This case was last updated from PACER on 10/19/2020 at 06:10:23 (UTC).

Ayse Sen v. AMZN

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 Ayse Sen filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against AMZN. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55857

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

AMAZON.COM, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

AYSE SEN

Idyllwild, CA 92046

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Gregory Doll

Attorney at Doll Amir & Eley LLP

725 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3275

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jamie Olivia Kendall

Attorney at Doll Amir & Eley LLP

725 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3275

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Louise K. Machado

Attorney at Doll Amir & Eley LLP

725 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3275

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Ayse Sen

P.O. Box 2279

Idyllwild, CA 92046

 

Court Documents

2 #3

Additional Document

#2

Main Document

2 #1

Fee Due OSC

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket(#3) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 08/24/2020. [11803621] (RT) [Entered: 08/26/2020 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11796646] (CKP) [Entered: 08/20/2020 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 09/18/2020. Transcript due 10/19/2020. Appellant Ayse Sen opening brief due 11/27/2020. Appellee Amazon.com, Inc. answering brief due 12/28/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11796210] (JBS) [Entered: 08/20/2020 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant