Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/19/2021 at 20:57:32 (UTC).

Banca Arner S.A. v. Republic of Argentina

Case Summary

On 11/12/2015 Banca Arner S A filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Republic of Argentina. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    15-3649

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Banca Arner S.A.

Brantford Holding S.A.

Defendant / Appellant

Republic of Argentina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Banks Brown Esq.

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

340 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10173

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Daniel Slifkin

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP

Worldwide Plaza, 825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Michael A. Paskin Esq.

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP

Worldwide Plaza, 825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Carmine D. Boccuzzi Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

1 Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Damaris Hernandez Esq.

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP

Worldwide Plaza, 825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Banca Arner S.A. and Brantford Holding S.A., FILED. Service date 11/25/2015 by CM/ECF.[1651246] [15-3649] [Entered: 11/25/2015 10:39 AM]

#10

(#10) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. Service date 11/24/2015 by CM/ECF.[1649906] [15-3649] [Entered: 11/24/2015 11:58 AM]

#9

(#9) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. Service date 11/24/2015 by CM/ECF.[1649890] [15-3649] [Entered: 11/24/2015 11:53 AM]

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. Service date 11/19/2015 by CM/ECF.[1646845] [15-3649] [Entered: 11/19/2015 05:59 PM]

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 10/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1641403] [15-3649] [Entered: 11/13/2015 11:02 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#121

(#60) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 02/24/2016, disposing of the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][1712478] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/24/2016 05:02 PM]

#120

(#59) APPEAL, pursuant to court order, dated 02/24/2016, DISMISSED.[1712477] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/24/2016 04:59 PM]

#119

(#58) MOTION ORDER, granting motion for FRAP 12.1 (b) remand [ # 29 ] filed by Appellant Republic of Argentina; denying as moot motion to extend time [ # 30 ] filed by Appellant Republic of Argentina; denying as moot motion to refer the motion to remand to panel hearing [ # 31 ] filed by Appellee NML Capital, Ltd., by JMW, RR, PWH, C.JJ., FILED. [1712473][58] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/24/2016 04:57 PM]

#118

(#57) NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[1712452] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/24/2016 04:40 PM]

#110

(#52) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, for FRAP 12.1 (b) remand [ # 29 ], on behalf of Appellee Paola Aiello, Banca Arner S.A., Brantford Holding S.A. and Paolo Ercolani in 15-3675, Appellee Banca Arner S.A. and Brantford Holding S.A. in 15-3649, Appellee Paola Aiello and Paolo Ercolani in 15-3679, FILED. Service date 02/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1711610] [15-3675, 15-3649, 15-3679] [Entered: 02/23/2016 07:18 PM]

109 #2

Supporting Document

109 #1

Opposition FILED

#104

(#50) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cordoba Capital, Los Angeles Capital, Montreux Partners, L.P. and Wilton Capital in 15-3675, Appellee Montreux Partners, L.P. in 15-3616, Appellee Wilton Capital in 15-3653, Appellee Los Angeles Capital in 15-3657, Appellee Cordoba Capital in 15-3715, FILED. Service date 02/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1711443] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/23/2016 04:15 PM]

#103

(#49) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cordoba Capital, Los Angeles Capital, Montreux Partners, L.P. and Wilton Capital in 15-3675, Appellee Montreux Partners, L.P. in 15-3616, Appellee Wilton Capital in 15-3653, Appellee Los Angeles Capital in 15-3657, Appellee Cordoba Capital in 15-3715, FILED. Service date 02/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1711428] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/23/2016 04:11 PM]

