This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/08/2019 at 06:08:44 (UTC).

Bank of New York Mellon v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 Bank of New York Mellon filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-15223

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as trustee on behalf of the holders of the alternative loan trust 2006OA2, Mortgage Pass through Certificates Series 2006-OA2, FKA The Bank of New York

Defendant

SOUTHERN HIGHLANDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Counter Claimant

SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC

Cross Defendants

CHRISTOPHER R. ENGLAND

KRISTEN M. ENGLAND

3Rd Party Defendant

ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Jamie Combs

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Ariel Edward Stern Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Richard Aaron Chastain

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Diana S. Ebron

Attorney at Kim Gilbert Ebron

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

Jacqueline A. Gilbert Esquire

Attorney at Kim Gilbert Ebron

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - FurtherConference, 04/26/2019, 1:30 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11249747] (VS) [Entered: 04/02/2019 10:33 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 03/29/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11214397] (CL) [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:18 AM]

#2

Additional Document

2 #1

Main Document

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - FurtherConference, 04/26/2019, 1:30 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11249747] (VS) [Entered: 04/02/2019 10:33 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • (#7) Added attorney Richard Aaron Chastain, Stephen Colmery Parsley for Bank of New York Mellon, in case 19-15223. [11242523] (RR) [Entered: 03/26/2019 11:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard Aaron Chastain for Appellee Bank of New York Mellon. Date of service: 03/25/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11240973] [19-15223] (Chastain, Richard) [Entered: 03/25/2019 01:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen Colmery Parsley for Appellee Bank of New York Mellon. Date of service: 03/25/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11240957] [19-15223] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 03/25/2019 12:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 03/29/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11214397] (CL) [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/14/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11190481] (AD) [Entered: 02/14/2019 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/14/2019. [11190370] [19-15223] (Gilbert, Jacqueline) [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/14/2019. Transcript ordered by 03/08/2019. Transcript due 04/08/2019. Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC opening brief due 05/17/2019. Appellee Bank of New York Mellon answering brief due 06/17/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11182486] (JBS) [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:35 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less