This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2020 at 06:06:23 (UTC).

Bank of New York Mellon v. T-Shack, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Bank of New York Mellon filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against T-Shack, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15228

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

BLACKHORSE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant / Appellant

T-SHACK, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellee

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2004-36CB, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-36CB, FKA Bank of New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Chris V. Yergensen

395 Gatlinburg Court

Henderson, NV 89012

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Natalie L. Winslow Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Jamie Combs

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Darren T. Brenner

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Rex D. Garner

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 04/27/2020, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant T-Shack, Inc. opening brief due 05/15/2020. Appellee Bank of New York Mellon answering brief due 06/15/2020. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11656990] (CL) [Entered: 04/10/2020 08:07 AM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Further Conference, 04/09/2020, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11637895] (CL) [Entered: 03/23/2020 08:28 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 03/19/2020, 2:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [11610949] (VS) [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:55 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant T-Shack, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/20/2020. [11603249] [20-15228] (Yergensen, Chris) [Entered: 02/20/2020 12:16 PM]

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 04/27/2020, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant T-Shack, Inc. opening brief due 05/15/2020. Appellee Bank of New York Mellon answering brief due 06/15/2020. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11656990] (CL) [Entered: 04/10/2020 08:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Further Conference, 04/09/2020, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11637895] (CL) [Entered: 03/23/2020 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 03/19/2020, 2:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [11610949] (VS) [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/20/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11603297]. [20-15228] (AD) [Entered: 02/20/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant T-Shack, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/20/2020. [11603249] [20-15228] (Yergensen, Chris) [Entered: 02/20/2020 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant T-Shack, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/20/2020. Appellant T-Shack, Inc. opening brief due 04/15/2020. Appellee Bank of New York Mellon answering brief due 05/15/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11596656] (RT) [Entered: 02/13/2020 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less