This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2019 at 06:00:12 (UTC).

Bailey v. Dal Global Services LLC

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 Bailey filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Dal Global Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1875

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

DAL GLOBAL SERVICES LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

GEORGE BAILEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Marie Justine Mueller

Attorney at Verrill Dana LLP

1 Portland Sq, Po Box 586

Portland, ME 04101-4054

Tawny L. Alvarez

Attorney at Verrill Dana LLP

1 Portland Sq, Po Box 586

Portland, ME 04101-4054

Elizabeth Tull Johnston

Attorney at Verrill Dana LLP

1 Portland Sq, Po Box 586

Portland, ME 04101-4054

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Sarah Ann Churchill

Attorney at Nichols & Churchill

1250 Forest Ave

Portland, ME 04103

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MANDATE issued. [19-1875] (GRC) [Entered: 10/28/2019 03:29 PM]

Open Document

JUDGMENT dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). [19-1875] (GRC) [Entered: 10/28/2019 03:28 PM]

Open Document

STIPULATED MOTION for voluntary dismissal filed by Appellant George Bailey. Certificate of service dated 10/24/2019. [19-1875] CLERK'S NOTE: The ECF filer did not select the option that best describes the document. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (SAC) [Entered: 10/24/2019 03:35 PM]

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Dal Global Services LLC filed by Attorney Elizabeth T. Johnston. Certificate of service dated 09/18/2019. [19-1875] (ETJ) [Entered: 09/18/2019 09:43 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant George Bailey indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 09/17/2019. [19-1875] (SAC) [Entered: 09/17/2019 07:37 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant George Bailey filed by Attorney Sarah A. Churchill. Certificate of service dated 09/17/2019. [19-1875] (SAC) [Entered: 09/17/2019 07:36 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant George Bailey. Certificate of service dated 09/17/2019. [19-1875] (SAC) [Entered: 09/17/2019 07:35 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Dal Global Services LLC filed by Attorney Tawny L. Alvarez. Certificate of service dated 09/03/2019. [19-1875] (TLA) [Entered: 09/03/2019 04:31 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATE issued. [19-1875] (GRC) [Entered: 10/28/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). [19-1875] (GRC) [Entered: 10/28/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATED MOTION for voluntary dismissal filed by Appellant George Bailey. Certificate of service dated 10/24/2019. [19-1875] CLERK'S NOTE: The ECF filer did not select the option that best describes the document. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (SAC) [Entered: 10/24/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 10/28/2019 for appellant George Bailey. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1875] (GRC) [Entered: 09/18/2019 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Dal Global Services LLC filed by Attorney Elizabeth T. Johnston. Certificate of service dated 09/18/2019. [19-1875] (ETJ) [Entered: 09/18/2019 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant George Bailey indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 09/17/2019. [19-1875] (SAC) [Entered: 09/17/2019 07:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant George Bailey filed by Attorney Sarah A. Churchill. Certificate of service dated 09/17/2019. [19-1875] (SAC) [Entered: 09/17/2019 07:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant George Bailey. Certificate of service dated 09/17/2019. [19-1875] (SAC) [Entered: 09/17/2019 07:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Dal Global Services LLC filed by Attorney Tawny L. Alvarez. Certificate of service dated 09/03/2019. [19-1875] (TLA) [Entered: 09/03/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #46) filed by Appellant George Bailey. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 09/17/2019. [19-1875] (GRC) [Entered: 09/03/2019 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less