchell, Catherine Elizabeth Mixon, Cheri Lynn Mulder, Mary Sonya Price, Margaret Mary Kurtis Robazza, Tara Lynn Rodwell, Daniel R. Schultz, Joanne Scott, Montrisa Denise Scott, Connie Y. Smith, Valorie Grant Smith, Deborah Lynn Swanson, Nathaniel W. Swanson, Timothy Weston Swanson, Yolanda Thorton, Robert Charles Tompkins, Joyce Elder Truss, Roger Roy Walker, Willie Lee Walker, Kim Renee Ward, Cassandra Weeden-Cooper, Eula Pearl Welch, Anissa Williams, Ronnica Denise Williams, Belinda Ruth Wilson, Charles W. Wilson, David Allen Winkfield, Robert Earl Works, Jr., Tonia Works and Barbara Ann Young, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3034972] [21-257] [Entered: 02/11/2021 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docket(#6) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Zackary D. Knaub, Esq. for Appellant CECOS International, Inc., orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3034969] [21-257] [Entered: 02/11/2021 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docket(#5) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Thomas J. DeBoy, Esq. for Appellant City of Niagara Falls, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3034968] [21-257] [Entered: 02/11/2021 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants CECOS International, Inc., City of Niagara Falls, Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., OP-Tech Environmental Services, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Roy's Plumbing, Inc. and Scott Lawn Yard, Inc., district court receipt # 0209-4143144, FILED.[3034966] [21-257] [Entered: 02/11/2021 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 01/25/2021, RECEIVED.[3034964] [21-257] [Entered: 02/11/2021 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants CECOS International, Inc., City of Niagara Falls, Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., OP-Tech Environmental Services, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Roy's Plumbing, Inc. and Scott Lawn Yard, Inc., FILED. [3034958] [21-257] [Entered: 02/11/2021 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION is a litigant