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • Docket(#61) ARGUMENT CD, by Holwell, Shuster & Goldberg LLP is ready for pick up TRANSMITTED.[1714394] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/29/2016 08:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Docket(#62) ARGUMENT CD, sent to Vincent Levy, TRANSMITTED.[1748586] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 04/12/2016 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 02/24/2016, disposing of the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][1712478] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/24/2016 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) APPEAL, pursuant to court order, dated 02/24/2016, DISMISSED.[1712477] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/24/2016 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) MOTION ORDER, granting motion for FRAP 12.1 (b) remand [ # 29 ] filed by Appellant Republic of Argentina; denying as moot motion to extend time [ # 30 ] filed by Appellant Republic of Argentina; denying as moot motion to refer the motion to remand to panel hearing [ # 31 ] filed by Appellee NML Capital, Ltd., by JMW, RR, PWH, C.JJ., FILED. [1712473][58] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/24/2016 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[1712452] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/24/2016 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, for FRAP 12.1 (b) remand [ # 29 ], on behalf of Appellee Paola Aiello, Banca Arner S.A., Brantford Holding S.A. and Paolo Ercolani in 15-3675, Appellee Banca Arner S.A. and Brantford Holding S.A. in 15-3649, Appellee Paola Aiello and Paolo Ercolani in 15-3679, FILED. Service date 02/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1711610] [15-3675, 15-3649, 15-3679] [Entered: 02/23/2016 07:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, for FRAP 12.1 (b) remand [ # 29 ], on behalf of Appellee Graziano Adami, Gianfranco Agostini, Allan Applestein TTEE FBO DCA Grantor Trust, Milena Ampalla, Arag-A Limited, Arag-O Limited, Arag-T Limited, Arag-V Limited, Augusto Arcangeli De Felicis, Attestor Master Value Fund LP, Antonella Bacchiocchi, Alberto Baciucco, Otello Baciucco, Filippo Bagolin, Sara Bartolozzi, Anneliese Gunda Becker, Serenella Belleggia, Roberto Berardocco, Studio Legale Bennati, Giorgio Bennati, Graziella Berchi, Adriano Bettinelli, Massimo Bettoni, Giorgio Bistagnino, Stefano Bistagnino, Graziella Bonadiman, Andrea Bonazzi, Stefania Bonpensiere, Rachele Bontempi, Sergio Borgra, Renata Boscariol, Emanuele Botti, Carlo Bretti, Susanna Bretti, Antonietta Guiseppina Brioschi, Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP, Marcello Calanca, Bruno Calmasini, Italia Camato, Giuseppina Capezzera, Laura Anna Capurro, Vincenzo Carbone, Carifin S.A., Giovanni Carlotta, Elettra Casalini, Diego Castagna, Marco Cavalli, Carmelina Censi, Gian Francesco Cercato, Alberto Compare, Giovanna Connena, Cesarino Consolini, Claridae Ltd, Maria Luigia Conti, Giancarlo Bartolomei Corsi, Agostino Consolini, Francesco Corso, Giuseppina Corso, Laura Cosci, Angelo Cottoni, Monica Crozzoletto, Graziella DaCroce, Tarcisia Dalbosco, Aldo David, Maria Del Pilar De We Ferrer, Carlo Farioli, Giovanna Ferro, Francesco Foggiato, Donatella Zanotti Fragonara, Rinaldo Frisinghelli, Angiolino Fusato, Anna Ferri, Adriana Dell'Era, Gabriele Fusato, Felicina Gaioli, Maddalena Gaioli, Francesco Mauro Ghezzi, Mario Giacometti, Giovanni Giardina, Celestino Goglia, Giulia Greggio, Verna Gualandi, Luisella Guardincerri, Gianfranco Guarini, Honero Fund I, LLC, Raimondo Iallonardo, Innovamedica S.P.A., Antonella De Rosa Kunderfranco, Manuela De Rosa Kunderfranco, Maritza Lenti, Angelo Leoni, Paolo Lisi, Ugo Lorenzi, Sergio Lovati, Fernanda Angela Lovero, Carmelo Maio, Claudio Mangano, Elide Margnelli, Romano Marton, Mirco Masina, Guglielmina Massara, Bruna Mattioli, MCHA Holdings, LLC, Salvatore Melchionda, Masina Mirco Mirco, Simonetta Montanari, Giampaolo Montino, Alessandro Morata, Carla Morata, Maria Rita Moretto, Amato Mori, Bruno Pappacoda, Sabrina Parodi, Alfredo Pelli, Franco Pezze, Valerio Piacenza, Peri Luigi Lucibello Piani, Procella Holdings, L.P., Raffaele Rossini, Ruggero Rossini, Ines Rota, Hilda Rupprecht, Vincenza Sabatelli, Laura Rossini, Adriano Rosato, Trinity Investments Limited, Martino Verna, Mario Vicini, Luca Vitali, VR Global Partners, L.P., White Hawthorne, LLC, Matteo Zanichelli, Giovanni Zanichelli, Vito Zancaner, Simona Staccioli, Maurizio Sergi, Marinella Scalvi, Licia Stampfli-Rosa, Tiziano Sasselli, Angelina Salmistraro, Giuseppe Silvio Rossini, Paola Rosa, Maria Robbiati, Barbara Ricchi, Aleessandra Regoli and Eugenia Re in 15-3675, Appellee VR Global Partners, L.P. in 15-3608, Appellee Graziano Adami, Gianfranco Agostini, Allan Applestein TTEE FBO DCA Grantor Trust, Milena Ampalla, Augusto Arcangeli De Felicis, Antonella Bacchiocchi, Alberto Baciucco, Otello Baciucco, Filippo Bagolin, Sara Bartolozzi, Anneliese Gunda Becker, Serenella Belleggia, Roberto Berardocco, Studio Legale Bennati, Giorgio Bennati, Graziella Berchi, Adriano Bettinelli, Massimo Bettoni, Giorgio Bistagnino, Stefano Bistagnino, Graziella Bonadiman, Andrea Bonazzi, Stefania Bonpensiere, Rachele