This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2020 at 06:05:36 (UTC).

Bank of America, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Bank of America, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15205

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., successor by merger on behalf of BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP, FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP

Defendants

BAR ARBOR GLEN AT PROVIDENCE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC.

Counter Claimant

SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Natalie L. Winslow Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Ariel Edward Stern Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Richard Aaron Chastain

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Diana S. Ebron

Attorney at Kim Gilbert Ebron

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

Jacqueline A. Gilbert Esquire

Attorney at Kim Gilbert Ebron

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

Karen Hanks

Attorney at Kim Gilbert Ebron

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Court is informed that this matter has settled. By 04/09/2020, Appellant to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss, or contact the circuit mediator. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. See order for details. [11604377] (MS) [Entered: 02/21/2020 09:16 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/14/2020. [11597854] [20-15205] (Gilbert, Jacqueline) [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:09 AM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Court is informed that this matter has settled. By 04/09/2020, Appellant to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss, or contact the circuit mediator. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. See order for details. [11604377] (MS) [Entered: 02/21/2020 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Richard Aaron Chastain for party(s) Appellee Bank of America, N.A., in case 20-15205. [11600113] (CW) [Entered: 02/18/2020 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard Aaron Chastain (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, One Federal Place, 1819 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 02/18/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11600019] [20-15205] (Chastain, Richard) [Entered: 02/18/2020 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Stephen Colmery Parsley for party(s) Appellee Bank of America, N.A., in case 20-15205. [11599833] (CW) [Entered: 02/18/2020 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen Colmery Parsley (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, One Federal Place, 1819 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 02/18/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11599797] [20-15205] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 02/18/2020 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/14/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11598083]. [20-15205] (AD) [Entered: 02/14/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/14/2020. [11597854] [20-15205] (Gilbert, Jacqueline) [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/19/2020. Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC opening brief due 04/13/2020. Appellee Bank of America, N.A. answering brief due 05/12/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11594562] (JBS) [Entered: 02/12/2020 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.