This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/03/2022 at 06:13:08 (UTC).

Badaiki v. Schlumberger Holdings

Case Summary

On 02/11/2022 Badaiki filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Schlumberger Holdings. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-20071

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Fidelis Johnson Badaiki

Houston, TX 77290

Defendant / Appellees

Schlumberger Holdings Corporation

Schlumberger Limited

Schlumberger Technology Corporation

Cameron International Corporation

Paal Kibsgaard

Olivier Le Peuch

Steve McKenzie

Jamilah Cummings

Marisa Henning

John Corkhill

Nathan Cooper

Ray Arbor

Jay Jurena

Ed Gaude

Henry Weissenborn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Fidelis Johnson Badaiki

P. O. Box 90163

Houston, TX 77290

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Brandon W. Duke

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, L.L.P.

800 Capitol Street

Houston, TX 77002-2925

James Hunter Nye

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, L.L.P.

800 Capitol Street

Houston, TX 77002-2925

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #1

Unfiled Document

Open Document

APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Fidelis Johnson Badaiki. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 08/09/2022 09:17 AM]

Open Document

REPLY filed by Appellant Mr. Fidelis Johnson Badaiki [9894585-1] to the Response/Opposition filed by Appellees Schlumberger Technology Corporation, Schlumberger Limited, Cameron International Corporation, Mr. Nathan Cooper, Mr. Paal Kibsgaard, Schlumberger Holdings Corporation, Mr. Olivier Le Peuch, Mr. Steve McKenzie, Mr. Jamilah Cummings, Ms. Marisa Henning, Mr. John Corkhill, Mr. Ray Arbor, Mr. Jay Jurena, Mr. Ed Gaude and Mr. Henry Weissenborn in 22-20071 [ # 9889830-2 ]. Date of Service: 07/15/2022. [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 07/18/2022 01:09 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9890388-1] to the Motion to file response out of time filed by Appellees Schlumberger Technology Corporation, Schlumberger Limited, Cameron International Corporation, Mr. Nathan Cooper, Mr. Paal Kibsgaard, Schlumberger Holdings Corporation, Mr. Olivier Le Peuch, Mr. John Corkhill, Mr. Ray Arbor and Mr. Jay Jurena in 22-20071 [ # 9888885-2 ] Date of Service: 07/11/2022. [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 07/12/2022 10:30 AM]

Open Document

RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Ray Arbor, Cameron International Corporation, Mr. Nathan Cooper, Mr. John Corkhill, Mr. Jamilah Cummings, Mr. Ed Gaude, Ms. Marisa Henning, Mr. Jay Jurena, Mr. Paal Kibsgaard, Mr. Olivier Le Peuch, Mr. Steve McKenzie, Schlumberger Holdings Corporation, Schlumberger Limited, Schlumberger Technology Corporation and Mr. Henry Weissenborn [9889830-1] to the Motion to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Mr. Fidelis Johnson Badaiki in 22-20071 [ # 9865269-2 ] Date of Service: 07/01/2022. [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 07/11/2022 03:54 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting Motion to file response out of time filed by Appellees Schlumberger Technology Corporation, Schlumberger Limited, Cameron International Corporation, Mr. Nathan Cooper, Mr. Paal Kibsgaard, Schlumberger Holdings Corporation, Mr. Olivier Le Peuch, Mr. John Corkhill, Mr. Ray Arbor and Mr. Jay Jurena [ # 9888885-2 ] [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 07/11/2022 03:50 PM]

Open Document #2

Ex A - Corrected IFP Response

Open Document #1

Motion Filed on Behalf of Party

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #1

Unfiled Document

Open Document

CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9877992-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Fidelis Johnson Badaiki. [9877992-1] [22-20071] (ABT) [Entered: 06/24/2022 12:14 PM]

Open Document #2

MOT-1 Letter

Open Document #1

Motion Filed on Behalf of Party

Open Document

DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 05/12/2022 denying IFP for Appellant Mr. Fidelis Johnson Badaiki. Fee due on 06/03/2022 for Appellant Fidelis Johnson Badaiki [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 05/19/2022 09:40 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-20071] (Brandon W. Duke ) [Entered: 03/01/2022 06:27 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9778362-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 02/16/2022 04:25 PM]

