This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/23/2020 at 06:13:45 (UTC).

Bank of America, N.A. v. TRP Fund V, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Bank of America, N A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against TRP Fund V, LLC,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-16626

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendants

POSHBABY, LLC, AKA Poshbaby LLC Series 9070 Spring Mountain #114

LAKEVIEW OWNERS' ASSOCIATION

TRP FUND V, LLC

ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC

3Rd Party Defendant

ELIZABETH A. PETERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rex D. Garner

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Jamie Combs

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Ariel Edward Stern Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Richard Aaron Chastain

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorney

John Henry Wright Esquire

Attorney at The Wright Law Group, P.C.

2340 Paseo Del Prado, Suite D-305

Las Vegas, NV 89102

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#9) Added Attorney(s) Richard Aaron Chastain for party(s) Appellee Bank of America, N.A., in case 20-16626. [11855761] (RR) [Entered: 10/13/2020 09:58 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard Aaron Chastain (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, 1819 Fifth Ave. N., Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 10/12/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11855104] [20-16626] (Chastain, Richard) [Entered: 10/12/2020 06:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Stephen Colmery Parsley for party(s) Appellee Bank of America, N.A., in case 20-16626. [11854920] (RR) [Entered: 10/09/2020 05:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen Colmery Parsley (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, 1819 Fifth Ave. N., Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 10/09/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11854789] [20-16626] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 10/09/2020 04:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 11/18/2020, 12:00 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant TRP Fund V, LLC opening brief due 01/19/2021. Appellee Bank of America, N.A. answering brief due 02/18/2021. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11851535] (BLS) [Entered: 10/07/2020 05:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/07/2020, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11813089] (BLS) [Entered: 09/03/2020 05:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/31/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11808654]. [20-16626] (AD) [Entered: 08/31/2020 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant TRP Fund V, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/31/2020. [11808436] [20-16626] (Wright, John) [Entered: 08/31/2020 04:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant TRP Fund V, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/31/2020. Appellant TRP Fund V, LLC opening brief due 10/20/2020. Appellee Bank of America, N.A. answering brief due 11/19/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11799800] (JBS) [Entered: 08/24/2020 10:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rex Garner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire