Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/19/2021 at 21:30:04 (UTC).

Banca Arner S.A. v. The Republic of Argentina

Case Summary

On 03/04/2016 Banca Arner S A filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against The Republic of Argentina. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    16-641

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Montreux Partners, L.P.

Cordoba Capital

EM Ltd.

Wilton Capital

Defendant / Appellee

Republic of Argentina

Plaintiff / Appellants

Banca Arner S.A.

Brantford Holding S.A.

Amicus Curiae

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Neil Lieberman Esq.

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

750 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Michael Shuster Esq.

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

750 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Richard J. Holwell Esq.

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

750 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Vincent Levy Esq.

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

750 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Michael B. Mukasey Esq.

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

919 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Carmine D. Boccuzzi Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

1 Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Audrey Lu Esq.

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

340 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10173

Banks Brown Esq.

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

340 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10173

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Benjamin H. Torrance

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York

86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

Jeannette Anne Vargas

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York

86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#163

No Description Available

#190

No Description Available

#187

No Description Available

#176

No Description Available

163 #2

Supporting Document

158 #1

Calendar_Notice_Hearing

#151

No Description Available

#142

No Description Available

#136

No Description Available

127 #2

Notice_to_the_BAR

#80

No Description Available

#79

No Description Available

#77

No Description Available

74 #1

Volume 36, Part 1

72 #2

Volume 22, Part 2

#21

(#10) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals, granting motion to expedite appeals, Appellants principal briefs are due March 14, 2016; Appellees opposition brief is due March 21, 2016; Appellants reply briefs are due March 25, 2016. [ # 1719982-3 ] filed by Appellee Republic of Argentina in 16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-662, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-670, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-675, 16-676, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-696, 16-697, 16-698, [ # 1722018-2 ] [ # 1722014-2 ] [ # 1722008-2 ] [ # 1722003-2 ] [ # 1721192-2 ] [ # 1721190-2 ] [ # 1721187-2 ] [ # 1721184-2 ] [ # 1721582-2 ] [ # 1721214-2 ] [ # 1721179-2 ] [ # 1721212-2 ] [ # 1721581-2 ] [ # 1721577-3 ] [ # 1721210-2 ] [ # 1721175-2 ] [ # 1721162-2 ] [ # 1721576-2 ] [ # 1721209-2 ] [ # 1721208-2 ] [ # 1721207-2 ] [ # 1721202-2 ] [ # 1721198-2 ] [ # 1721197-2 ] [ # 1721195-2 ] [ # 1722042-2 ] [ # 1720976-2 ] [ # 1722035-2 ] [ # 1720970-3 ] [ # 1720969-2 ] [ # 1722030-2 ] [ # 1722026-2 ] [ # 1719981-3 ] [ # 1720881-2 ] [ # 1719982-2 ] [ # 1722018-3 ] [ # 1722014-3 ] [ # 1722008-3 ] [ # 1722003-3 ] [ # 1721192-3 ] [ # 1721190-3 ] [ # 1721187-3 ] [ # 1721184-3 ] [ # 1721582-3 ] [ # 1721214-3 ] [ # 1721179-3 ] [ # 1721212-3 ] [ # 1721581-3 ] [ # 1721577-2 ] [ # 1721210-3 ] [ # 1721175-3 ] [ # 1721162-3 ] [ # 1721576-3 ] [ # 1721209-3 ] [ # 1721208-3 ] [ # 1721207-3 ] [ # 1721202-3 ] [ # 1721198-3 ] [ # 1721197-3 ] [ # 1721195-3 ] [ # 1722042-3 ] [ # 1720976-3 ] [ # 1722035-3 ] [ # 1720970-2 ] [ # 1720969-3 ] [ # 1722030-3 ] [ # 1722026-3 ] [ # 1719981-2 ] f [ # 1720881-3 ], by RCW, FILED. [1722338][10] [16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-662, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-670, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-675, 16-676, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-696, 16-697, 16-698] [Entered: 03/08/2016 04:36 PM]