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Fidelis Johnson Badaiki [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 02/11/2022 12:28 PM]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the "Motion to Exceed Page Volume Limit of Brief" because brief remains within the allowed word count [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 08/09/2022 09:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Fidelis Johnson Badaiki. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 08/09/2022 09:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY filed by Appellant Mr. Fidelis Johnson Badaiki [9894585-1] to the Response/Opposition filed by Appellees Schlumberger Technology Corporation, Schlumberger Limited, Cameron International Corporation, Mr. Nathan Cooper, Mr. Paal Kibsgaard, Schlumberger Holdings Corporation, Mr. Olivier Le Peuch, Mr. Steve McKenzie, Mr. Jamilah Cummings, Ms. Marisa Henning, Mr. John Corkhill, Mr. Ray Arbor, Mr. Jay Jurena, Mr. Ed Gaude and Mr. Henry Weissenborn in 22-20071 [ # 9889830-2 ]. Date of Service: 07/15/2022. [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 07/18/2022 01:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9890388-1] to the Motion to file response out of time filed by Appellees Schlumberger Technology Corporation, Schlumberger Limited, Cameron International Corporation, Mr. Nathan Cooper, Mr. Paal Kibsgaard, Schlumberger Holdings Corporation, Mr. Olivier Le Peuch, Mr. John Corkhill, Mr. Ray Arbor and Mr. Jay Jurena in 22-20071 [ # 9888885-2 ] Date of Service: 07/11/2022. [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 07/12/2022 10:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Ray Arbor, Cameron International Corporation, Mr. Nathan Cooper, Mr. John Corkhill, Mr. Jamilah Cummings, Mr. Ed Gaude, Ms. Marisa Henning, Mr. Jay Jurena, Mr. Paal Kibsgaard, Mr. Olivier Le Peuch, Mr. Steve McKenzie, Schlumberger Holdings Corporation, Schlumberger Limited, Schlumberger Technology Corporation and Mr. Henry Weissenborn [9889830-1] to the Motion to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Mr. Fidelis Johnson Badaiki in 22-20071 [ # 9865269-2 ] Date of Service: 07/01/2022. [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 07/11/2022 03:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting Motion to file response out of time filed by Appellees Schlumberger Technology Corporation, Schlumberger Limited, Cameron International Corporation, Mr. Nathan Cooper, Mr. Paal Kibsgaard, Schlumberger Holdings Corporation, Mr. Olivier Le Peuch, Mr. John Corkhill, Mr. Ray Arbor and Mr. Jay Jurena [ # 9888885-2 ] [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 07/11/2022 03:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Mr. Ray Arbor, Cameron International Corporation, Mr. Nathan Cooper, Mr. John Corkhill, Mr. Jay Jurena, Mr. Paal Kibsgaard, Mr. Olivier Le Peuch, Schlumberger Holdings Corporation, Schlumberger Limited and Schlumberger Technology Corporation to file an out of time response [9888885-2] to the to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Mr. Fidelis Johnson Badaiki [ # 9865269-2 ]. Date of service: 07/08/2022 via email - Appellant Badaiki; Attorney for Appellees: Duke, Nye [22-20071] (Brandon W. Duke ) [Entered: 07/08/2022 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the reply to response/opposition received from Appellant Mr. Fidelis Johnson Badaiki because no action was taken on the response as it was untimely [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 07/06/2022 09:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the response/opposition received from Appellees Mr. Ray Arbor, Cameron International Corporation, Mr. Nathan Cooper, Mr. John Corkhill, Mr. Jamilah Cummings, Mr. Ed Gaude, Ms. Marisa Henning, Mr. Jay Jurena, Mr. Paal Kibsgaard, Mr. Olivier Le Peuch, Mr. Steve McKenzie, Schlumberger Holdings Corporation, Schlumberger Limited, Schlumberger Technology Corporation and Mr. Henry Weissenborn because it is untimely filed [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 07/05/2022 10:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/08/2022 for Appellant Fidelis Johnson Badaiki. [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 06/28/2022 09:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9877992-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Fidelis Johnson Badaiki. [9877992-1] [22-20071] (ABT) [Entered: 06/24/2022 12:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:20-CV-2216. Electronic ROA due on 07/07/2022. [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 06/22/2022 12:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketThe Motion to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Mr. Fidelis Johnson Badaiki in 22-20071 [ # 9865269-2 ] has been made sufficient. Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Rpl deadline satisfied. [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 06/22/2022 12:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL STATUS filed by Appellant Mr. Fidelis Johnson Badaiki in support of the Motion to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Mr. Fidelis Johnson Badaiki in 22-20071 [ # 9865269-2 ].. [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 06/08/2022 12:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Fidelis Johnson Badaiki to proceed in forma pauperis [9865269-2]. Date of service: 06/03/2022 Document is insufficient for the following reasons: The motion must incorporate a certificate of conference; or, indicate opposition, the motion also needs a corrected certificate of compliance including the word count. A motion is limited to 5200 words Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Reply due on 06/21/2022 for Appellant Fidelis Johnson Badaiki [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 06/08/2022 12:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISTRICT COURT ORDER of 05/12/2022 denying IFP for Appellant Mr. Fidelis Johnson Badaiki. Fee due on 06/03/2022 for Appellant Fidelis Johnson Badaiki [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 05/19/2022 09:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Brandon W. Duke for party(s) Appellee John Corkhill Appellee Jay Jurena Appellee Schlumberger Limited Appellee Paal Kibsgaard Appellee Nathan Cooper Appellee Ray Arbor Appellee Olivier Le Peuch Appellee Schlumberger Holdings Corporation Appellee Schlumberger Technology Corporation Appellee Cameron International Corporation, in case 22-20071 [22-20071] (ABT) [Entered: 03/02/2022 07:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-20071] (Brandon W. Duke ) [Entered: 03/01/2022 06:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9778362-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 02/16/2022 04:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Fidelis Johnson Badaiki [22-20071] (CCR) [Entered: 02/11/2022 12:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less