Bontempi, Sergio Borgra, Renata Boscariol, Emanuele Botti, Carlo Bretti, Susanna Bretti, Antonietta Guiseppina Brioschi, Marcello Calanca, Bruno Calmasini, Italia Camato, Giuseppina Capezzera, Laura Anna Capurro, Vincenzo Carbone, Carifin S.A., Giovanni Carlotta, Elettra Casalini, Diego Castagna, Marco Cavalli, Carmelina Censi, Gian Francesco Cercato, Alberto Compare, Giovanna Connena, Cesarino Consolini, Maria Luigia Conti, Giancarlo Bartolomei Corsi, Agostino Consolini, Francesco Corso, Giuseppina Corso, Laura Cosci, Angelo Cottoni, Monica Crozzoletto, Graziella DaCroce, Tarcisia Dalbosco, Aldo David, Carlo Farioli, Giovanna Ferro, Francesco Foggiato, Donatella Zanotti Fragonara, Rinaldo Frisinghelli, Angiolino Fusato, Anna Ferri, Adriana Dell'Era, Gabriele Fusato, Felicina Gaioli, Maddalena Gaioli, Francesco Mauro Ghezzi, Mario Giacometti, Giovanni Giardina, Celestino Goglia, Giulia Greggio, Verna Gualandi, Luisella Guardincerri, Gianfranco Guarini, Raimondo Iallonardo, Innovamedica S.P.A., Antonella De Rosa Kunderfranco, Manuela De Rosa Kunderfranco, Maritza Lenti, Angelo Leoni, Paolo Lisi, Ugo Lorenzi, Sergio Lovati, Fernanda Angela Lovero, Carmelo Maio, Claudio Mangano, Elide Margnelli, Romano Marton, Mirco Masina, Guglielmina Massara, Bruna Mattioli, Salvatore Melchionda, Masina Mirco Mirco, Simonetta Montanari, Giampaolo Montino, Alessandro Morata, Carla Morata, Maria Rita Moretto, Amato Mori, Bruno Pappacoda, Sabrina Parodi, Alfredo Pelli, Franco Pezze, Valerio Piacenza, Peri Luigi Lucibello Piani, Raffaele Rossini, Ruggero Rossini, Ines Rota, Hilda Rupprecht, Vincenza Sabatelli, Laura Rossini, Adriano Rosato, Martino Verna, Mario Vicini, Luca Vitali, Matteo Zanichelli, Giovanni Zanichelli, Vito Zancaner, Simona Staccioli, Maurizio Sergi, Marinella Scalvi, Licia Stampfli-Rosa, Tiziano Sasselli, Angelina Salmistraro, Giuseppe Silvio Rossini, Paola Rosa, Maria Robbiati, Barbara Ricchi, Aleessandra Regoli and Eugenia Re in 15-3612, Appellee Arag-A Limited, Arag-O Limited, Arag-T Limited and Arag-V Limited in 15-3614, Appellee Attestor Master Value Fund LP in 15-3628, Appellee MCHA Holdings, LLC in 15-3629, Appellee Trinity Investments Limited in 15-3632, Appellee Procella Holdings, L.P. in 15-3633, 15-3641, 15-3642, Appellee White Hawthorne, LLC in 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3652, Appellee Claridae Ltd and Maria Del Pilar De We Ferrer in 15-3659, Appellee Honero Fund I, LLC in 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3666, Appellee Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP and Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP in 15-3672, Appellee Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP in 15-3678, FILED. Service date 02/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1711609] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/23/2016 07:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cordoba Capital, Los Angeles Capital, Montreux Partners, L.P. and Wilton Capital in 15-3675, Appellee Montreux Partners, L.P. in 15-3616, Appellee Wilton Capital in 15-3653, Appellee Los Angeles Capital in 15-3657, Appellee Cordoba Capital in 15-3715, FILED. Service date 02/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1711443] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/23/2016 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cordoba Capital, Los Angeles Capital, Montreux Partners, L.P. and Wilton Capital in 15-3675, Appellee Montreux Partners, L.P. in 15-3616, Appellee Wilton Capital in 15-3653, Appellee Los Angeles Capital in 15-3657, Appellee Cordoba Capital in 15-3715, FILED. Service date 02/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1711428] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/23/2016 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. Service date 11/30/2015 by CM/ECF. [1652939] [15-3649] [Entered: 11/30/2015 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[1651468] [15-3649] [Entered: 11/25/2015 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Banca Arner S.A. and Brantford Holding S.A., FILED. Service date 11/25/2015 by CM/ECF.[1651246] [15-3649] [Entered: 11/25/2015 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. Service date 11/24/2015 by CM/ECF.[1649906] [15-3649] [Entered: 11/24/2015 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. Service date 11/24/2015 by CM/ECF.[1649890] [15-3649] [Entered: 11/24/2015 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. Service date 11/19/2015 by CM/ECF.[1646845] [15-3649] [Entered: 11/19/2015 05:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, district court receipt # 0208-11613695, FILED.[1641419] [15-3649] [Entered: 11/13/2015 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1641411] [15-3649] [Entered: 11/13/2015 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 10/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1641403] [15-3649] [Entered: 11/13/2015 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. [1641378] [15-3649] [Entered: 11/13/2015 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brantford Holding S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Damaris Hernandez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Slifkin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Paskin