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2016
  • Docket(#181) ARGUMENT CD, sent to John DiGregorio, TRANSMITTED.[1765022] [16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-662, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-670, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-696, 16-697, 16-698] [Entered: 05/04/2016 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Docket(#180) ARGUMENT CD, picked up by Cynthia Scott of Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP, TRANSMITTED.[1765020] [16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-662, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-670, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-696, 16-697, 16-698] [Entered: 05/04/2016 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Docket(#179) ARGUMENT CD, picked up by Jessica Bengels of Latham & Watkins, TRANSMITTED.[1765016] [16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-662, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-670, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-696, 16-697, 16-698] [Entered: 05/04/2016 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Docket(#178) ARGUMENT CD, sent to Anthony Costantini of Duane Morris, TRANSMITTED.[1765008] [16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-662, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-670, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-696, 16-697, 16-698] [Entered: 05/04/2016 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Docket(#177) ARGUMENT CD, sent to Evan Farber, of Reed Smith, TRANSMITTED.[1764990] [16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-662, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-670, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-696, 16-697, 16-698] [Entered: 05/04/2016 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Docket(#176) ARGUMENT CD, ready to be picked up by Jessica Bengels of Latham and Watkins LLP, TRANSMITTED.[1756233] [16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-696, 16-697, 16-698] [Entered: 04/22/2016 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Docket(#175) ARGUMENT CD, ready to be picked up by Cynthia Scott of Cleary Gotlieb, LLP, TRANSMITTED.[1756230] [16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-696, 16-697, 16-698] [Entered: 04/22/2016 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Docket(#174) ARGUMENT CD, sent to Evan K. Farber of Reed Smith, LLP, TRANSMITTED.[1756227] [16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-696, 16-697, 16-698] [Entered: 04/22/2016 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Docket(#182) ARGUMENT CD, sent to Neil Lieberman of Holwell Shuster and Goldberg LLP, TRANSMITTED.[1765829] [16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-662, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-670, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-696, 16-697, 16-698] [Entered: 05/05/2016 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Docket(#183) ARGUMENT CD, picked up by Charles Calvaruso of Morgan Lewis,TRANSMITTED.[1765856] [16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-662, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-670, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-696, 16-697, 16-698] [Entered: 05/05/2016 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ATTORNEY, Brian Rosen for Trinity Investments Limited, in case 16-697 , [ # 1722392-2 ], ADDED.[1722600] [16-697, 16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-662, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-670, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-675, 16-676, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-696, 16-698] [Entered: 03/09/2016 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY, Brian Rosen for Trinity Investments Limited, in case 16-695 , [ # 1722377-2 ], ADDED.[1722588] [16-695, 16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-662, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-670, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-675, 16-676, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-696, 16-697, 16-698] [Entered: 03/09/2016 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY, Brian Rosen for MCHA Holdings, LLC, in case 16-682 , [ # 1722368-2 ], ADDED.[1722549] [16-682, 16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-662, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-670, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-675, 16-676, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-696, 16-697, 16-698] [Entered: 03/09/2016 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Republic of Argentina in 16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-662, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-670, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-675, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-696, 16-697, 16-698, FILED. Service date 03/08/2016 by CM/ECF. [1722390] [16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-662, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-670, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-675, 16-676, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-696, 16-697, 16-698] [Entered: 03/08/2016 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals, granting motion to expedite appeals, Appellants principal briefs are due March 14, 2016; Appellees opposition brief is due March 21, 2016; Appellants reply briefs are due March 25, 2016. [ # 1719982-3 ] filed by Appellee Republic of Argentina in 16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-662, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-670, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-675, 16-676, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-696, 16-697, 16-698, [ # 1722018-2 ] [ # 1722014-2 ] [ # 1722008-2 ] [ # 1722003-2 ] [ # 1721192-2 ] [ # 1721190-2 ] [ # 1721187-2 ] [ # 1721184-2 ] [ # 1721582-2 ] [ # 1721214-2 ] [ # 1721179-2 ] [ # 1721212-2 ] [ # 1721581-2 ] [ # 1721577-3 ] [ # 1721210-2 ] [ # 1721175-2 ] [ # 1721162-2 ] [ # 1721576-2 ] [ # 1721209-2 ] [ # 1721208-2 ] [ # 1721207-2 ] [ # 1721202-2 ] [ # 1721198-2 ] [ # 1721197-2 ] [ # 1721195-2 ] [ # 1722042-2 ] [ # 1720976-2 ] [ # 1722035-2 ] [ # 1720970-3 ] [ # 1720969-2 ] [ # 1722030-2 ] [ # 1722026-2 ] [ # 1719981-3 ] [ # 1720881-2 ] [ # 1719982-2 ] [ # 1722018-3 ] [ # 1722014-3 ] [ # 1722008-3 ] [ # 1722003-3 ] [ # 1721192-3 ] [ # 1721190-3 ] [ # 1721187-3 ] [ # 1721184-3 ] [ # 1721582-3 ] [ # 1721214-3 ] [ # 1721179-3 ] [ # 1721212-3 ] [ # 1721581-3 ] [ # 1721577-2 ] [ # 1721210-3 ] [ # 1721175-3 ] [ # 1721162-3 ] [ # 1721576-3 ] [ # 1721209-3 ] [ # 1721208-3 ] [ # 1721207-3 ] [ # 1721202-3 ] [ # 1721198-3 ] [ # 1721197-3 ] [ # 1721195-3 ] [ # 1722042-3 ] [ # 1720976-3 ] [ # 1722035-3 ] [ # 1720970-2 ] [ # 1720969-3 ] [ # 1722030-3 ] [ # 1722026-3 ] [ # 1719981-2 ] f [ # 1720881-3 ], by RCW, FILED. [1722338][10] [16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-662, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-670, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-675, 16-676, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-696, 16-697, 16-698] [Entered: 03/08/2016 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY, Suzan Jo for Claridae Ltd Maria Del Pilar De We Ferrer, in case 16-696 , [ # 1721670-2 ], ADDED.[1722320] [16-696, 16-628, 16-639, 16-640, 16-641, 16-642, 16-643, 16-644, 16-649, 16-650, 16-651, 16-653, 16-657, 16-658, 16-659, 16-660, 16-661, 16-662, 16-664, 16-665, 16-666, 16-667, 16-668, 16-669, 16-670, 16-671, 16-672, 16-673, 16-674, 16-675, 16-676, 16-677, 16-678, 16-681, 16-682, 16-683, 16-684, 16-685, 16-686, 16-687, 16-688, 16-689, 16-690, 16-691, 16-694, 16-695, 16-697, 16-698] [Entered: 03/08/2016 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1719486] [16-641] [Entered: 03/04/2016 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 03/02/2016, RECEIVED.[1719484] [16-641] [Entered: 03/04/2016 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Docket(#2) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Banca Arner S.A. and Brantford Holding S.A., district court receipt # 0208-12027045, FILED.[1719482] [16-641] [Entered: 03/04/2016 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Banca Arner S.A. and Brantford Holding S.A., FILED. [1719478] [16-641] [Entered: 03/04/2016 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brantford Holding S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Cordoba Capital is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilton Capital is a litigant