This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:03:56 (UTC).

Bank of America, N.A. v. Saticoy Bay LLC Series 3844 Bl, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Bank of America, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Saticoy Bay LLC Series 3844 Bl. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16392

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

GLENEAGLES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC.

Defendant / Appellant

SATICOY BAY LLC SERIES 3844 BLUE GULL

Plaintiff / Appellee

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Michael F. Bohn

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael Bohn

2260 Corporate Circle, Suite 480

Hednerson, NV 89074

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Tenesa Susan Powell

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Jared Sechrist

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Darren T. Brenner

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Ariel Edward Stern Esquire

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89144

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Mediaiton Letter

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Saticoy Bay LLC Series 3844 Blue Gull Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/22/2019. [11371795] [19-16392] (Bohn, Michael) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:07 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 10/10/2019, Appellant to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss, or contact the circuit mediator. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. See order for details. [11411376] (BLS) [Entered: 08/27/2019 09:10 AM]

#1

Docketing Letter

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 08/26/2019, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11398732] (MS) [Entered: 08/15/2019 02:27 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 08/15/2019, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11381970] (BLS) [Entered: 07/30/2019 06:01 PM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 10/10/2019, Appellant to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss, or contact the circuit mediator. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. See order for details. [11411376] (BLS) [Entered: 08/27/2019 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 08/26/2019, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11398732] (MS) [Entered: 08/15/2019 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 08/15/2019, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11381970] (BLS) [Entered: 07/30/2019 06:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/22/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11372550][19-16392] (AD) [Entered: 07/22/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Saticoy Bay LLC Series 3844 Blue Gull Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/22/2019. [11371795] [19-16392] (Bohn, Michael) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/22/2019. Appellant Saticoy Bay LLC Series 3844 Blue Gull opening brief due 09/13/2019. Appellee Bank of America, N.A. answering brief due 10/15/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11363778] (RT) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less