This case was last updated from PACER on 07/19/2019 at 06:04:59 (UTC).

Bahig Bishay v. DOJ, et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 Bahig Bishay filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DOJ. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5141

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

United States Department of Justice

James A. Crowell, IV, in his individual and official capacity as Director of the Executive Office for United States Attorneys

Federal Bureau of Investigation

Christopher A. Wray, in his individual and official capacity as Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation

Plaintiff / Appellant

Bahig F. Bishay

Norwood, MA 02062

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

R. Craig Lawrence

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Bahig F. Bishay

Po Box 396

Norwood, MA 02062

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPENDIX [1797028] filed by Bahig F. Bishay. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 07/12/2019 ] [19-5141] (Bishay, Bahig) [Entered: 07/12/2019 04:50 PM]

Open Document

APPELLANT BRIEF [1797023] filed by Bahig F. Bishay [Service Date: 07/12/2019 ] Length of Brief: 7400 words. [19-5141] (Bishay, Bahig) [Entered: 07/12/2019 04:46 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1794122] filed granting motion to permit pro se electronic filing [ # 1794081-2 ] [19-5141] [Entered: 06/24/2019 11:17 AM]

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document #1

Motion Filed

Open Document

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1793567] received from Illegible [signed for on 06/06/2019] for order [1791821-2] sent to Appellant Bahig F. Bishay [19-5141] [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:22 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1791813] filed removing case from abeyance, setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/30/2019. APPENDIX due 07/30/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5141] [Entered: 06/10/2019 10:58 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE [1791810] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court to supplement record: Motion for reconsideration denied. [19-5141] [Entered: 06/10/2019 10:46 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1788551] filed holding case in abeyance. Case 19-5141 held in abeyance pending decision in 1:19cv1045-UNA from U.S. District Court; The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order to the district court. [19-5141] [Entered: 05/20/2019 01:10 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1788546] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-01045-UNA filed by Bahig F. Bishay. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5141. [19-5141] [Entered: 05/20/2019 01:03 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPENDIX [1797028] filed by Bahig F. Bishay. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 07/12/2019 ] [19-5141] (Bishay, Bahig) [Entered: 07/12/2019 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT BRIEF [1797023] filed by Bahig F. Bishay [Service Date: 07/12/2019 ] Length of Brief: 7400 words. [19-5141] (Bishay, Bahig) [Entered: 07/12/2019 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1794122] filed granting motion to permit pro se electronic filing [ # 1794081-2 ] [19-5141] [Entered: 06/24/2019 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1794081] to permit pro se electronic filing status filed by Bahig F. Bishay [Service Date: 06/14/2019 ] Length Certification: 1 page. [19-5141] [Entered: 06/24/2019 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1793567] received from Illegible [signed for on 06/06/2019] for order [1791821-2] sent to Appellant Bahig F. Bishay [19-5141] [Entered: 06/19/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • FIRST CLASS and CERTIFIED MAIL SENT [1791821] with return receipt requested of order [ # 1791813-6 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 07/10/2019 from Bahig F. Bishay. [19-5141] [Entered: 06/10/2019 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1791813] filed removing case from abeyance, setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/30/2019. APPENDIX due 07/30/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5141] [Entered: 06/10/2019 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE [1791810] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court to supplement record: Motion for reconsideration denied. [19-5141] [Entered: 06/10/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1788551] filed holding case in abeyance. Case 19-5141 held in abeyance pending decision in 1:19cv1045-UNA from U.S. District Court; The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order to the district court. [19-5141] [Entered: 05/20/2019 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1788546] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-01045-UNA filed by Bahig F. Bishay. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5141. [19-5141] [Entered: 05/20/2019 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5141] [Entered: 05/20/2019 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.