This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/25/2022 at 06:05:32 (UTC).

Bank of New York Mellon v. SFR Investment Pool, 1, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 Bank of New York Mellon filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SFR Investment Pool, 1, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-16663

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-82, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-82, FKA Bank of New York

Defendant / Appellant

SFR INVESTMENT POOL, 1, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Ariel Edward Stern Esquire

Nicholas E. Belay Esquire

Scott Lachman

Natalie L. Winslow Esquire

Lilith Vala Xara Esquire

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Chantel Schimming

Karen Hanks

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court, filed 10/26/2022. [12573763] (HH) [Entered: 10/26/2022 04:02 PM]

#3

(#3) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12586541] (BLS) [Entered: 11/14/2022 02:44 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant SFR Investment Pool, 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/15/2022. [12587631] [22-16663] (Hanks, Karen) [Entered: 11/15/2022 11:48 AM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 01/04/2023, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12600453] (CL) [Entered: 12/01/2022 03:58 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 01/04/2023, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12600453] (CL) [Entered: 12/01/2022 03:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/15/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12587696]. [22-16663] (AD) [Entered: 11/15/2022 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant SFR Investment Pool, 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/15/2022. [12587631] [22-16663] (Hanks, Karen) [Entered: 11/15/2022 11:48 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12586541] (BLS) [Entered: 11/14/2022 02:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court, filed 10/26/2022. [12573763] (HH) [Entered: 10/26/2022 04:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant SFR Investment Pool, 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/02/2022. Transcript ordered by 11/25/2022. Transcript due 12/27/2022. Appellant SFR Investment Pool, 1, LLC opening brief due 02/02/2023. Appellee Bank of New York Mellon answering brief due 03/06/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12573388] (JMR) [Entered: 10/26/2022 01:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less